Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Logue, Ann | ||
Arlena M Willes - (2) |
Defendant | F | Debrigida, Ronald | Fish | CR2019-005397-001 |
B Victim - (3) |
Victim | N/A | To Be Determined |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Arlena M Willes | 13-3623A1 (F2) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 10/27/2017 | Guilty By Jury | Guilty By Jury | 6/18/2021 |
Arlena M Willes | 13-3623A1 (F2) | CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT | 10/27/2017 | Guilty By Jury | Guilty By Jury | 6/18/2021 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
9/8/2023 | 187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001) | 9/8/2023 | |
7/14/2023 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 7/14/2023 | |
6/26/2023 | MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001) | 6/27/2023 | |
NOTE: APD Forms | |||
6/14/2023 | PTT - Petition - Party (001) | 6/16/2023 | |
NOTE: PETITION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION | |||
6/13/2023 | 099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001) | 6/13/2023 | |
5/31/2023 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001) | 6/5/2023 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR MINOR CRIME VICTIM | |||
11/29/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 11/29/2022 | |
10/28/2022 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 10/31/2022 | |
NOTE: CRIME VICTIM'S RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
10/27/2022 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 10/28/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF PROBATION TO ALLOW CONTACT | |||
10/2/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 10/4/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF PROBATION TO ALLOW CONTACT | |||
8/11/2022 | 197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001) | 8/11/2022 | |
7/25/2022 | 187 - ME: PCR: Order/Ruling - Party (001) | 7/25/2022 | |
7/18/2022 | ETP - Motion to Extend Time for filing petition for Post Conviction Relief - Party (001) | 7/19/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING PETITION FOR POSTCONVICTION RELIEF | |||
6/1/2022 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 6/2/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Compliance Re: Appellate File | |||
5/18/2022 | 596 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: trial - Party (001) | 5/18/2022 | |
5/18/2022 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001) | 5/19/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL | |||
5/18/2022 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001) | 5/19/2022 | |
5/2/2022 | NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001) | 5/3/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Request for Post-Conviction Relief | |||
11/30/2021 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 11/30/2021 | |
11/23/2021 | WAV - Waiver - Party (001) | 12/1/2021 | |
NOTE: OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL | |||
11/19/2021 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001) | 11/19/2021 | |
11/10/2021 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001) | 11/12/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND STAYING APPEAL FOR COLEMAN HEARNG | |||
10/14/2021 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 10/15/2021 | |
NOTE: PUBLIC DEFENDER | |||
9/23/2021 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 9/24/2021 | |
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL | |||
9/20/2021 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001) | 9/21/2021 | |
9/17/2021 | AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001) | 9/20/2021 | |
9/17/2021 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001) | 9/20/2021 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
8/17/2021 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/30/2021 | |
8/16/2021 | 099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001) | 8/16/2021 | |
8/16/2021 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 8/24/2021 | |
8/16/2021 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/24/2021 | |
8/16/2021 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/24/2021 | |
8/11/2021 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001) | 8/12/2021 | |
8/10/2021 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 8/11/2021 | |
NOTE: NOTIFICATION NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED | |||
8/9/2021 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001) | 8/10/2021 | Defendant (2) |
8/5/2021 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001) | 8/9/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF APPEAL AND DEFENSE COUNSEL’S MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |||
8/3/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 8/9/2021 | |
7/27/2021 | SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001) | 7/27/2021 | |
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation | |||
7/26/2021 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 7/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
7/26/2021 | ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001) | 7/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Bond Exoneration | |||
7/26/2021 | TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001) | 7/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Terms and Conditions of Probation | |||
7/26/2021 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 7/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Presentence Report | |||
7/26/2021 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 7/26/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
7/26/2021 | PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001) | 7/26/2021 | |
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents | |||
7/21/2021 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 7/28/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S SENTENCING MEMO | |||
6/18/2021 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 6/18/2021 | |
6/18/2021 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 6/18/2021 | |
6/18/2021 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 6/18/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | EMF - Email Filed - Party (001) | 6/21/2021 | |
6/14/2021 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 6/22/2021 | |
6/10/2021 | WSH - Worksheet - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: TRIAL / HEARING | |||
6/9/2021 | JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001) | 6/18/2021 | |
6/9/2021 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
6/9/2021 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
6/9/2021 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: FINAL | |||
6/8/2021 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: #9 | |||
6/8/2021 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: #10 | |||
6/8/2021 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: #11 | |||
6/8/2021 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: #12 | |||
6/8/2021 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: #13 | |||
6/8/2021 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 6/8/2021 | |
6/8/2021 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 6/8/2021 | |
6/8/2021 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 6/8/2021 | |
6/8/2021 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 6/8/2021 | |
6/8/2021 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 6/8/2021 | |
6/8/2021 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 6/8/2021 | |
6/7/2021 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: #7 | |||
6/7/2021 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: #8 | |||
6/4/2021 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 6/14/2021 | |
6/3/2021 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: #6 | |||
6/1/2021 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: #5 | |||
5/28/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 6/1/2021 | |
NOTE: CRIME VICTIM'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: VICTIM'S MEDICAL RECORDS | |||
5/27/2021 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 6/2/2021 | |
5/27/2021 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 6/8/2021 | |
5/27/2021 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 6/10/2021 | |
5/27/2021 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: #1 | |||
5/27/2021 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: #2 | |||
5/27/2021 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: #3 | |||
5/27/2021 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: #4 | |||
5/26/2021 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: PRELIMINARY | |||
5/26/2021 | 085 - ME: Conference - Party (001) | 5/26/2021 | |
5/26/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 5/26/2021 | |
5/25/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 5/26/2021 | |
NOTE: BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE ADMISSIBILITY OF VICTIM’S STATEMENTS TO OLIVIA DOUMA | |||
5/24/2021 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 5/26/2021 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: PETITION TO REMOVE INEFFECTIVE COUNSEL RICK TOSTO AND GRANT ME A CONTINUANCE AND A NEW PUBLIC DEFENDER | |||
5/18/2021 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001) | 5/19/2021 | |
5/18/2021 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001) | 5/19/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL AS PREMATURE | |||
5/14/2021 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 5/14/2021 | |
5/13/2021 | 085 - ME: Conference - Party (001) | 5/13/2021 | |
5/11/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 5/11/2021 | |
NOTE: FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
5/11/2021 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 5/12/2021 | |
NOTE: FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
5/7/2021 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 5/7/2021 | |
5/6/2021 | PTT - Petition - Party (001) | 5/6/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S PETITION TO MODIFY OR REVOKE DEFENDANT'S RELEASE | |||
4/26/2021 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001) | 4/26/2021 | |
4/21/2021 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 4/26/2021 | |
4/19/2021 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001) | 4/19/2021 | |
4/15/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL | |||
4/13/2021 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 4/13/2021 | |
4/11/2021 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 4/13/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE DEFENDANT'S OTHER CRIMES, WRONGS OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(b), ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE | |||
4/11/2021 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 4/12/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO STATE'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE DIMINISHED CAPACITY DEFENSE | |||
4/11/2021 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 4/12/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO STATE'S MOTION IN LIMINE: STATEMENTS OF DEFENDANT | |||
4/7/2021 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001) | 4/7/2021 | |
4/5/2021 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001) | 4/6/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001) | 4/2/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE DEFENDANT’S OTHER CRIMES, WRONG OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(b), ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE | |||
4/2/2021 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 4/2/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION IN LIMINE: STATEMENTS OF DEFENDANT | |||
4/2/2021 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001) | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: DISMISSING APPEAL AS PREMATURE | |||
4/1/2021 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 4/2/2021 | |
NOTE: NOTIFICATION OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED | |||
4/1/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/2/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE DIMINISHED CAPACITY DEFENSE | |||
3/22/2021 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001) | 3/23/2021 | Defendant (2) |
3/9/2021 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/9/2021 | |
3/3/2021 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 3/3/2021 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
2/5/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 2/5/2021 | |
2/3/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 2/5/2021 | |
NOTE: TO SCHEDULE A PRE TRIAL DEFENSE INTERVIEW | |||
2/1/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/2/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR COURT ORDER COMPELLING DOCTORS AND OTHER HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS TO PROVIDE PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION IN PRETRIAL INTERVIEWS, DEPOSITIONS, AND TRIAL TESTIMONY | |||
2/1/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/2/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR COURT ORDER COMPELLING DOCTORS AND OTHER HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS TO PROVIDE PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION IN PRETRIAL INTERVIEWS, DEPOSITIONS, AND TRIAL TESTIMONY | |||
1/19/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 1/19/2021 | |
1/13/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 1/14/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
12/1/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 12/1/2020 | |
11/23/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 11/23/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
11/22/2020 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 11/23/2020 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090 | |||
10/2/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 10/2/2020 | |
9/17/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 9/17/2020 | |
9/14/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 9/14/2020 | |
9/10/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 9/11/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
8/28/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 8/28/2020 | |
8/27/2020 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 8/28/2020 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: LETTER | |||
8/24/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/25/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE AND REQUEST FOR ORDER TO REMOVE | |||
8/20/2020 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 8/20/2020 | |
7/23/2020 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 7/23/2020 | |
7/16/2020 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 7/20/2020 | |
NOTE: COMPELLING DCS/OCWI WITNESS TO PARTICIPATE IN DEFENSE INTERVIEW AND TRIAL TESTIMONY | |||
7/8/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/10/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO ORDER DCS/OCWI WITNESS TO PARTICIPATE IN DEFENSE INTERVIEW AND TESTIFY AT TRIAL PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §8-807(B) | |||
7/8/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/10/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO ORDER DCS/OCWI WITNESS TO PARTICIPATE IN DEFENSE INTERVIEW AND TESTIFY AT TRIAL PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §8-807(B) | |||
6/12/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 6/12/2020 | |
6/8/2020 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 6/8/2020 | |
6/8/2020 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 6/8/2020 | |
6/5/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 6/5/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO ADMONISH DEFENDANT AND REQUEST FOR ORDER TO REMOVE | |||
6/3/2020 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 6/8/2020 | |
NOTE: RELEASE JUVENILE COURT RECORDS | |||
6/1/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 6/2/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR RELEASE OF INFORMATION | |||
5/28/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/29/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR RELEASE OF INFORMATION | |||
5/6/2020 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 5/6/2020 | |
5/4/2020 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 5/5/2020 | |
NOTE: CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT | |||
3/18/2020 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001) | 3/18/2020 | |
3/10/2020 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 3/10/2020 | |
3/9/2020 | 123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001) | 3/9/2020 | |
3/4/2020 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001) | 3/5/2020 | |
NOTE: $25,000.00, | |||
3/3/2020 | SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001) | 3/16/2020 | |
3/3/2020 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 3/17/2020 | |
NOTE: MEDICAL REPORT: DR. M. DAVID MCGADY DATED 01/18/2020 | |||
3/3/2020 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 3/17/2020 | |
NOTE: MEDICAL REPORT: DR. LESLIE DANA-KIRBY DATED 02/24/2020 | |||
3/3/2020 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 3/17/2020 | |
NOTE: MEDICAL REPORT: DR. CAMILLE HERNANDEZ DATED 02/28/2020 | |||
3/3/2020 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001) | 3/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order/$25,000 | |||
3/3/2020 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001) | 3/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw | |||
2/13/2020 | 021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001) | 2/13/2020 | |
2/10/2020 | 122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001) | 2/10/2020 | |
1/16/2020 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 1/16/2020 | |
1/8/2020 | AEB - Affidavit for Exoneration of Bond - Party (001) | 1/13/2020 | |
1/7/2020 | OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001) | 1/23/2020 | |
12/19/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 12/20/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S PRO PER MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
12/11/2019 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 12/13/2019 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: WRIT TO DISMISS CASE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION | |||
11/26/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 11/26/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S PRO PER MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
11/22/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 11/26/2019 | |
NOTE: RULE 11/OF APPOINTMENT | |||
11/21/2019 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 11/26/2019 | Defendant (2) |
11/21/2019 | 120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001) | 11/21/2019 | |
11/19/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 11/20/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENSE MOTION FOR FULL RULE 11 EVALUATION | |||
11/18/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 11/18/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |||
10/1/2019 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 10/1/2019 | |
9/26/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 9/27/2019 | |
NOTE: Crime Victim Representatives Motion in Support of States Motion for Reconsideration | |||
9/25/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 9/26/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |||
9/17/2019 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001) | 9/18/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE DEFENDANT’S SELF-REPRESENTATION | |||
9/12/2019 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 9/13/2019 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS WITH EXTREME PREJUDICE FOR CAUSE | |||
9/4/2019 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 9/10/2019 | |
9/3/2019 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 9/3/2019 | |
8/30/2019 | WAV - Waiver - Party (001) | 9/3/2019 | |
NOTE: OF COUNSEL | |||
8/27/2019 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/29/2019 | |
8/27/2019 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 8/28/2019 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: RE DISMISSING FABRICATED CASE WITH EXTREME PREJUDICE | |||
8/27/2019 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/29/2019 | |
8/27/2019 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 8/29/2019 | |
8/20/2019 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001) | 8/20/2019 | |
8/20/2019 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 8/21/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
8/20/2019 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 8/21/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
8/5/2019 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 8/6/2019 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR VICTIM AND ASSERTION OF VICTIM’S CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS | |||
8/2/2019 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 8/6/2019 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: NOTICE REGARDING CASE | |||
8/1/2019 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/5/2019 | |
7/31/2019 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 8/2/2019 | |
7/31/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 7/31/2019 | |
7/31/2019 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/2/2019 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
7/31/2019 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/2/2019 | |
7/30/2019 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 7/30/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.1 Request for Disclosure | |||
7/30/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 7/30/2019 | |
NOTE: INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS | |||
7/30/2019 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 7/30/2019 | |
NOTE: Request for Disclosure of Specified Items from the Police Report (Rules 15.1(b), 15.1(e) ) | |||
7/30/2019 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 7/30/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.2 Notice of Defenses and Disclosure; Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses | |||
7/25/2019 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 7/25/2019 | |
7/24/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/25/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S PRO PER MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
7/22/2019 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001) | 7/22/2019 | |
7/22/2019 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: NOTICE | |||
7/19/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 7/22/2019 | |
NOTE: that this matter be designated complex pursuant to rule 8.2 | |||
7/17/2019 | BON - Bond - Party (001) | 7/22/2019 | |
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY BOND $25,000 BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY | |||
7/15/2019 | WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001) | 7/15/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: 07/12/2019 | |||
7/15/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/16/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION | |||
7/13/2019 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 7/15/2019 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
7/13/2019 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 7/15/2019 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
7/9/2019 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 7/10/2019 | |
6/28/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 7/16/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICITM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM | |||
6/28/2019 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 7/16/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
6/28/2019 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 7/16/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
6/28/2019 | 604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001) | 7/16/2019 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
7/13/2019 | 5:00 | Initial Appearance |
7/19/2019 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
8/30/2019 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
8/30/2019 | 9:00 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
9/30/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
9/30/2019 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
11/19/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
1/7/2020 | 9:00 | Rule 11 Hearing |
2/4/2020 | 9:00 | Rule 11 Hearing |
3/3/2020 | 9:00 | Rule 11 Hearing |
3/5/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/12/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
3/12/2020 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
3/16/2020 | 8:35 | Status Conference |
5/5/2020 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
6/8/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/10/2020 | 11:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/15/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
8/12/2020 | 9:15 | Status Conference |
9/14/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/16/2020 | 9:40 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/21/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
10/1/2020 | 11:00 | Trial |
11/25/2020 | 10:10 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/10/2020 | 11:00 | Trial |
1/14/2021 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
1/28/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
3/4/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
4/12/2021 | 9:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
4/15/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
4/21/2021 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
5/5/2021 | 8:40 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/10/2021 | 14:30 | Trial |
5/12/2021 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
5/18/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
5/24/2021 | 9:30 | Trial |
5/25/2021 | 10:00 | Trial |
5/25/2021 | 14:00 | Status Conference |
5/25/2021 | 14:00 | Status Conference |
5/26/2021 | 10:00 | Trial |
5/27/2021 | 10:00 | Trial |
6/1/2021 | 10:00 | Trial |
6/2/2021 | 10:00 | Trial |
6/3/2021 | 10:00 | Trial |
6/7/2021 | 10:00 | Trial |
6/8/2021 | 10:00 | Trial |
6/9/2021 | 10:00 | Trial |
6/14/2021 | 10:00 | Trial |
6/15/2021 | 10:00 | Trial |
6/16/2021 | 10:00 | Trial |
6/17/2021 | 10:00 | Trial |
7/26/2021 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
7/26/2021 | 8:40 | Status Conference |
11/23/2021 | 10:15 | Status Conference |