Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Hovater, Emily | ||
Darius Bates Philon - (2) |
Defendant | M | Raynak, Daniel | Master Calendar | CR2019-006668-001 |
B Victim - (3) |
Victim | N/A | Telles, David | ||
B Victim - (4) |
Victim | N/A | Telles, David | ||
B Witness - (5) |
Witness | M | Cooke, Reginald |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Darius Bates Philon | 13-2904A6 (F6) | DISORD CONDUCT-WEAPON/INSTR | 5/17/2019 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/5/2021 |
Darius Bates Philon | 13-2904A6 (F6) | DISORD CONDUCT-WEAPON/INSTR | 5/17/2019 | Dismd Pros Mot | Dismissed By Prosecution Motion | 2/5/2021 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
2/17/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 2/18/2021 | |
2/11/2021 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001) | 2/11/2021 | |
2/11/2021 | 081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001) | 2/11/2021 | |
2/1/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/1/2021 | |
2/1/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 2/1/2021 | |
2/1/2021 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 2/2/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO DISMISS AND QUASH WARRANT OR SUMMONS | |||
2/1/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001) | 2/2/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS AND QUASH WARRANT OR SUMMONS | |||
1/25/2021 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001) | 1/25/2021 | |
1/25/2021 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 1/25/2021 | |
1/22/2021 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 1/25/2021 | |
NOTE: Response to States Motion to Preclude Character Evidence | |||
1/21/2021 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001) | 1/21/2021 | |
1/21/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 1/22/2021 | |
NOTE: JOINT FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
1/21/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 1/22/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE CHARACTER WITNESSES | |||
1/20/2021 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001) | 1/20/2021 | |
1/19/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 1/20/2021 | |
NOTE: Defendants Request to allow out of state character witnesses to testify via Zoom-Telephonic | |||
12/3/2020 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001) | 12/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Fifth Supplemental Witness List | |||
11/20/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 11/20/2020 | |
11/20/2020 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 11/20/2020 | |
11/20/2020 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001) | 11/20/2020 | |
11/16/2020 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001) | 11/16/2020 | |
11/12/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 11/12/2020 | |
11/10/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 11/10/2020 | |
NOTE: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
11/9/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 11/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants Motion to Return Property | |||
11/9/2020 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 11/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Fourth Supplemental Exhibit List | |||
11/5/2020 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001) | 11/5/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants Third Supplemental Witness List | |||
10/22/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 10/22/2020 | |
10/22/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 10/15/2020 | |||
10/21/2020 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001) | 10/21/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants Request to Keep All Subpoenas In Effect For Evidentiary Hearing | |||
10/19/2020 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 10/19/2020 | |
NOTE: Response to States Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing | |||
10/19/2020 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: Reply to Response to Request to Have an OSC Hearing Set Against Charles Richard Fulton | |||
10/16/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 10/16/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING | |||
10/14/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 10/15/2020 | |
NOTE: OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION | |||
10/14/2020 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 10/15/2020 | |
10/7/2020 | AIN - Amended Indictment - Party (001) | 10/14/2020 | |
10/6/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 10/6/2020 | |
10/5/2020 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 10/6/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants Response to States Motion to Amend Indictment or Information | |||
10/5/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 10/6/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REQUEST TO HAVE AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SET AGAINST CHARLES RICHARD FULTON | |||
10/5/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 10/6/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENT TO REQUEST TO HAVE AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SET AGAINST CHARLES RICHARD FULTON | |||
10/5/2020 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 10/6/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: IMPROPER OPINION EVIDENCE | |||
10/5/2020 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 10/6/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARINESS/MIRANDA HEARING | |||
10/5/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 10/5/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S SECOND MOTION TO DEPOSE | |||
10/5/2020 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 10/5/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF NOTICE AS TO ACTUAL CRIME VICTIMS AND/OR DUPLICITOUS CHARGING | |||
10/2/2020 | SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001) | 10/8/2020 | |
10/1/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 10/1/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
10/1/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 10/2/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION REGARDING MIRANDA VIOLATION AND VOLUNTARINESS | |||
9/30/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 10/1/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
9/29/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 9/30/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO AMEND THE INDICTMENT | |||
9/28/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 9/28/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants Motion Re Disclosure of Interview and Memo to Prior Attorney | |||
9/25/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 9/28/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants Motion to Depose | |||
9/24/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 9/25/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
9/24/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 9/24/2020 | |
9/22/2020 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 9/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants Second Supplemental Witness List | |||
9/21/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 9/22/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARINESS/MIRANDA HEARING | |||
9/21/2020 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001) | 9/22/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Notice as to Actual Crime Victims and or Duplicitous Charging | |||
9/17/2020 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 9/23/2020 | |
9/16/2020 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 9/23/2020 | |
9/16/2020 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 9/23/2020 | |
9/16/2020 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 9/23/2020 | |
9/13/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 9/14/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
7/31/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 8/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Final Trial Management Conference Joint Pretrial Statement | |||
7/29/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 7/29/2020 | |
6/26/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 6/26/2020 | |
6/24/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 6/25/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
6/19/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 6/22/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
4/30/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 4/30/2020 | |
3/24/2020 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 3/25/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
3/20/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 3/20/2020 | |
3/11/2020 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001) | 3/12/2020 | |
NOTE: Supplemental Witness List | |||
3/10/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 3/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Unopposed Motion To Continue Trial | |||
3/10/2020 | STP - Stipulation - Party (001) | 3/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel | |||
3/4/2020 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/4/2020 | |
3/3/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 3/4/2020 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT | |||
2/10/2020 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 2/10/2020 | |
2/3/2020 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 2/7/2020 | |
NOTE: RETURN RECEIPT FOR THE TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS OR EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY, LOCAL RULE 2.8(E) | |||
1/30/2020 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 1/31/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES | |||
1/24/2020 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 1/28/2020 | |
1/24/2020 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 1/28/2020 | |
1/24/2020 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 1/29/2020 | |
NOTE: TRANSCRIPT OF GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS | |||
1/16/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 1/16/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of appearance on behalf of victims | |||
1/14/2020 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 1/15/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
1/14/2020 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 1/15/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
12/31/2019 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 12/31/2019 | |
12/20/2019 | ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (001) | 12/20/2019 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
12/20/2019 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 12/23/2019 | |
12/12/2019 | SUM - Summons - Party (001) | 12/12/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: served 12/2/2019 | |||
12/11/2019 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 12/13/2019 | |
12/9/2019 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 12/13/2019 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
12/9/2019 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 12/13/2019 | |
12/9/2019 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 12/16/2019 | |
12/5/2019 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 12/10/2019 | |
11/22/2019 | 600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001) | 12/13/2019 | |
11/22/2019 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 12/13/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/22/2019 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 12/13/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
12/20/2019 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
1/31/2020 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
3/3/2020 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
3/30/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/6/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
4/29/2020 | 8:31 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/6/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
7/13/2020 | 8:31 | Pre-Trial Conference |
7/20/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
8/3/2020 | 8:31 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/10/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
9/21/2020 | 8:31 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/5/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
10/5/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/20/2020 | 11:00 | Trial |
10/26/2020 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
10/26/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/6/2020 | 10:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/16/2020 | 10:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/1/2020 | 11:00 | Trial |
1/21/2021 | 8:31 | Pre-Trial Conference |
1/22/2021 | 10:15 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/4/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |