« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Blackman, Martha
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Margarito Valencia Rodriguez - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Cooke, Reginald
Judge
Schwartz
Case #
CR2018-148310-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2018-148310-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Margarito Valencia Rodriguez
Crime Date
3/29/2018
Date
10/10/2018
Description
FAIL TO STAY/WITH DEATH/INJURY
ARSCode
28-661B (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Margarito Valencia Rodriguez
Crime Date
10/1/2018
Date
10/10/2018
Description
FALSE REPORT TO LAW ENFORCE
ARSCode
13-2907.01A (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Margarito Valencia Rodriguez
Crime Date
3/29/2018
Date
1/18/2019
Description
FAIL TO STAY/WITH DEATH/INJURY
ARSCode
28-661B (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Margarito Valencia Rodriguez
Crime Date
10/1/2018
Date
1/18/2019
Description
FALSE REPORT TO LAW ENFORCE
ARSCode
13-2907.01A (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2024
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
1/29/2024
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
2/26/2019
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2019
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2019
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
2/21/2019
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
2/21/2019
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
2/21/2019
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
2/21/2019
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement Jail
Filing Date
2/21/2019
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
1/25/2019
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2019
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2018
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
12/6/2018
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2018
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/8/2018
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF
Filing Date
11/6/2018
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
11/6/2018
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2018
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFICIAL
Filing Date
10/24/2018
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
10/18/2018
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2018
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2018
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
$5000
Filing Date
10/9/2018
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/9/2018
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2018
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/9/2018
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/4/2018
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/4/2018
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/4/2018
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2018
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/2/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
10/9/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/12/2018
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/16/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
11/28/2018
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/20/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/18/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
2/1/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
2/7/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/14/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/21/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing