Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Southeast  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Brady, Tiffany      
Zachary Levi Taylor - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Nolan, Todd   Master Calendar  CR2019-125074-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Zachary Levi Taylor  13-3415 (F6)  DRUG PARAPHERNALIA VIOLATION  3/6/2019       
Zachary Levi Taylor  13-3407 (F4)  DANGEROUS DRUG VIOLATION  3/6/2019       
Zachary Levi Taylor  13-3408 (F4)  NARCOTIC DRUG VIOLATION  3/6/2019       
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
2/18/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  2/18/2020   
12/17/2019  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  12/17/2019   
10/21/2019  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  10/21/2019   
10/16/2019  STA - Statement - Party (001)  10/21/2019   
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 
9/16/2019  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  9/16/2019   
8/21/2019  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  8/22/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 703 or A.R.S. § 13-704 
8/21/2019  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  8/22/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
8/21/2019  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  8/22/2019   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS 
8/21/2019  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  8/22/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING 
8/21/2019  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  8/22/2019   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTIONS UPON CONVICTION IN A CURRENTLY PENDING CASE 
8/7/2019  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  8/7/2019   
7/31/2019  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  7/31/2019   
7/30/2019  INF - Information - Party (001)  7/31/2019   
NOTE: INFORMATION 
7/30/2019  WPH - Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)  8/1/2019   
7/5/2019  RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)  7/5/2019   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
6/18/2019  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  6/19/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses 
6/17/2019  179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (001)  6/17/2019   
6/14/2019  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  6/14/2019   
NOTE: Release Order 
6/4/2019  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  6/5/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
6/4/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  6/5/2019   
NOTE: Request for Discovery 
5/30/2019  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  5/30/2019   
5/30/2019  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  5/30/2019   
5/30/2019  SUM - Summons - Party (001)  5/31/2019   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
6/14/2019  8:29   Initial Appearance 
7/15/2019  8:29   Initial Appearance 
7/30/2019  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
7/30/2019  8:31   Original Arraignment Hearing 
9/10/2019  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
10/9/2019  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
10/16/2019  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
12/11/2019  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
2/7/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/10/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/17/2020  8:00   Trial 
4/6/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
6/16/2020  8:00   Trial