« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 1 Capital Litigation
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Michael Paul Adams - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Schlicksup, Andrew
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2019-131267-001
Party Name
B Victim - (3)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
M
Attorney
Phillips, Jeremy
Judge
Case #
CR2019-131267-001
Party Name
B Victim - (4)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Taylor, Benjamin
Judge
Case #
CR2019-131267-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Michael Paul Adams 
Crime Date
7/4/2019
Date
7/11/2019
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Michael Paul Adams 
Crime Date
7/4/2019
Date
4/21/2021
Description
MURDER 1ST DEG-PREMEDITATED
ARSCode
13-1105A1 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2021
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2021
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2021
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/21/2021
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/21/2021
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/13/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
2/12/2021
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
2/3/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
VICTIM NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
1/29/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2021
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
1/13/2021
Description
123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2021
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/11/2021
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
$1000000
Filing Date
1/5/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATION FOR 1/6/2021 STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
12/18/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES’ NOTICE REGARDING DEFENDANTS’ TREATMENT PLAN DECEMBER 18, 2020 UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/24/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Document Under Seal
Filing Date
11/23/2020
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
10/16/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES’ NOTICE OF FILING OCTOBER 16, 2020 TREATMENT PLAN UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
10/9/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES' NOTICE OF TREATMENT PLAN - SEPTEMBER 2020
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES’ NOTICE OF FILING SEPTEMBER 2020 TREATMENT PLAN UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
9/2/2020
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2020
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2020
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2020
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2020
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2020
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2020
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATION FOR 6/9/2020 STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
5/18/2020
Description
122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2020
Description
124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2020
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATION FOR 4/28/2020 STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
3/5/2020
Description
124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/5/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2020
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/9/2020
Description
124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. CAMILLE HERNANDEZ DATED 12/10/19
Filing Date
1/7/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. JASON R. FRIZZELL DATED 12/31/19
Filing Date
12/17/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE RULE 11 HEARING
Filing Date
11/27/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 11/OF APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
11/19/2019
Description
120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXAMINATION OF DEFENDANT’S MENTAL CONDITION
Filing Date
10/23/2019
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Vacate Order to Show Cause Hearing
Filing Date
10/17/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS PROVIDE A COMPLETE UNREDACTED COPY OF ALL MEDICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH RECORDS
Filing Date
10/14/2019
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2019
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2019
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2019
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS REQUESTING PRIVATE EDUCATION RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
9/5/2019
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2019
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS REQUESTING PRIAVATE EDUCATION RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
9/3/2019
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S OBJECTION TO CAMERA REQUEST OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REQUEST TO LIMIT MEDIA COVERAGE
Filing Date
9/3/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSES MOTION
Filing Date
9/3/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSES MOTION
Filing Date
9/3/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSES MOTION
Filing Date
9/3/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSES MOTION
Filing Date
9/3/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSES ORDER
Filing Date
9/3/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSES ORDER
Filing Date
9/3/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSES ORDER
Filing Date
9/3/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSES ORDER
Filing Date
8/28/2019
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/22/2019
Description
MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS REQUESTING PRIVATE EDUCATION RECORDS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
8/20/2019
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/20/2019
Description
AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 708(A
Filing Date
8/20/2019
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
8/20/2019
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
8/20/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
8/2/2019
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
8/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance for Victim
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2019
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND NOTICE DEADLINE
Filing Date
7/29/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
7/29/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORIENTATION
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORIENTATION
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORIENTATION
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATUTUES
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATUTUES
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATUTUES
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IMPANELMENT
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IMPANELMENT
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IMPANELMENT
Filing Date
7/23/2019
Description
569 - ME: Not Guilty Arraignment/Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2019
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
7/10/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
rule 2.3 victim identifier information form
Filing Date
7/10/2019
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/10/2019
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/10/2019
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/8/2019
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
7/8/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
7/8/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2019
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/4/2019
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
7/11/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/15/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
7/18/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/29/2019
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/5/2019
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
10/1/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
10/11/2019
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/16/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/1/2019
Time
14:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
12/5/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/17/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
1/7/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
3/3/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
3/5/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/12/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/28/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
5/12/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
6/9/2020
Time
9:30
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
6/30/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/3/2020
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/5/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
8/18/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
11/16/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/6/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/26/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/27/2021
Time
10:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/17/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/4/2021
Time
8:31
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/18/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Trial