Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Stranieri, Valerie | ||
Lorenzo Enresto Sanchez - (2) |
Defendant | M | Johnson, Dakota | Coates | CR2019-114776-001 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Lorenzo Enresto Sanchez | 13-1602 (F5) | CRIMINAL DAMAGE | 4/3/2019 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/15/2019 |
Lorenzo Enresto Sanchez | 13-1203A2 (M2) | ASLT-CAUSE FEAR OF PHYS INJ | 4/3/2019 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/15/2019 |
Lorenzo Enresto Sanchez | 13-1602 (M1) | CRIMINAL DAMAGE | 4/3/2019 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/15/2019 |
Lorenzo Enresto Sanchez | 13-1203A1 (M2) | ASSAULT-INTENT/RECKLESS/INJURE | 4/3/2019 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/15/2019 |
Lorenzo Enresto Sanchez | 13-1602A1 (F6) | CRIMINAL DAMAGE-DEFACE | 4/3/2019 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 8/22/2019 |
Lorenzo Enresto Sanchez | 13-1602A1 (M1) | CRIMINAL DAMAGE-DEFACE | 4/3/2019 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 8/22/2019 |
Lorenzo Enresto Sanchez | 13-1203A1 (M2) | ASSAULT-INTENT/RECKLESS/INJURE | 4/3/2019 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 8/22/2019 |
Lorenzo Enresto Sanchez | 13-1203A2 (M2) | ASLT-CAUSE FEAR OF PHYS INJ | 4/3/2019 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 8/22/2019 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
10/10/2022 | CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001) | 10/10/2022 | |
NOTE: APD Forms | |||
10/10/2022 | ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001) | 10/10/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER OF DISCHARGE FROM PROBATION COUNT 1 REMAIN UNDESIGNATED | |||
11/27/2019 | RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001) | 12/2/2019 | |
NOTE: Request to Establish Start Date | |||
11/20/2019 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 11/21/2019 | |
10/30/2019 | SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001) | 10/30/2019 | |
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation | |||
10/28/2019 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 10/28/2019 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
10/28/2019 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 10/28/2019 | |
NOTE: Presentence Report | |||
10/28/2019 | PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001) | 10/28/2019 | |
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents | |||
10/28/2019 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 10/28/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review | |||
10/24/2019 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 10/25/2019 | |
NOTE: Sentencing Memorandum | |||
9/16/2019 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001) | 9/16/2019 | |
9/4/2019 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 9/4/2019 | |
9/4/2019 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 9/5/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM | |||
8/22/2019 | ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001) | 8/22/2019 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
8/22/2019 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 8/23/2019 | |
7/30/2019 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 7/30/2019 | |
7/29/2019 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 7/30/2019 | |
NOTE: TRIAL | |||
7/9/2019 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 7/9/2019 | |
6/28/2019 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 7/3/2019 | |
6/13/2019 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 6/17/2019 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
6/13/2019 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 6/17/2019 | |
6/13/2019 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 6/17/2019 | |
6/6/2019 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 6/6/2019 | |
6/4/2019 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 6/7/2019 | |
5/30/2019 | 123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001) | 5/30/2019 | |
5/29/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.2 Notice of Defenses and Disclosure | |||
5/29/2019 | RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001) | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING | |||
5/29/2019 | ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001) | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTIONS UPON CONVICTION IN A CURRENTLY PENDING CASE | |||
5/29/2019 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
5/29/2019 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.1 Request for Disclosure | |||
5/29/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: Invocation of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights | |||
5/29/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion to Preserve and Produce | |||
5/29/2019 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
5/29/2019 | AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001) | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704 | |||
5/29/2019 | ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001) | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS | |||
5/29/2019 | AFL - Allegation of Felony Committed While on Release/ Enhanced Sentencing - Party (001) | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF FELONY COMMITTED WHILE ON RELEASE/ ENHANCED SENTENCING PURSUANT TO A.R.S § 13-708(D) | |||
5/23/2019 | SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001) | 6/3/2019 | |
5/23/2019 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 5/28/2019 | |
NOTE: MEDICAL REPORT DR WAYNE GENERAL DATED 05/20/2019 | |||
5/23/2019 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 5/28/2019 | |
NOTE: MEDICAL REPORT DR M. DAVID MCGADY DATED 05/08/2019 | |||
4/19/2019 | 120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001) | 4/19/2019 | |
4/19/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 4/25/2019 | |
NOTE: RULE 11 / OF APPOINTMENT | |||
4/16/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 4/16/2019 | |
4/12/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/16/2019 | |
NOTE: RULE 11 EVALUATION | |||
4/12/2019 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 4/15/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/12/2019 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 4/15/2019 | |
4/12/2019 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 4/15/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/12/2019 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 4/15/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/10/2019 | 584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001) | 4/10/2019 | |
4/10/2019 | ROR - Release Order - Party (001) | 4/10/2019 | |
NOTE: $4000 CASH ONLY APPEARANCE | |||
4/5/2019 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 4/5/2019 | |
4/5/2019 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 4/5/2019 | |
4/5/2019 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 4/5/2019 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
4/5/2019 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 4/5/2019 | |
NOTE: IA Packet |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
4/3/2019 | 17:00 | Initial Appearance |
4/9/2019 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
4/9/2019 | 8:35 | Status Conference |
4/10/2019 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
4/12/2019 | 8:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
4/12/2019 | 8:33 | Status Conference |
4/12/2019 | 8:45 | Preliminary Hearing |
4/19/2019 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
5/23/2019 | 13:30 | Rule 11 Hearing |
5/23/2019 | 13:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
5/30/2019 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
6/27/2019 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
7/29/2019 | 8:30 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
8/22/2019 | 8:20 | Change Of Plea |
9/4/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/5/2019 | 8:15 | Status Conference |
9/11/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
9/26/2019 | 8:31 | Sentencing |
10/8/2019 | 8:30 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
10/28/2019 | 8:31 | Sentencing |
12/12/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/19/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |