« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Rooper, Elaina
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Charles Lawrence Tack - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Green, Benjamin
Judge
Nadzieja
Case #
CR2019-123358-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Charles Lawrence Tack 
Crime Date
5/20/2019
Date
8/13/2019
Description
AGG DUI-WRONG WAY DRIVING
ARSCode
28-1383A5 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Charles Lawrence Tack 
Crime Date
5/20/2019
Date
8/13/2019
Description
AGG DUI-WRONG WAY DRIVING
ARSCode
28-1383A5 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Charles Lawrence Tack 
Crime Date
5/20/2019
Date
1/29/2020
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201A (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Charles Lawrence Tack 
Crime Date
5/20/2019
Date
1/29/2020
Description
Extreme DUI-BAC .15 TO .20
ARSCode
28-1382A1 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2021
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
ODM - Order of Discharge from Probation - Misdemeanor Designation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1 Designated a MISDEMEANOR
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2
Filing Date
8/17/2021
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
8/17/2021
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
10/14/2020
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms COUNT 2
Filing Date
3/20/2020
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2020
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2020
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
3/4/2020
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
3/4/2020
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement Jail
Filing Date
3/4/2020
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
3/4/2020
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/4/2020
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
3/4/2020
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
3/3/2020
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRETRIAL
Filing Date
2/5/2020
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2020
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2020
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE ORAL ARGUMENT ON DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS/REMAND AND TO RESET TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
12/23/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2019
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
10/31/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2019
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
10/31/209 CPTC AND 11/01/2019 ORAL ARGUMENT ON MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/25/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Mot to Cont CPTC oral arg_MTD
Filing Date
10/24/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2019
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO 16.4
Filing Date
10/11/2019
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2019
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 16.4 OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REMAND PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9
Filing Date
9/27/2019
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/19/2019
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME PURSUANT TO 12.9 TO FILE MOTION FOR NEW FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Filing Date
9/13/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO 15.2 AND REQUEST FOR STATE’S DISCOVERY, DISCLOSURE AND PRESERVATION OF EVIDENCE
Filing Date
9/12/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
8/26/2019
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2019
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2019
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/12/2019
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2019
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/12/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/12/2019
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2019
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2019
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE AND PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
5/28/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
5/23/2019
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/23/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/21/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
6/4/2019
Time
8:33
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/10/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
7/19/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
8/2/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
8/19/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
8/20/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/1/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
10/31/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
11/1/2019
Time
15:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/20/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
12/20/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/8/2020
Time
15:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/29/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/29/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/31/2020
Time
8:29
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/6/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/4/2020
Time
8:28
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt
Date
3/20/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/2/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Trial