Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, T R L East Valley      
Carl Joseph Tromberi - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Krejci, Kathryn   Master Calendar  CR2019-114923-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Carl Joseph Tromberi  13-1504A1 (F6)  CRIM TRESP 1ST DEG-RES STRUCT  4/3/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  4/15/2019 
Carl Joseph Tromberi  13-1504A1 (F6)  CRIM TRESP 1ST DEG-RES STRUCT  4/3/2019  Dismis Mental Incompeten  Dismissed Due To Mental Incompetence  9/24/2019 
Carl Joseph Tromberi  13-1402A (M1)  INDECENT EXPOSURE  4/3/2019  Dismis Mental Incompeten  Dismissed Due To Mental Incompetence  9/24/2019 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/4/2019  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  10/8/2019   
9/26/2019  124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)  9/26/2019   
9/19/2019  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  9/19/2019   
9/12/2019  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  9/12/2019   
8/22/2019  124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)  8/22/2019   
7/10/2019  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  7/11/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
7/3/2019  124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)  7/3/2019   
6/25/2019  SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)  7/2/2019   
6/25/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  7/10/2019   
NOTE: MEDICAL REPORT DR LESLIE DANA-KIRBY DATED 05/15/2019 
6/25/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  7/10/2019   
NOTE: MEDICAL REPORT DR SARAH GALLIMORE DATED 05/22/2019 
6/25/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  7/10/2019   
NOTE: MEDICAL REPORT DR RICK WEBSTER DATED 06/18/2019 
6/17/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  6/17/2019   
6/14/2019  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  6/17/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
6/6/2019  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  6/11/2019   
6/5/2019  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  6/6/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
5/31/2019  122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)  5/31/2019   
5/30/2019  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  6/3/2019   
5/30/2019  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  6/3/2019   
5/30/2019  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  6/3/2019   
5/28/2019  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  5/29/2019   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
5/23/2019  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  5/24/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
5/23/2019  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  5/24/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 703 or A.R.S. § 13-704 
5/23/2019  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  5/24/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING 
5/23/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/24/2019   
NOTE: NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE 
5/16/2019  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/20/2019   
5/15/2019  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/20/2019   
5/15/2019  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/21/2019   
5/15/2019  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  5/20/2019   
5/3/2019  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  5/9/2019   
4/25/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  4/25/2019   
4/23/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  4/25/2019   
4/23/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  4/25/2019   
4/23/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  4/25/2019   
4/23/2019  ORD - Order - Party (001)  4/25/2019   
NOTE: RULE 11 / OF APPOINTMENT 
4/22/2019  120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)  4/22/2019   
4/19/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/19/2019   
NOTE: Defendants ARS § 13-4433 Notice Of Request For Defense Interview With Victim(S) 
4/19/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/19/2019   
NOTE: Motion And Order For Disclosure Of 911 Tapes And/Or Radio Broadcasts 
4/19/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  4/19/2019   
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.1 Request For Disclosure  
4/19/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/19/2019   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE 
4/19/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/19/2019   
NOTE: MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF SPECIFIC ITEMS OF EVIDENCE 
4/17/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/17/2019   
4/17/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/17/2019   
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXAMINATION OF DEFENDANTS MENTAL CONDITION 
4/16/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  4/17/2019   
NOTE: CONTINUITY OF CARE PLAN 
4/12/2019  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  4/15/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
4/12/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/15/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: rule 2.3 victim identifier information form 
4/12/2019  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  4/15/2019   
4/12/2019  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  4/15/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
4/12/2019  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  4/15/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
4/10/2019  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  4/10/2019   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
4/10/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/10/2019   
NOTE: Invocation Of Fifth And Sixth Amendment Rights 
4/8/2019  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  4/8/2019   
4/8/2019  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  4/8/2019   
NOTE: IA Packet 
4/8/2019  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  4/9/2019   
4/8/2019  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  4/9/2019   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
4/4/2019  5:00   Initial Appearance 
4/11/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
4/15/2019  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
4/19/2019  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
5/28/2019  13:30   Rule 11 Hearing 
5/31/2019  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
6/25/2019  13:30   Rule 11 Hearing 
7/1/2019  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
8/20/2019  9:00   Rule 11 Hearing 
9/10/2019  9:00   Rule 11 Hearing 
9/17/2019  9:00   Rule 11 Hearing 
9/24/2019  9:00   Rule 11 Hearing