Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Brady, Tiffany      
Zachary Bryan Showers - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Karpel, Jason   Master Calendar  CR2019-118472-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Zachary Bryan Showers  28-661B (F2)  FAIL TO STAY/WITH DEATH/INJURY  4/23/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  5/6/2019 
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-1103A1 (F2)  MANSLAUGHTER-RECKLESS  4/23/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  5/6/2019 
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  4/23/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  5/6/2019 
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-1103A1 (F2)  MANSLAUGHTER-RECKLESS  4/23/2019       
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  4/23/2019       
Zachary Bryan Showers  28-661B (F2)  FAIL TO STAY/WITH DEATH/INJURY  4/23/2019       
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/15/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  10/15/2020   
10/14/2020  OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)  10/16/2020   
10/8/2020  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/8/2020   
NOTE: Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial Management Conference and Trial Date 
7/6/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  7/6/2020   
6/16/2020  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  6/16/2020   
3/5/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  3/5/2020   
12/2/2019  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  12/2/2019   
11/13/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/14/2019   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
10/15/2019  172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)  10/15/2019   
10/9/2019  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  10/9/2019   
10/7/2019  172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)  10/7/2019   
10/3/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/4/2019   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
8/20/2019  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  8/22/2019   
8/14/2019  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/14/2019   
8/8/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  8/9/2019   
NOTE: Supplemental Request for Discovery 
8/7/2019  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  8/12/2019   
NOTE: TEMPORARY/ 
8/7/2019  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  8/12/2019   
8/7/2019  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  8/12/2019   
8/5/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/5/2019   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
7/2/2019  599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  7/2/2019   
6/27/2019  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  6/28/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING 
6/27/2019  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  6/28/2019   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTIONS UPON CONVICTION IN A CURRENTLY PENDING CASE 
6/27/2019  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  6/28/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
6/27/2019  AFL - Allegation of Felony Committed While on Release/ Enhanced Sentencing - Party (001)  6/28/2019   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF FELONY COMMITTED WHILE ON RELEASE/ ENHANCED SENTENCING PURSUANT TO A.R.S § 13-708(D) 
6/4/2019  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  6/4/2019   
5/31/2019  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  6/3/2019   
5/29/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  5/30/2019   
NOTE: Supplemental Request for Discovery 
5/23/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  5/24/2019   
NOTE: Supplemental Request for Discovery 
5/23/2019  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  5/24/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Defenses, Witnesses and Exhibits And Request for Rebuttal Witnesses 
5/17/2019  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  5/17/2019   
5/3/2019  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  5/3/2019   
5/3/2019  NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)  5/3/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING 
5/3/2019  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  5/6/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
5/3/2019  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  5/6/2019   
5/3/2019  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  5/6/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
5/3/2019  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  5/6/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
5/2/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  5/2/2019   
NOTE: Request for Discovery 
5/2/2019  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  5/2/2019   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NOT GUILTY PLEA 
4/30/2019  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  4/30/2019   
NOTE: LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
4/26/2019  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  4/26/2019   
4/26/2019  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  4/26/2019   
NOTE: IA Packet 
4/26/2019  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  4/29/2019   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
4/26/2019  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  4/29/2019   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
4/24/2019  14:00   Initial Appearance 
4/30/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
5/1/2019  13:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
5/3/2019  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
5/10/2019  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
5/30/2019  8:45   Status Conference 
6/24/2019  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
7/24/2019  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
8/5/2019  8:45   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
8/7/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
10/1/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
10/7/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
10/8/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
10/30/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
11/18/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/8/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/15/2020  8:00   Trial 
2/27/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/5/2020  8:00   Trial 
6/29/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/7/2020  9:15   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/9/2020  8:00   Trial 
7/14/2020  8:00   Trial 
8/11/2020  10:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/18/2020  8:00   Trial 
10/13/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/27/2020  11:00   Trial 
11/3/2020  15:30   Settlement Conference 
12/16/2020  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/5/2021  11:00   Trial