« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Cohen, Yigael
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Brandon Osorio Hernandez - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Le Lievre, David
Judge
Edelstein
Case #
CR2019-124150-001
Party Name
B Witness - (3)
Relationship
Witness
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2019-124150-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Brandon Osorio Hernandez 
Crime Date
5/15/2019
Date
6/3/2019
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Brandon Osorio Hernandez 
Crime Date
5/15/2019
Date
6/3/2019
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Brandon Osorio Hernandez 
Crime Date
1/1/2019
Date
6/3/2019
Description
AGG LURING MINOR SEXUAL EXPLTN
ARSCode
13-3560A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Brandon Osorio Hernandez 
Crime Date
5/1/2019
Date
6/3/2019
Description
SEXUAL ABUSE
ARSCode
13-1404A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Brandon Osorio Hernandez 
Crime Date
5/1/2019
Date
6/3/2019
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Brandon Osorio Hernandez 
Crime Date
5/1/2019
Date
9/28/2020
Description
CHILD/VULNERABLE ADULT ABUSE
ARSCode
13-3623 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Brandon Osorio Hernandez 
Crime Date
5/15/2019
Date
9/28/2020
Description
CHILD/VULNERABLE ADULT ABUSE
ARSCode
13-3623 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Brandon Osorio Hernandez 
Crime Date
5/1/2019
Date
9/28/2020
Description
CHILD/VULNERABLE ADULT ABUSE
ARSCode
13-3623 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Brandon Osorio Hernandez 
Crime Date
5/15/2019
Date
9/28/2020
Description
CHILD/VULNERABLE ADULT ABUSE
ARSCode
13-3623 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Brandon Osorio Hernandez 
Crime Date
1/1/2019
Date
9/28/2020
Description
AGG LURING MINOR SEXUAL EXPLTN
ARSCode
13-3560A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2022
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
3/7/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2022
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion For Withdrawal Of Counsel
Filing Date
11/9/2021
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2021
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Establish Start Date
Filing Date
2/12/2021
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2021
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2021
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
11/13/2020
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2020
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
9/30/2020
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2020
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
6/15/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND SET CHANGE FO PLEA HEARING
Filing Date
5/1/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
1/23/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
12/12/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/9/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2019
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
9/27/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
9/23/2019
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
8/27/2019
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME
Filing Date
8/12/2019
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2019
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND RULE 12.9 TIME FOR FILING MOTION
Filing Date
7/24/2019
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Affirm Indigent Status and Appoint Expert
Filing Date
7/22/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2019
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
7/17/2019
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/17/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT INTERPRETER
Filing Date
7/17/2019
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
6/25/2019
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY BOND $150,000 UNIVERSAL FIRE AND CASUALTY
Filing Date
6/14/2019
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES, WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
5/31/2019
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/31/2019
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2019
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/31/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/31/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICITIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
5/29/2019
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
5/29/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/29/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/25/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/31/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/4/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
6/7/2019
Time
20:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/24/2019
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/22/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
9/24/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/4/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/27/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/3/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/29/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/6/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/9/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/16/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/11/2020
Time
8:50
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/18/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/28/2020
Time
9:35
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/12/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/27/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/4/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
11/5/2021
Time
8:45
Event
Review Hearing
Date
3/3/2022
Time
8:45
Event
Review Hearing