« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Brady, Tiffany
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Richard Adam Cruz - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
CASTILLO, ALFONSO
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2019-001461-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Richard Adam Cruz
Crime Date
9/23/2018
Date
10/15/2019
Description
MANSLAUGHTER-RECKLESS
ARSCode
13-1103A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2020
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2020
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/13/2020
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
1/10/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Document Filing
Filing Date
1/10/2020
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
1/10/2020
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
1/10/2020
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/10/2020
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/10/2020
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
1/9/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DOCUMENT FILING
Filing Date
1/9/2020
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sentencing Memorandum
Filing Date
1/8/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Document Filing
Filing Date
11/22/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2019
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
10/1/2019
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Document Filing
Filing Date
9/26/2019
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Settlement Conference Memorandum
Filing Date
9/25/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Filing Date
9/3/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Complex Case Management Conference
Filing Date
7/19/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2019
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2019
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR COMPLEX
CASE DESIGNATION
Filing Date
4/1/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2019
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFICIAL
Filing Date
3/20/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
3/20/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2019
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2019
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2019
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
3/7/2019
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/26/2019
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
2/15/2019
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
02/14/2019
Filing Date
2/15/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
2/15/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
2/12/2019
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/12/2019
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/12/2019
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2019
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/14/2019
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
2/21/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/5/2019
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/7/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
5/15/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
5/22/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/15/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/18/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/27/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
10/10/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/15/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/15/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
10/17/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/18/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/10/2020
Time
10:30
Event
Sentencing