Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Walsh, Robert      
Nathan Dorceus Sutherland - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Apfel, Seth   Master Calendar  CR2019-103725-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Nathan Dorceus Sutherland  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  2/1/2018  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/30/2019 
Nathan Dorceus Sutherland  13-1406A (F2)  SEXUAL ASSAULT  2/1/2018  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/30/2019 
Nathan Dorceus Sutherland  13-1406A (F2)  SEXUAL ASSAULT  2/1/2018  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  9/2/2021 
Nathan Dorceus Sutherland  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  2/1/2018  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  9/2/2021 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/23/2022  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  11/23/2022   
11/17/2022  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  11/17/2022   
10/24/2022  597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (001)  10/24/2022   
10/18/2022  REL - Reply - Party (001)  10/18/2022   
NOTE: Reply to States Response to Petition for Post-Conviction Relief 
10/11/2022  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  10/11/2022   
10/5/2022  RPP - Response to Petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)  10/7/2022   
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S PETITION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF 
9/7/2022  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/19/2022   
NOTE: TEMPORARY 
9/6/2022  197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001)  9/6/2022   
9/2/2022  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/15/2022   
9/2/2022  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/16/2022   
8/31/2022  ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)  9/2/2022   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR POSTCONVICTION RELIEF 
8/31/2022  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  9/8/2022   
7/25/2022  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  7/25/2022   
7/12/2022  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  7/12/2022   
7/12/2022  PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)  7/13/2022   
NOTE: Petition for Post Conviction Relief with Appendix 
5/19/2022  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/19/2022   
NOTE: NOTICE OF MISSING TRANSCRIPT DUE TO INADVERTENT COURT ERROR 
5/5/2022  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/9/2022   
NOTE: NOTICE REGARDING COURT’S ORDER DATED FEBRUARY 28, 2022 
3/8/2022  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  3/11/2022   
NOTE: T e r i L . V e r e s , R M R 9-2-21 
3/3/2022  PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (001)  3/8/2022   
NOTE: 12/02/2021 BY SCOTT A KINDLE 
3/1/2022  187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001)  3/1/2022   
3/1/2022  PRT – Post Conviction Relief Transcript - Party (001)  3/4/2022   
NOTE: Treva B. Colwell, RPR 05/03/2021 
1/10/2022  129 – ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Retained re: plea - Party (001)  1/10/2022   
1/10/2022  REQ - Request - Party (001)  1/11/2022   
NOTE: Request for Evidentiary Hearing Transcript 
12/20/2021  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  12/22/2021   
12/16/2021  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  12/17/2021   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
12/16/2021  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  12/17/2021   
NOTE: Sentencing Memorandum 
12/16/2021  NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)  12/17/2021   
NOTE: NOTICE REQUESTING POST-CONVICTION RELIEF 
12/6/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  12/6/2021   
12/3/2021  SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation - Party (001)  12/3/2021   
NOTE: SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation 
12/2/2021  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  12/3/2021   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR CAMERA 
12/2/2021  NLB - Notice to Licensing Board - Party (001)  12/3/2021   
NOTE: Licensing Board Notification (Restricted) 
12/2/2021  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  12/2/2021   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
12/2/2021  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  12/2/2021   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
12/2/2021  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  12/2/2021   
NOTE: Order of Confinement 
12/2/2021  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  12/2/2021   
NOTE:  
12/2/2021  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  12/2/2021   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
12/1/2021  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  12/10/2021   
11/10/2021  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  11/10/2021   
10/28/2021  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  10/28/2021   
NOTE: Request for Mitigation Hearing 
10/12/2021  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  10/12/2021   
9/28/2021  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  10/5/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 08/6/2021 
9/24/2021  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/30/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 08/05/2021 
9/24/2021  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  10/1/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 08/06/2021 
9/24/2021  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  10/1/2021   
NOTE: served 08/09/2021 
9/24/2021  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  10/1/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 08/06/2021 
9/13/2021  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  9/13/2021   
9/9/2021  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/16/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 09/01/2021 
9/9/2021  SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)  9/16/2021   
9/9/2021  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/16/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 09/01/2021 
9/9/2021  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/16/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 09/01/2021 
9/9/2021  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  9/16/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 08/04/2021 
9/9/2021  WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)  9/16/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 09/01/2021 
9/7/2021  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  9/8/2021   
NOTE: Plea Agreement 
8/25/2021  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/30/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 08/16/21 
8/25/2021  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/30/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 08/12/21 
8/25/2021  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/30/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 08/12/21 
8/25/2021  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/30/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 08/16/21 
8/24/2021  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  8/24/2021   
7/28/2021  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/2/2021   
NOTE: SERVED 07/22/21 
7/12/2021  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  7/12/2021   
7/1/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/1/2021   
NOTE: Motion to Continue 
6/30/2021  STA - Statement - Party (001)  7/1/2021   
NOTE: FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT 
6/16/2021  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  6/17/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
5/24/2021  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  5/24/2021   
5/24/2021  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  5/24/2021   
5/24/2021  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  5/25/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
5/24/2021  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  5/25/2021   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
5/14/2021  REL - Reply - Party (001)  5/17/2021   
NOTE: REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SUPPRESS AND REQUEST FOR FRANKS HEARING  
5/7/2021  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  5/7/2021   
5/6/2021  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  5/6/2021   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SUPPRESS & REQUEST FOR A FRANKS HEARING 
4/27/2021  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  4/27/2021   
4/5/2021  331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)  4/5/2021   
3/2/2021  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  3/2/2021   
2/24/2021  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  2/24/2021   
2/21/2021  REQ - Request - Party (001)  2/22/2021   
NOTE: Request to Exceed Page Limit 
2/21/2021  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/22/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO SUPPRESS & REQUEST FOR FRANKS HEARING 
11/3/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  11/3/2020   
10/30/2020  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  11/2/2020   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE FTMC AND TRIAL 
7/23/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  7/23/2020   
7/20/2020  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/21/2020   
NOTE: Motion to Continue 
6/19/2020  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  6/23/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
4/20/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  4/20/2020   
3/12/2020  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  3/12/2020   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
2/20/2020  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  2/20/2020   
2/14/2020  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  2/14/2020   
NOTE: Motion to Continue 
1/29/2020  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/29/2020   
12/4/2019  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  12/4/2019   
11/26/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  11/26/2019   
NOTE: REQUEST TO WAIVE DEFENDANT’S PRESENCE 
9/16/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/16/2019   
9/4/2019  591 - ME: Complex Case/Trial Setting - Party (001)  9/4/2019   
8/7/2019  906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)  8/7/2019   
8/6/2019  EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)  8/9/2019   
7/19/2019  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  7/19/2019   
7/16/2019  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  7/16/2019   
7/11/2019  REP - Report - Party (001)  7/12/2019   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
7/9/2019  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)  7/10/2019   
7/9/2019  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  7/10/2019   
6/28/2019  088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (001)  6/28/2019   
6/27/2019  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)  6/27/2019   
5/24/2019  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  5/24/2019   
5/21/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/23/2019   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
5/7/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/7/2019   
4/12/2019  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  4/12/2019   
NOTE: Maricopa County Sheriff Paul Penzones Response to Defendants Motion to Remove Restraints and Dress Out Client for all Hearings 
4/1/2019  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  4/1/2019   
3/28/2019  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/2/2019   
3/27/2019  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/29/2019   
3/27/2019  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/29/2019   
3/27/2019  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  3/29/2019   
3/26/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/26/2019   
3/26/2019  REL - Reply - Party (001)  3/26/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO ORDER HIV TESTING OF DEFENDANT 
3/26/2019  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/28/2019   
3/21/2019  599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  3/21/2019   
3/20/2019  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/22/2019   
NOTE: OFFICIAL 
3/20/2019  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/22/2019   
NOTE: TEMPORARY 
3/20/2019  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  3/22/2019   
3/18/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  3/19/2019   
NOTE: Request for Experts with Indigency Affidavit 
3/18/2019  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  3/19/2019   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
3/14/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/14/2019   
NOTE: MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION 
3/14/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/14/2019   
NOTE: MOTION TO REMOVE RESTRAINTS AND DRESS OUT CLIENT FOR ALL HEARINGS AND REQUEST FOR HEARING TO ADDRESS THE ISSUE 
3/12/2019  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  3/13/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
3/12/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/13/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION 
2/28/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/28/2019   
2/27/2019  ORD - Order - Party (001)  2/28/2019   
NOTE: PURSUANT TO ARS 13-1415 THAT THE DEFENDANT BE TESTED FOR THE HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS (HIV) AND THAT THE RESULTS BE PROVIDED TO THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES 
2/26/2019  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  2/27/2019   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR HIV TESTING  
2/19/2019  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  2/22/2019   
2/19/2019  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  2/19/2019   
2/18/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/19/2019   
NOTE: MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF SPECIFIC ITEMS 
2/18/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/19/2019   
NOTE: INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS 
2/18/2019  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  2/19/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Defenses 
2/14/2019  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)  2/15/2019   
2/12/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/13/2019   
NOTE: motion for court appointed investigator 
2/6/2019  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  2/6/2019   
2/5/2019  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  2/6/2019   
2/1/2019  PTT - Petition - Party (001)  2/4/2019   
NOTE: STATE’S PETITION FOR HIV TESTING OF DEFENDANT 
1/29/2019  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  1/30/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
1/29/2019  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  1/30/2019   
1/29/2019  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  1/30/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
1/29/2019  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  1/30/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
1/29/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  1/30/2019  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFER INFORMATION FORM 
1/28/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  1/28/2019   
NOTE: FORM IV 
1/28/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/28/2019   
NOTE: TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL 
1/28/2019  ORD - Order - Party (001)  1/28/2019   
NOTE: TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL 
1/25/2019  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  1/25/2019   
1/25/2019  ORD - Order - Party (001)  1/25/2019   
NOTE: TO SEAL FORM IV 
1/25/2019  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  1/25/2019   
1/25/2019  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  1/28/2019   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
1/25/2019  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  1/28/2019   
NOTE: IA Packet 
1/25/2019  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  1/28/2019   
NOTE: IA Amended Release Order 
1/25/2019  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  1/25/2019   
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/23/2019  11:00   Initial Appearance 
1/30/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
2/1/2019  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
2/5/2019  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
3/19/2019  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
3/26/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
4/17/2019  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
5/21/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/16/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/16/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/28/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
12/2/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/18/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
2/25/2020  8:00   Trial 
4/23/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/30/2020  8:00   Trial 
7/21/2020  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/28/2020  8:00   Trial 
11/2/2020  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
11/9/2020  8:00   Trial 
2/23/2021  9:15   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/9/2021  11:00   Trial 
4/2/2021  11:00   Settlement Conference 
4/21/2021  8:45   Status Conference 
5/3/2021  9:30   Status Conference 
5/20/2021  9:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/21/2021  9:00   Evidentiary Hearing 
5/21/2021  9:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
6/3/2021  11:00   Trial 
6/11/2021  14:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
7/1/2021  9:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/20/2021  9:00   Trial 
8/9/2021  10:00   Status Conference 
9/2/2021  9:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/16/2021  9:00   Trial 
10/4/2021  10:00   Status Conference 
11/4/2021  13:30   Sentencing 
12/2/2021  13:30   Sentencing 
11/21/2022  13:30   Status Conference