Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Southeast  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Brady, Tiffany      
Zachary Bryan Showers - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Karpel, Jason   Master Calendar  CR2019-128772-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-3415 (F6)  DRUG PARAPHERNALIA VIOLATION  3/21/2017  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/14/2019 
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-3405 (F6)  MARIJUANA VIOLATION  3/21/2017  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/14/2019 
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-3405A1 (F6)  MARIJUANA-POSSESS/USE  3/21/2017       
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-3415A (F6)  DRUG PARAPHERNALIA-POSSESS/USE  3/21/2017       
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/15/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  10/15/2020   
10/14/2020  ORD - Order - Party (001)  10/16/2020   
NOTE: CONTINUNG THE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL TO TIME 12/16/20 
10/8/2020  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/9/2020   
NOTE: Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial Management Conference and Trial Date 
7/6/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  7/6/2020   
6/16/2020  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  6/16/2020   
3/5/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  3/5/2020   
12/2/2019  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  12/2/2019   
11/18/2019  STA - Statement - Party (001)  11/19/2019   
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 
10/15/2019  172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)  10/15/2019   
10/9/2019  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  10/9/2019   
10/7/2019  172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)  10/7/2019   
9/30/2019  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  10/1/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
9/30/2019  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)  10/1/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704 
9/30/2019  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  10/1/2019   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTIONS UPON CONVICTION IN A CURRENTLY PENDING CASE 
9/18/2019  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  9/19/2019   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES, WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS AND REQUEST FOR REBUTTAL WITNESSES 
9/18/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  9/19/2019   
NOTE: 2019-09-18 SDR 
9/18/2019  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/23/2019   
9/6/2019  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  9/10/2019   
9/6/2019  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/10/2019   
NOTE: TEMPORARY 
9/6/2019  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/10/2019   
8/28/2019  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  8/30/2019   
8/26/2019  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  8/26/2019   
8/13/2019  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  8/14/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
8/13/2019  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  8/14/2019   
8/13/2019  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  8/14/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
8/13/2019  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  8/14/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
8/13/2019  NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)  8/14/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING 
8/9/2019  179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (001)  8/9/2019   
8/6/2019  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  8/6/2019   
NOTE: Release Order 
7/3/2019  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  7/5/2019   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
6/26/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  6/26/2019   
NOTE: THIRD PARTY SERVED 6/22/2019 
6/19/2019  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  6/19/2019   
6/19/2019  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  6/19/2019   
6/19/2019  SUM - Summons - Party (001)  6/20/2019   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
8/6/2019  8:29   Initial Appearance 
8/15/2019  13:30   Preliminary Hearing 
8/20/2019  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
10/1/2019  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
10/7/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
10/8/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
10/30/2019  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
11/18/2019  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
1/8/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/15/2020  8:00   Trial 
2/27/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/5/2020  8:00   Trial 
6/29/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/7/2020  9:15   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/9/2020  8:00   Trial 
7/14/2020  8:00   Trial 
8/11/2020  10:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/18/2020  8:00   Trial 
10/13/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/27/2020  11:00   Trial 
11/3/2020  15:30   Settlement Conference 
12/16/2020  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/5/2021  11:00   Trial