« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, T R L East Valley
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Kassidy Rae Woodworth - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Dosdall, John
Judge
Lindstrom
Case #
CR2019-116828-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Kassidy Rae Woodworth
Crime Date
1/31/2019
Date
7/12/2019
Description
THEFT-CONTROL PROPERTY
ARSCode
13-1802A1 (M)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Kassidy Rae Woodworth
Crime Date
1/31/2019
Date
7/12/2019
Description
THEFT-CONTROL PROPERTY
ARSCode
13-1802A1 (M)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2021
Description
ODM - Order of Discharge from Probation - Misdemeanor Designation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
4/28/2021
Description
ODM - Order of Discharge from Probation - Misdemeanor Designation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2
Filing Date
4/28/2021
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
3/19/2021
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
12/30/2020
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1 DENIED
Filing Date
12/30/2020
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/31/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2/DENIED
Filing Date
11/30/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO THE ADULT PROBATION DEPARTMENT’S PETITION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
12/23/2019
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT STATUS CONFERENCE BE VACATED
Filing Date
12/6/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO VACATE STATUS
CONFERENCE
Filing Date
11/4/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTITUTION
Filing Date
10/24/2019
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTITUTION
Filing Date
9/27/2019
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2019
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
9/18/2019
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
9/18/2019
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
9/18/2019
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
9/18/2019
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
9/18/2019
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
9/10/2019
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
7/17/2019
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2019
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
INFORMATION
Filing Date
7/12/2019
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2019
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2019
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
4/22/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
4/22/2019
Description
NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
4/17/2019
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
4/17/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
4/17/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2019
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/29/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/29/2019
Time
8:33
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/6/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/6/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/29/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/3/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
7/12/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/12/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/16/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
9/18/2019
Time
8:15
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/10/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference