« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Northup, Nicole
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Carlos Jacinto Cobo-Perez - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Per, Pro
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2019-122923-001
Party Name
Maura Lopez-Higuera - (3)
Relationship
Guardian
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2019-122923-001
Party Name
Maura Lopez-Higuera - (4)
Relationship
Victim Representative
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2019-122923-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Carlos Jacinto Cobo-Perez
Crime Date
4/1/2019
Date
5/28/2019
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Carlos Jacinto Cobo-Perez
Crime Date
4/1/2019
Date
3/24/2022
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405A (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Carlos Jacinto Cobo-Perez
Crime Date
4/1/2019
Date
3/24/2022
Description
KIDNAP
ARSCode
13-1304A (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Carlos Jacinto Cobo-Perez
Crime Date
11/2/2018
Date
3/24/2022
Description
Agg Aslt-Adult On Minor
ARSCode
13-1204A6 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2023
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2022
Description
NRE - Notice of Completion of Post Conviction Relief Request for Extension of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF
POST-CONVICTION REVIEW
BY COUNSEL;
REQUEST FOR 45 DAY
EXTENSION OF TIME TO
ALLOW DEFENDANT TO FILE
PRO PER PETITION FOR POSTCONVICTION
RELIEF;
Filing Date
10/12/2022
Description
PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SettlementConf04302021-Amended
Filing Date
8/16/2022
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2022
Description
RPR - Request for Preparation of Record - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Preparation of Additional Transcript
Filing Date
8/1/2022
Description
187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2022
Description
PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Settlement Conference
Filing Date
7/1/2022
Description
PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
4/29/22 BY TARA L. KRAMER
Filing Date
6/27/2022
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
3/24/22 Kristyn L. Lobry
Filing Date
6/17/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Compliance
Filing Date
5/24/2022
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2022
Description
595 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2022
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
5/2/2022
Description
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
3/28/2022
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
3/24/2022
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLEA AGREEMENT
Filing Date
3/23/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2022
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S PETITION TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
3/7/2022
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS
Filing Date
3/4/2022
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT INTERPRETER
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2022
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/17/2022
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
2/10/2022
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2022
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2022
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2022
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2022
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
12/9/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2021
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/26/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2021
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2021
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Continue Trial
Filing Date
1/15/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
11/24/2020
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2020
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2020
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2020
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2020
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2020
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Settlement Conference Memorandum
Filing Date
9/23/2020
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2020
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2020
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
5/21/2020
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
5/21/2020
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
4/9/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2020
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
2/19/2020
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complex Case Status Update
Filing Date
1/28/2020
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2
NOTICE OF DEFENSES
AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/3/2019
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2019
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Designate Complex Case
Filing Date
7/17/2019
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2019
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR COURT INTERPRETER
Filing Date
7/8/2019
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/8/2019
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE
OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE
SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §
13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
6/26/2019
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
6/20/2019
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2019
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
$150,000 CASH ONLY APPEARANCE
Filing Date
5/24/2019
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/24/2019
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2019
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/24/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/24/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
5/21/2019
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
5/21/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/21/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
5/21/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2019
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/18/2019
Time
17:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/23/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/28/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/31/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/12/2019
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/14/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
9/18/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/25/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/2/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/20/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/12/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/8/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/6/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/18/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/27/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/8/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/13/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/9/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/16/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/23/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
10/28/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/17/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/13/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/28/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/8/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/17/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/1/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/30/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
5/26/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/8/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/28/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/10/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/15/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/30/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/20/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/2/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/1/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/14/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/5/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/11/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/19/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/19/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/26/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/7/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/8/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/22/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/24/2022
Time
10:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/25/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/28/2022
Time
13:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/29/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/30/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/31/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/4/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/5/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/6/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/29/2022
Time
10:00
Event
Sentencing