Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Minicozzi, Michael | ||
Edward Maldonado - (2) |
Defendant | M | Rothman, Michael | Myers | CR2019-001197-001 |
B Witness - (3) |
Witness | M | Neff, Rhonda |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Edward Maldonado | 13-1406A (F2) | SEXUAL ASSAULT | 6/27/2014 | Guilty By Jury | Guilty By Jury | 2/1/2023 |
Edward Maldonado | 13-1404A (F5) | SEXUAL ABUSE | 6/27/2014 | Guilty By Jury | Guilty By Jury | 2/1/2023 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
5/11/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 5/11/2023 | |
5/5/2023 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 5/8/2023 | |
NOTE: Public Defender | |||
4/26/2023 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 4/27/2023 | |
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL | |||
4/19/2023 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001) | 4/20/2023 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
4/19/2023 | AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001) | 4/20/2023 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
4/19/2023 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 4/20/2023 | |
NOTE: DIVISION ONE | |||
4/13/2023 | DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (001) | 4/17/2023 | |
NOTE: Amended Designation of Record for Appeal | |||
4/4/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 4/4/2023 | |
4/3/2023 | DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (001) | 4/7/2023 | |
NOTE: Designation of Record for Appeal | |||
3/28/2023 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 4/18/2023 | |
3/27/2023 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 4/27/2023 | |
3/27/2023 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 4/24/2023 | |
3/27/2023 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 4/25/2023 | |
3/21/2023 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001) | 3/21/2023 | |
3/21/2023 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/22/2023 | |
NOTE: APPELLATE COURT NOTICE | |||
3/17/2023 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 3/20/2023 | |
3/7/2023 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/8/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTIFICATION OF NOTICE APPEAL FILED | |||
3/6/2023 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 3/6/2023 | |
3/6/2023 | SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation - Party (001) | 3/6/2023 | |
NOTE: SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation | |||
3/6/2023 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 3/7/2023 | |
NOTE: STATE’S AMENDED SENTENCING MEMORANDUM | |||
3/5/2023 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001) | 3/6/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appeal | |||
3/3/2023 | INJ - Injunction - Party (001) | 3/6/2023 | |
NOTE: Injunction | |||
3/3/2023 | NLB - Notice to Licensing Board - Party (001) | 3/6/2023 | |
NOTE: Licensing Board Notification (Restricted) | |||
3/3/2023 | VIS - Victim Information Sheet - Party (001) | 3/6/2023 | |
3/3/2023 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 3/3/2023 | |
NOTE: Presentence Report | |||
3/3/2023 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 3/3/2023 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
3/3/2023 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 3/3/2023 | |
NOTE: | |||
3/3/2023 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 3/3/2023 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
3/3/2023 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 3/3/2023 | |
NOTE: Order of Confinement | |||
3/2/2023 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 3/6/2023 | |
NOTE: SENTENCING MEMORANDUM | |||
2/24/2023 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 2/27/2023 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM | |||
2/3/2023 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 2/3/2023 | |
2/3/2023 | NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001) | 2/6/2023 | |
NOTE: EDWARD MALDONADO $35,000.00 | |||
2/2/2023 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 2/2/2023 | |
2/2/2023 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 2/10/2023 | |
2/1/2023 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
2/1/2023 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
2/1/2023 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 2/1/2023 | |
2/1/2023 | RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001) | 2/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
2/1/2023 | JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001) | 2/6/2023 | |
2/1/2023 | ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001) | 2/7/2023 | |
2/1/2023 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 2/8/2023 | |
NOTE: OVERSIZE SEALED MANILLA ENVELOPES X 3 CONSTITUTING COMPLETED JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES; JURY TRIAL 1/17/2023 | |||
2/1/2023 | WSH - Worksheet - Party (001) | 2/10/2023 | |
NOTE: JURY TRIAL | |||
1/31/2023 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 | |
1/30/2023 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 1/30/2023 | |
1/27/2023 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 1/27/2023 | |
1/27/2023 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 1/27/2023 | |
1/26/2023 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 | |
NOTE: #6 | |||
1/26/2023 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 | |
NOTE: #7 | |||
1/26/2023 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 | |
NOTE: #8 | |||
1/24/2023 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 1/24/2023 | |
1/23/2023 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 | |
NOTE: #5 | |||
1/20/2023 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 1/20/2023 | |
1/20/2023 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 1/20/2023 | |
1/19/2023 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 | |
NOTE: COUNT 2 | |||
1/19/2023 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 | |
NOTE: #4 | |||
1/19/2023 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 | |
NOTE: #3 | |||
1/18/2023 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 | |
NOTE: #1 | |||
1/18/2023 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 1/30/2023 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: LETTER | |||
1/17/2023 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 2/9/2023 | |
NOTE: PRELIMINARY | |||
1/3/2023 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 1/3/2023 | |
12/31/2022 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 1/4/2023 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION IN LIMINE RE: VICTIM FACEBOOK MESSAGES | |||
12/26/2022 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 12/27/2022 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION IN LIMINE RE: VICTIM FACEBOOK MESSAGES | |||
11/18/2022 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001) | 11/18/2022 | |
11/16/2022 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 11/16/2022 | |
11/15/2022 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 11/15/2022 | |
10/10/2022 | 331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001) | 10/10/2022 | |
10/10/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 10/10/2022 | |
10/6/2022 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001) | 10/6/2022 | |
9/30/2022 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001) | 9/30/2022 | |
9/29/2022 | 331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001) | 9/29/2022 | |
9/27/2022 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 9/27/2022 | |
9/9/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
9/6/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 9/6/2022 | |
9/2/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 9/2/2022 | |
9/2/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 9/2/2022 | |
9/2/2022 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 9/15/2022 | |
9/1/2022 | WSH - Worksheet - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: JURY TRIAL | |||
9/1/2022 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 9/14/2022 | |
9/1/2022 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 10/11/2022 | |
NOTE: JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES | |||
9/1/2022 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: IMPASSE | |||
9/1/2022 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1 - UNSIGNED | |||
9/1/2022 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: COUNT 2 - UNSIGNED | |||
9/1/2022 | JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001) | 9/8/2022 | |
9/1/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #4 | |||
9/1/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #3 | |||
9/1/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #2 | |||
9/1/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #1 | |||
8/30/2022 | 021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001) | 8/30/2022 | |
8/30/2022 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: FINAL | |||
8/29/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
8/29/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
8/29/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #13 | |||
8/29/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #12 | |||
8/29/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #18 | |||
8/29/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #17 | |||
8/29/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #16 | |||
8/26/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 8/26/2022 | |
8/25/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 8/25/2022 | |
8/25/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 8/25/2022 | |
8/24/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #11 | |||
8/24/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #10 | |||
8/24/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #9 | |||
8/23/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #7 | |||
8/23/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #5 | |||
8/23/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #6 | |||
8/23/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #4 | |||
8/23/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #8 | |||
8/20/2022 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 8/22/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION IN LIMINE RE: WITNESS A. PEREZ | |||
8/19/2022 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 8/19/2022 | |
8/19/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 8/19/2022 | |
8/19/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 8/19/2022 | |
8/18/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #3 | |||
8/18/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #2 | |||
8/18/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: #1 | |||
8/17/2022 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: PRELIMINARY | |||
8/16/2022 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 8/17/2022 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS | |||
8/15/2022 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 8/15/2022 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTIONS IN LIMINE | |||
8/15/2022 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 8/16/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION IN LIMINE | |||
8/15/2022 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 8/16/2022 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FACILITY DOG | |||
8/15/2022 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 8/16/2022 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS IN LIMINE | |||
8/14/2022 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 8/15/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE | |||
8/12/2022 | 331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001) | 8/12/2022 | |
8/12/2022 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 8/15/2022 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTIONS IN LIMINE | |||
8/11/2022 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001) | 8/11/2022 | |
8/8/2022 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 8/9/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
7/26/2022 | RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 7/28/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE'S REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS | |||
7/19/2022 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 7/19/2022 | |
7/17/2022 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 7/18/2022 | |
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
7/12/2022 | PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001) | 7/18/2022 | |
7/12/2022 | CER - Certificate - Party (001) | 7/20/2022 | |
NOTE: SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS | |||
7/8/2022 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001) | 7/12/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw as Knapp Counsel | |||
5/31/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 5/31/2022 | |
5/27/2022 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 5/31/2022 | |
NOTE: Declaration | |||
4/26/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 4/26/2022 | |
4/26/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 4/26/2022 | |
4/19/2022 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 4/19/2022 | |
4/15/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/18/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO TRAVEL | |||
4/6/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 4/11/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial | |||
3/31/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 3/31/2022 | |
3/21/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 3/24/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial | |||
1/31/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 1/31/2022 | |
1/25/2022 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 2/2/2022 | |
1/24/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 1/26/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
1/18/2022 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001) | 1/18/2022 | |
1/11/2022 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001) | 1/11/2022 | |
1/7/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 1/7/2022 | |
1/5/2022 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 1/6/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO RECONSIDER | |||
12/27/2021 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001) | 12/28/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion for Reconsideration | |||
12/7/2021 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001) | 12/7/2021 | |
12/3/2021 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 12/6/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
11/16/2021 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 11/16/2021 | |
10/7/2021 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001) | 10/7/2021 | |
9/27/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 9/27/2021 | |
9/13/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 9/13/2021 | |
9/13/2021 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 9/13/2021 | |
9/9/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 9/10/2021 | |
NOTE: RECORDS FROM JABURG WILK | |||
9/9/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 9/10/2021 | |
NOTE: RECORDS FROM JONES, SKELTON & HOCHULI, P.L.C. | |||
9/8/2021 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001) | 9/8/2021 | |
9/7/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 9/15/2021 | |
NOTE: SERVED 08/25/2021 | |||
9/3/2021 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001) | 9/7/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |||
8/30/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 9/3/2021 | |
NOTE: SERVED 08/23/21 | |||
8/30/2021 | CER - Certificate - Party (001) | 9/3/2021 | |
NOTE: SERVED 08/23/2021 | |||
8/24/2021 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 8/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Defendants Notice of Errata to Correct Inadvertent Error | |||
8/19/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 8/19/2021 | |
8/19/2021 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001) | 8/19/2021 | |
8/18/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/31/2021 | |
NOTE: GRANTING REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY | |||
8/16/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 8/16/2021 | |
8/16/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 8/16/2021 | |
8/12/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/19/2021 | |
NOTE: FOR TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION OF BARRY GERARD BROOME | |||
8/12/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/19/2021 | |
NOTE: REGARDING REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY | |||
8/12/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/13/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR DEPOSITION OF BARRY GERARD BROOME | |||
8/10/2021 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 8/12/2021 | |
NOTE: WITNESS ALEJANDRO PEREZ’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY | |||
8/10/2021 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 8/12/2021 | |
NOTE: Reply to Witness Alejandro Perez's Response to Defendant's Request for Discovery | |||
8/6/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 8/6/2021 | |
8/6/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 8/6/2021 | |
8/6/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 8/6/2021 | |
8/5/2021 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 8/5/2021 | |
8/4/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 8/10/2021 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY | |||
7/31/2021 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 8/4/2021 | |
NOTE: Witness Counsels Notice of Change of Address | |||
7/30/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/5/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION OF BARRY GERARD BROOME | |||
7/30/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/5/2021 | |
7/28/2021 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001) | 7/28/2021 | |
7/28/2021 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 7/29/2021 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY’S OFFICE FOR CONFLICT OF INTEREST AND THE APPEARANCE OF IMPROPRIETY | |||
7/21/2021 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 7/21/2021 | |
7/21/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/27/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR DEPOSITION OF BARRY GERARD BROOME | |||
7/20/2021 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 7/22/2021 | |
NOTE: TO DISQUALIFY THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR CONFLICT OF INTEREST AND APPEARANCE OF IMPROPRIETY | |||
7/20/2021 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 7/23/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION IN LIMINE RE: EVIDENCE OF PAST SEXUAL CONDUCT/RAPE SHIELD STATUTE | |||
7/20/2021 | MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (001) | 7/26/2021 | |
NOTE: WITNESS ALEJANDRO PEREZ’S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS | |||
7/20/2021 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 7/26/2021 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR WITNESS ALEJANDRO PEREZ | |||
7/20/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 7/26/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS PRESCRIBED BY RULE 1.9, ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE | |||
7/15/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 7/16/2021 | |
NOTE: Unopposed Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing and Trial | |||
7/12/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 7/13/2021 | |
NOTE: Second Request for Supplemental Disclosure | |||
7/9/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 7/12/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing | |||
7/7/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/8/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO DISQUALIFY THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY’S OFFICE FOR CONFLICT OF INTEREST AND APPEARANCE OF IMPROPRIETY | |||
7/1/2021 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 7/2/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES | |||
7/1/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 7/2/2021 | |
NOTE: First Request for Supplemental Disclosure | |||
6/3/2021 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 6/3/2021 | |
6/2/2021 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 6/3/2021 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE RE: STATE’S MOTION TO PRESENT OTHER ACTS COMMITTED BY THE DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO RULE 404(B) AND (C), ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE | |||
6/2/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 6/2/2021 | |
6/2/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 6/2/2021 | |
5/25/2021 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 5/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Response to States Motion to present other acts committed by the defendant | |||
5/25/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 5/28/2021 | |
NOTE: GRANTING THE MOTION | |||
5/21/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 5/24/2021 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL TO UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE | |||
5/14/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 5/17/2021 | |
NOTE: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE | |||
5/12/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/12/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion for Depositions | |||
5/10/2021 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 5/10/2021 | |
4/19/2021 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 4/20/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTIONS IN LIMINE | |||
4/5/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 4/5/2021 | |
3/31/2021 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/31/2021 | |
NOTE: Declaration | |||
3/30/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 3/31/2021 | |
NOTE: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE | |||
1/28/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 1/28/2021 | |
1/26/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 1/27/2021 | |
NOTE: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE | |||
1/19/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 1/19/2021 | |
1/19/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 1/22/2021 | |
NOTE: ON URGENT MOTION TO REMOVE ANKLE MONITOR | |||
1/12/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 1/12/2021 | |
NOTE: UNOPPOSED URGENT MOTION TO REMOVE ANKLE MONITOR | |||
1/12/2021 | ROR - Release Order - Party (001) | 1/12/2021 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/17/2020 | 331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001) | 11/17/2020 | |
11/3/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 11/3/2020 | |
10/28/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 10/28/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE | |||
9/17/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 9/17/2020 | |
9/14/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 9/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Final Trial Management Conference and Trial | |||
7/23/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 7/23/2020 | |
7/13/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 7/14/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Final Trial Management Conference and Trial | |||
6/12/2020 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 6/12/2020 | |
6/11/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 6/12/2020 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |||
4/28/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 4/28/2020 | |
4/20/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 4/21/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
2/12/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 2/12/2020 | |
2/11/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 2/12/2020 | |
NOTE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE REQUEST FORM | |||
2/4/2020 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 2/5/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
11/27/2019 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 11/27/2019 | |
11/22/2019 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 11/25/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial | |||
9/20/2019 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 9/20/2019 | |
9/18/2019 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 9/19/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial | |||
8/21/2019 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 8/22/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
7/26/2019 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 7/29/2019 | |
NOTE: Limited Notice of Appearance | |||
7/25/2019 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 7/25/2019 | |
7/24/2019 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 7/24/2019 | |
7/23/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 7/24/2019 | |
NOTE: MODIFYING RELEASE CONDITIONS | |||
7/22/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion for 24 Hour Removal of Electronic Monitoring Device | |||
7/5/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/5/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO PRESENT AT TRIAL EVIDENCE OF OTHER ACTS COMMITTED BY THE DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO RULE 404(B) AND (C), ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE | |||
4/25/2019 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 4/25/2019 | |
3/25/2019 | 599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/25/2019 | |
3/5/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/5/2019 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES | |||
2/28/2019 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001) | 2/28/2019 | |
2/22/2019 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 2/27/2019 | |
2/21/2019 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 2/22/2019 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY | |||
2/21/2019 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 2/25/2019 | |
2/21/2019 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 2/25/2019 | |
2/21/2019 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 2/25/2019 | |
2/19/2019 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 2/20/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND RULE 12.9 DEADLINE | |||
2/14/2019 | 099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001) | 2/14/2019 | |
2/14/2019 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 2/15/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
2/14/2019 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 2/15/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
2/7/2019 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001) | 2/7/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW PUBLIC DEFENDER’S OFFICE FROM REPRESENTATION | |||
2/5/2019 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 2/5/2019 | |
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 02/04/2019 | |||
2/4/2019 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 2/8/2019 | |
NOTE: FINANCIAL | |||
2/4/2019 | ROR - Release Order - Party (001) | 2/4/2019 | |
NOTE: $35,000 CASH ONLY | |||
1/31/2019 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001) | 1/31/2019 | |
1/29/2019 | NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001) | 1/30/2019 | |
NOTE: $35000 | |||
1/28/2019 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 1/29/2019 | |
1/24/2019 | WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001) | 1/24/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: 01/23/2019 | |||
1/15/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 1/25/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM | |||
1/15/2019 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 1/25/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
1/15/2019 | 604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001) | 1/25/2019 | |
1/15/2019 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 1/25/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
2/4/2019 | 8:45 | Arraignment Hearing |
3/18/2019 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
4/16/2019 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
4/22/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
7/22/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
9/19/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/30/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
11/25/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/2/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
2/11/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/18/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
3/27/2020 | 10:00 | Settlement Conference |
5/5/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/12/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
6/11/2020 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
7/14/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
7/15/2020 | 9:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
7/21/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
9/17/2020 | 11:15 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/23/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
10/28/2020 | 10:20 | Pre-Trial Conference |
11/12/2020 | 11:00 | Trial |
11/12/2020 | 13:30 | Settlement Conference |
1/12/2021 | 16:00 | Hearing Pending Motion |
1/27/2021 | 9:15 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/9/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
3/31/2021 | 9:10 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/15/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
5/6/2021 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
6/1/2021 | 10:00 | Change Of Plea |
6/2/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/4/2021 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
6/4/2021 | 10:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/15/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/17/2021 | 9:00 | Trial |
7/16/2021 | 8:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
7/29/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/4/2021 | 8:45 | Oral Argument |
8/12/2021 | 9:00 | Trial |
8/16/2021 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
8/18/2021 | 11:00 | Oral Argument |
9/9/2021 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
9/10/2021 | 11:00 | Oral Argument |
9/23/2021 | 9:45 | Status Conference |
9/24/2021 | 10:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/24/2021 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
10/7/2021 | 9:00 | Trial |
11/15/2021 | 8:31 | Complex / Capital Case |
12/3/2021 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
1/7/2022 | 11:00 | Oral Argument |
1/27/2022 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/15/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
3/29/2022 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/14/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
5/24/2022 | 8:35 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/25/2022 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/27/2022 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/7/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
7/14/2022 | 8:50 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/9/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
8/9/2022 | 10:00 | Trial |
8/10/2022 | 9:00 | Settlement Conference |
8/16/2022 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
8/16/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
8/17/2022 | 10:31 | Trial |
8/18/2022 | 10:31 | Trial |
8/22/2022 | 10:31 | Trial |
8/23/2022 | 10:31 | Trial |
8/24/2022 | 10:31 | Trial |
8/25/2022 | 10:31 | Trial |
8/29/2022 | 10:31 | Trial |
8/30/2022 | 10:31 | Trial |
8/31/2022 | 10:31 | Trial |
9/1/2022 | 10:31 | Trial |
9/6/2022 | 10:31 | Trial |
9/7/2022 | 10:31 | Trial |
9/8/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
9/20/2022 | 9:30 | Status Conference |
9/28/2022 | 10:00 | Settlement Conference |
10/5/2022 | 14:30 | Settlement Conference |
10/17/2022 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
10/25/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
11/8/2022 | 10:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
11/8/2022 | 10:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
11/15/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
12/15/2022 | 11:00 | Trial |
1/9/2023 | 10:30 | Trial |
1/17/2023 | 10:30 | Trial |
1/18/2023 | 10:30 | Trial |
1/19/2023 | 10:30 | Trial |
1/23/2023 | 10:30 | Trial |
1/25/2023 | 13:30 | Trial |
1/26/2023 | 10:30 | Trial |
1/30/2023 | 10:30 | Trial |
1/31/2023 | 10:30 | Trial |
2/1/2023 | 10:30 | Trial |
2/2/2023 | 10:30 | Trial |
2/6/2023 | 10:30 | Trial |
2/7/2023 | 10:30 | Trial |
2/8/2023 | 10:30 | Trial |
2/9/2023 | 10:30 | Trial |
3/3/2023 | 10:00 | Sentencing |