Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   GRIMSMAN, FRANKIE      
Zachary Bryan Showers - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Cantor, David   Master Calendar  CR2019-107761-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-1508A (F2)  BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE  2/16/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/27/2019 
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-1304A3 (F2)  KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL  2/16/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/27/2019 
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-1204A2 (F3)  AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST  2/16/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/27/2019 
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-2904A6 (F6)  DISORD CONDUCT-WEAPON/INSTR  2/16/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/27/2019 
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-1202A1 (M1)  THREAT-INTIM W/INJ-DMGE PROP  2/16/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/27/2019 
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-1202A1 (M1)  THREAT-INTIM W/INJ-DMGE PROP  2/16/2019  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/27/2019 
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-1508A (F2)  BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE  2/16/2019       
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-1304A3 (F2)  KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL  2/16/2019       
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-1204A2 (F3)  AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST  2/16/2019       
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-2904A6 (F6)  DISORD CONDUCT-WEAPON/INSTR  2/16/2019       
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-1202A1 (M1)  THREAT-INTIM W/INJ-DMGE PROP  2/16/2019       
Zachary Bryan Showers  13-1202A1 (M1)  THREAT-INTIM W/INJ-DMGE PROP  2/16/2019       
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/15/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  10/15/2020   
10/14/2020  OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)  10/16/2020   
NOTE: THE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 
10/8/2020  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/8/2020   
NOTE: Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial Management Conference and Trial Date 
8/12/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  8/12/2020   
8/11/2020  ACS - Acceptance Of Service - Party (001)  8/11/2020   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE 
7/6/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  7/6/2020   
6/16/2020  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  6/16/2020   
3/19/2020  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  3/19/2020   
3/19/2020  NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)  3/20/2020   
NOTE: $5000 OAUD TI TERRU ARENAS 
3/18/2020  ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)  3/20/2020   
3/18/2020  ORD - Order - Party (001)  3/27/2020   
NOTE: RE: EXONERATING THE BOND  
3/17/2020  MEB - Motion to Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)  3/18/2020   
NOTE: Unopposed Motion to Exonerate Bond and Vacate Status Conference 
3/6/2020  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  3/6/2020   
3/5/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  3/5/2020   
2/27/2020  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  2/28/2020   
NOTE: TRIAL 
12/2/2019  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  12/2/2019   
11/18/2019  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  11/27/2019   
NOTE: TRIAL MANGMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE 
11/18/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/27/2019   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
10/15/2019  172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)  10/15/2019   
10/9/2019  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  10/9/2019   
10/7/2019  172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)  10/7/2019   
8/14/2019  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/14/2019   
8/2/2019  MCD - Motion To Consolidate - Party (001)  8/2/2019   
NOTE: Motion to Consolidate 
6/4/2019  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  6/4/2019   
5/2/2019  MEB - Motion to Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)  5/2/2019   
NOTE: Motion to Exonerate Bond 
4/30/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/3/2019   
4/30/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/3/2019   
4/30/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/3/2019   
4/30/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  5/3/2019   
4/24/2019  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/30/2019   
4/23/2019  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  4/23/2019   
4/18/2019  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/23/2019   
4/18/2019  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  4/23/2019   
4/18/2019  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/23/2019   
4/17/2019  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/22/2019   
4/10/2019  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  4/10/2019   
4/9/2019  ORD - Order - Party (001)  4/11/2019   
NOTE: THAT DEFENSE COUNSEL RESTRICT DISSEMINATIN OF PROTECTED INFO CONTAINED WITHIN OFFICERS BODY WORN CAMERAS; UNDER NO CIRCUMSTANCES IS DEFENDANT TO BE GIVEN ACESS ANY PERSONAL INFO OF THE VICTIM 
4/8/2019  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/11/2019   
NOTE: OFFICIAL 
4/8/2019  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  4/11/2019   
4/8/2019  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/11/2019   
4/4/2019  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  4/4/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Defenses, Witnesses and Exhibits And Request for Rebuttal Witnesses 
4/4/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  4/4/2019   
NOTE: Supplemental Request for Discovery 
4/3/2019  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  4/3/2019   
4/2/2019  ORD - Order - Party (001)  4/3/2019   
NOTE: THAT DEFENSE COUNSEL RESTRICT DISSEMINATION OF THE PROTECTED INFORMATION CONTAINED WITHIN OFFICERS BODY WORN CAMERAS 
4/1/2019  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  4/1/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
4/1/2019  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  4/1/2019   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
3/28/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/28/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROPOSED ORDER 
3/27/2019  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/29/2019   
3/27/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/27/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROPOSED ORDER 
3/25/2019  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/27/2019   
NOTE: TEMPORARY 
3/25/2019  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/27/2019   
3/25/2019  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  3/27/2019   
3/22/2019  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  3/25/2019   
3/21/2019  RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)  3/21/2019   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
3/13/2019  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  3/14/2019   
NOTE: CASH BAIL 
3/12/2019  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  3/12/2019   
3/5/2019  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)  3/5/2019   
NOTE: Release Order $5,000.00, 
2/26/2019  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  2/27/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
2/26/2019  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  2/27/2019   
2/26/2019  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  2/27/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
2/26/2019  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  2/27/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
2/22/2019  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)  2/25/2019   
NOTE: $5000 
2/21/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  2/22/2019   
NOTE: Request for Discovery 
2/21/2019  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  2/22/2019   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE / NOT GUILTY PLEA 
2/20/2019  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  2/20/2019   
2/20/2019  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  2/20/2019   
2/20/2019  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  2/21/2019   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
2/20/2019  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  2/21/2019   
NOTE: IA Packet 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
2/17/2019  8:00   Initial Appearance 
2/25/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
2/27/2019  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
3/5/2019  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
4/16/2019  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
5/1/2019  13:30   Status Conference 
5/15/2019  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
5/30/2019  8:45   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
6/24/2019  8:15   Status Conference 
7/10/2019  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/31/2019  8:00   Trial 
8/5/2019  8:31   Status Conference 
8/7/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
10/1/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
10/7/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
10/8/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
10/30/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
11/18/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/8/2020  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/15/2020  8:00   Trial 
2/27/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/5/2020  8:00   Trial 
3/18/2020  8:30   Status Conference 
6/29/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/7/2020  9:15   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/9/2020  8:00   Trial 
7/14/2020  8:00   Trial 
8/11/2020  10:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/18/2020  8:00   Trial 
10/13/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/27/2020  11:00   Trial 
11/3/2020  15:30   Settlement Conference 
12/16/2020  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/5/2021  11:00   Trial