Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Loudenslagel, Kate | ||
Jon-Christopher Marcus Clark - (2) |
Defendant | M | Terry, Keith | Master Calendar | CR2018-144722-001 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Jon-Christopher Marcus Clark | 13-2809A1 (F6) | TAMP W/PHY EVID-DESTROY/ALTER | 8/4/2018 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 9/17/2018 |
Jon-Christopher Marcus Clark | 13-1104A1 (F1) | MURDER 2ND DEG-INTENTIONAL | 8/4/2018 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 9/17/2018 |
Jon-Christopher Marcus Clark | 13-1104A1 (F1) | MURDER 2ND DEG-INTENTIONAL | 8/4/2018 | Remand To Grand Jury | Remand To Grand Jury | 12/13/2018 |
Jon-Christopher Marcus Clark | 13-2809 (F6) | TAMPERING W/PHYSICAL EVIDENCE | 8/4/2018 | Remand To Grand Jury | Remand To Grand Jury | 12/13/2018 |
Jon-Christopher Marcus Clark | 13-1104A1 (F1) | MURDER 2ND DEG-INTENTIONAL | 8/4/2018 | Disms By Defense Motion | Dismissed By Defense Motion | 3/30/2020 |
Jon-Christopher Marcus Clark | 13-2809A1 (F6) | TAMP W/PHY EVID-DESTROY/ALTER | 8/4/2018 | Disms By Defense Motion | Dismissed By Defense Motion | 3/30/2020 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
1/4/2022 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 1/6/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE'S 404 (B) NOTICE (12/10/21) | |||
5/13/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 5/13/2020 | |
5/8/2020 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 5/11/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS REPLY: RE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION | |||
4/30/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 5/5/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION | |||
4/16/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 4/16/2020 | |
4/15/2020 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001) | 4/15/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION | |||
4/6/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 4/6/2020 | |
4/3/2020 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 4/7/2020 | |
4/1/2020 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 4/2/2020 | |
3/31/2020 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 4/2/2020 | |
3/31/2020 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001) | 3/31/2020 | |
3/26/2020 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001) | 3/26/2020 | |
3/25/2020 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 3/26/2020 | |
NOTE: Reply: Motion to dismiss RE: Speedy trial | |||
3/25/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 3/25/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS: SPEEDY TRIAL | |||
3/25/2020 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 3/26/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO STATES SUPPLEMENTAL ARGUMENT TO ORAL ARGUMENT HELD MARCH 24, 2020 | |||
3/24/2020 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001) | 3/24/2020 | |
3/24/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/25/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL ARGUMENT TO ORAL ARGUMENT HELD MARCH 24, 2020 | |||
3/24/2020 | WSH - Worksheet - Party (001) | 3/26/2020 | |
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING | |||
3/22/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 3/23/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE: LATE WITNESSES | |||
3/20/2020 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 3/20/2020 | |
NOTE: Reply: Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice: Cumulative sanctions motion for the states bad faith negligence in managing both witnesses and discovery obligations | |||
3/20/2020 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 3/20/2020 | |
NOTE: Reply: Motion to preclude experts Don Miesle | |||
3/20/2020 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001) | 3/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to dismiss: Speedy Trial | |||
3/17/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 3/17/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 3/16/2020 | |||
3/17/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 3/17/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 3/16/2020 | |||
3/16/2020 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 3/16/2020 | |
3/13/2020 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 3/13/2020 | |
3/12/2020 | ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001) | 3/12/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
3/11/2020 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 3/12/2020 | |
NOTE: STATES MOTION IN LIMINE RE: FARAH BITZA-RAY | |||
3/11/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 3/13/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 030520 | |||
3/11/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 3/13/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 030520 | |||
3/11/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 3/13/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 030620 | |||
3/11/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 3/13/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 030520 | |||
3/11/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 3/13/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 030620 | |||
3/11/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE: CUMULATIVE SANCTIONS MOTION FOR THE STATE’S BAD FAITH NEGLIGENCE IN MANAGING BOTH WITNESSES AND DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS | |||
3/11/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: motion to preclude late witnesses | |||
3/11/2020 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
3/11/2020 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: STATES MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANT’S SELF-SERVING HEARSAY | |||
3/11/2020 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 3/12/2020 | |
NOTE: STATES MOTIONS IN LIMINE | |||
3/11/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PRECLUDE WITNESS DON MIESLE | |||
3/11/2020 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
3/10/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1 | |||
3/10/2020 | AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 708(A) | |||
3/10/2020 | AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 708(A) | |||
3/10/2020 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
3/10/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE | |||
3/10/2020 | ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS | |||
3/10/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: supplement motion to preclude experts RE Don Miesle | |||
3/10/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S EMERGENCY MOTION TO UNREDACT SILENT WITNESS REPORTS | |||
3/10/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE EXPERTS | |||
3/10/2020 | RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING | |||
3/10/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S FOURTH NOTICE OF POENTIAL TRIAL WITNESS | |||
3/9/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 3/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Emergency motion to unredact silent witness reports | |||
3/9/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 3/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to preclude: All February 12, 2020 experts | |||
3/9/2020 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001) | 3/9/2020 | |
3/9/2020 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001) | 3/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to dismiss with prejudice Emergency hearing requested | |||
3/9/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/10/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S THIRD NOTICE OF POTENTIAL TRIAL WITNESSES LIST | |||
3/9/2020 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001) | 3/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to dismiss with Prejudice Cumulative sanctions motion for the States bad faith negligence in managing both witnesses and discovery obligations | |||
3/6/2020 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 3/9/2020 | |
NOTE: TO FILE UNDER SEAL | |||
3/6/2020 | WSH - Worksheet - Party (001) | 3/16/2020 | |
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING | |||
3/6/2020 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 3/17/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING | |||
3/5/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 3/5/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to File Under Seal | |||
3/4/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 3/5/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Compel Detective Anderlas Communication | |||
3/4/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 3/5/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPEL | |||
3/4/2020 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 3/4/2020 | |
3/4/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 3/4/2020 | |
3/4/2020 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 3/4/2020 | |
3/3/2020 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 3/4/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL | |||
3/2/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 3/2/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION REGARDING COURT’S DENIAL OF DEFENDANT’S REQUEST TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE OF DETECTIVE HALL’S EMPLOYMENT RECORDS | |||
3/2/2020 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001) | 3/2/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SECOND NOTICE OF POTENTIAL TRIAL WITNESSES LIST | |||
3/2/2020 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 3/5/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL | |||
3/2/2020 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 3/5/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING | |||
2/28/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/28/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO PRECLUDE WITNESS TESTIMONY UNDER DAUBERT | |||
2/28/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/28/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 022820 | |||
2/28/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/28/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPEL WESTRY WILTONS COMMUNICATIONS AND DRAFT TIMELINES | |||
2/28/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 3/2/2020 | |
NOTE: SUBPOENA SERVED 02/05/20 | |||
2/28/2020 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 3/2/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
2/27/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/27/2020 | |
2/27/2020 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001) | 2/27/2020 | |
2/18/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/18/2020 | |
2/14/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/14/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 02/14/2020 | |||
2/12/2020 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 2/13/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
2/12/2020 | NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001) | 2/13/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO ADMIT EVIDENCE OF OTHER ACTS PURSUANT TO 404(B) | |||
2/12/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 2/13/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE WITNESSES | |||
2/7/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to preclude witnesses Noncompliance with court order | |||
2/6/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/6/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 2/6/2020 | |||
2/6/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/6/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 2/6/2020 | |||
2/6/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/6/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 2/6/2020 | |||
2/6/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/7/2020 | |
NOTE: SUBPOENA SERVED 02/06/20 | |||
2/6/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/7/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 02/06/2020 | |||
2/6/2020 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 2/6/2020 | |
2/5/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/6/2020 | |
NOTE: SUBPOENA SERVED 02/05/2020 | |||
2/5/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/6/2020 | |
NOTE: SUBPOENA SERVED 02/05/2020 | |||
2/5/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/6/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 02/05/2020 | |||
2/5/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/5/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 2/5/2020 | |||
2/5/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/5/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 0205220 | |||
2/5/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/5/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 020520 | |||
2/4/2020 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 2/7/2020 | |
NOTE: REGARDING RELEASE OF EVIDENCE FOR DEFENSE TESTING | |||
1/31/2020 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 1/31/2020 | |
1/27/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 1/27/2020 | |
1/24/2020 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 1/27/2020 | |
NOTE: Reply Request for preclusion or deposition of Detective Hall and request for employment information | |||
1/23/2020 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 1/24/2020 | |
NOTE: Reply: Request for Daubert hearing/Preclusion: Detective Siverio | |||
1/21/2020 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 1/22/2020 | |
NOTE: STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRECLUSION; IN THE ALTERNATIVE DEPOSITION | |||
1/21/2020 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 1/22/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR A DAUBERT HERING/MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OF DETECTIVE SIVERIO | |||
1/21/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 1/22/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 15.7 | |||
1/16/2020 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001) | 1/16/2020 | |
1/16/2020 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 1/16/2020 | |
1/16/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 1/17/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF COURT ORDER REGARDING RELEASE OF EVIDENCE FOR DEFENSE TESTING | |||
1/14/2020 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 1/21/2020 | |
1/14/2020 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 1/15/2020 | |
NOTE: DIRECTING THE PHOENIX POLICE DEPARTMENT CRIME LAB TO RELEASE THE TWO CIGARETTE BUTTS AND SHIO THE ITEMS DIRECTLY TO TECHNICAL ASSOCIATES INC | |||
1/10/2020 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 1/21/2020 | |
1/10/2020 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 1/21/2020 | |
1/10/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 1/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Request for a Daubert Hearing/Motion to Preclude Testimony of Detective Siverio | |||
1/10/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 1/10/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RELEASE OF EVIDENCE FOR FORENSIC TESTING | |||
1/10/2020 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 1/13/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO EXTEND DISCLOSURE DEADLINE REGARDING EXPERT REPORT | |||
1/9/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 1/9/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 15.7 | |||
1/7/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 1/8/2020 | |
NOTE: Request for preclusion; in the alternative deposition | |||
12/19/2019 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 12/19/2019 | |
12/19/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 12/19/2019 | |
12/17/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 12/18/2019 | |
NOTE: GRANTING PETITION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
12/17/2019 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001) | 12/17/2019 | |
NOTE: Release Order $100000 | |||
12/16/2019 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 12/17/2019 | |
NOTE: Reply Motion to compel witness list | |||
12/16/2019 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 12/17/2019 | |
NOTE: Reply: Current state of discovery/Witness interviews | |||
12/16/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 12/17/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF POTENTIAL TRIAL WITNESS LIST | |||
12/16/2019 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 12/17/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL CIVILIAN WITNESS LIST | |||
12/16/2019 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 12/17/2019 | |
NOTE: Reply Motion to Compel Discovery or Request for Court Orders RE CAR and PSB Reports Related to Farah Bitza Ray | |||
12/12/2019 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 12/13/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REDETERMINE CONDITIONS OF RELEASE | |||
12/12/2019 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 12/13/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING A RESPONSE | |||
12/10/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 12/11/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE DEADLINE | |||
12/6/2019 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 12/6/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY OR REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER: RE: CAR AND PSB REPORTS RELATED TO FARAH BITZA RAY AND STATE’S REQUEST FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
11/22/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 11/25/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS | |||
11/21/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 11/21/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion to Compel Discovery or Request for Court Orders RE CAR and PSB Reports Related to Farah Bitza Ray | |||
11/21/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 11/22/2019 | |
NOTE: Request for a Disclosure Deadline | |||
11/21/2019 | AFF - Affidavit - Party (001) | 11/22/2019 | |
NOTE: Affidavit | |||
11/21/2019 | AFF - Affidavit - Party (001) | 11/22/2019 | |
NOTE: Affidavit | |||
11/21/2019 | AFF - Affidavit - Party (001) | 11/22/2019 | |
NOTE: Affidavit | |||
11/21/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 11/22/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion to Compel Civilian Witness List | |||
10/31/2019 | 591 - ME: Complex Case/Trial Setting - Party (001) | 10/31/2019 | |
10/30/2019 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001) | 10/31/2019 | |
10/30/2019 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001) | 10/31/2019 | |
NOTE: ORDER ACCEPTING JURISDICTION, DENYING RELIEF. | |||
10/29/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 10/29/2019 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |||
9/30/2019 | 081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001) | 9/30/2019 | |
9/26/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 9/27/2019 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |||
9/19/2019 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001) | 9/20/2019 | |
9/11/2019 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 9/12/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL | |||
8/26/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/27/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPEL TIMELINE CREATED BY WESTRY WILTON | |||
8/20/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 8/20/2019 | |
8/20/2019 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001) | 8/20/2019 | |
8/20/2019 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001) | 8/20/2019 | |
8/16/2019 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 8/21/2019 | |
NOTE: GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT | |||
8/16/2019 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 8/21/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENSE EXHIBITS A, B, C, D | |||
8/13/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 8/13/2019 | |
8/1/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 8/1/2019 | |
7/25/2019 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 7/25/2019 | |
7/25/2019 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 7/25/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S SECOND MOTION TO REMAND FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE AND STATE’S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT | |||
7/24/2019 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 7/26/2019 | |
7/22/2019 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.1 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY | |||
7/19/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/22/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.1 Supplemental Motion for Specific Discovery | |||
7/17/2019 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 7/17/2019 | |
7/11/2019 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 7/18/2019 | |
7/11/2019 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 7/19/2019 | |
7/11/2019 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 7/19/2019 | |
7/9/2019 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 7/9/2019 | |
7/8/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/9/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO REMAND FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE AND MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT | |||
6/27/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 6/28/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.1 Supplemental Motion for Specific Discovery | |||
6/12/2019 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 6/17/2019 | |
6/11/2019 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 6/17/2019 | |
6/11/2019 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 6/17/2019 | |
6/11/2019 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 6/17/2019 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
6/7/2019 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 6/7/2019 | |
5/24/2019 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 5/24/2019 | |
5/14/2019 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 5/15/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
5/14/2019 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 5/15/2019 | |
5/14/2019 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 5/15/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
5/14/2019 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 5/15/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
5/2/2019 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001) | 5/2/2019 | |
5/1/2019 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001) | 5/1/2019 | |
4/26/2019 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 5/1/2019 | |
NOTE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE | |||
4/26/2019 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 5/7/2019 | |
NOTE: EXHIBITS A, B, C AND D | |||
4/26/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 4/26/2019 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |||
4/19/2019 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001) | 4/19/2019 | |
4/11/2019 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 4/12/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO REMAND FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE AND STATE’S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT | |||
3/29/2019 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 4/1/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO REMAND FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE | |||
3/27/2019 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 3/27/2019 | |
3/25/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 3/26/2019 | |
NOTE: RESTRICT DISSEMINATION OF THE PROTECTED INFORMATION CONTAINED WITHIN THE SOCIAL MEDIA DATA, DENTAL RECORDS, CELLEBRITE, AND FINIANCIAL RECORDS OF THE VICTIM | |||
3/12/2019 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/12/2019 | |
3/12/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 3/13/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROPOSED ORDER | |||
3/5/2019 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 3/5/2019 | |
3/1/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 3/4/2019 | |
NOTE: RESTRICT DISSEMINATION OF THE PROTECTED INFORMATION CONTAINED WITHIN THE HARD DRIVE FULL OF DISCOVERY | |||
2/7/2019 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001) | 2/7/2019 | |
2/6/2019 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 2/6/2019 | |
2/5/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 2/6/2019 | |
NOTE: GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO FILE A MOTION TO REMAND IN THIS CASE | |||
2/4/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/5/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROPOSED ORDER | |||
2/4/2019 | RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001) | 2/5/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS THIRD REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS | |||
1/28/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 1/29/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY | |||
12/20/2018 | 591 - ME: Complex Case/Trial Setting - Party (001) | 12/20/2018 | |
12/18/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 12/19/2018 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGMENT PLAN | |||
12/18/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 12/19/2018 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |||
12/17/2018 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001) | 12/17/2018 | |
12/13/2018 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 12/14/2018 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO FILE | |||
12/10/2018 | RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001) | 12/11/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS SECOND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS | |||
11/28/2018 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 11/28/2018 | |
11/20/2018 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 11/21/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
11/14/2018 | 599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 11/14/2018 | |
11/13/2018 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001) | 11/13/2018 | |
11/5/2018 | MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001) | 11/6/2018 | |
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.1 Supplemental Motion for Specific Discovery | |||
11/5/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 11/6/2018 | |
NOTE: Invocation of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights | |||
11/5/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 11/6/2018 | |
NOTE: Motion to Preserve and Disclose Tape Recordings of 911 Tapes, Police Radio Broadcasts, and Photos, Videos from Police Body Vest Camera | |||
11/5/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 11/6/2018 | |
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.1 Request for Disclosure | |||
11/5/2018 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 11/6/2018 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
11/5/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 11/6/2018 | |
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.2 Notice of Defenses and Disclosure | |||
10/29/2018 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 10/31/2018 | |
10/26/2018 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 10/30/2018 | |
10/26/2018 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 10/30/2018 | |
10/26/2018 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 10/30/2018 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
10/24/2018 | RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001) | 10/25/2018 | |
NOTE: Defendants Request for Extension of Time to Challenge the Grand Jury Proceedings | |||
10/18/2018 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 10/18/2018 | |
9/27/2018 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 9/27/2018 | |
9/24/2018 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 9/24/2018 | |
9/21/2018 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001) | 9/21/2018 | |
NOTE: CASH ONLY APPEARANCE BOND $1,000,000 | |||
9/20/2018 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001) | 9/20/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL | |||
9/20/2018 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001) | 9/20/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S OBJECTION TO MEDIA COVERAGE | |||
9/14/2018 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 9/17/2018 | Plaintiff (1) |
9/14/2018 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 9/17/2018 | |
9/14/2018 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 9/17/2018 | Plaintiff (1) |
9/14/2018 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 9/17/2018 | Plaintiff (1) |
9/13/2018 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 9/13/2018 | |
9/13/2018 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 9/14/2018 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
9/13/2018 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 9/14/2018 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
9/13/2018 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 9/17/2018 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
9/11/2018 | 20:00 | Initial Appearance |
9/18/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
9/21/2018 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
9/21/2018 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
9/21/2018 | 8:45 | Preliminary Hearing |
10/17/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
11/6/2018 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
11/20/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
12/6/2018 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
12/18/2018 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
2/4/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/7/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
4/18/2019 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
4/26/2019 | 11:00 | Oral Argument |
5/2/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/8/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
5/21/2019 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
7/2/2019 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
7/22/2019 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
7/31/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/1/2019 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
8/7/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
8/16/2019 | 11:00 | Oral Argument |
9/26/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
10/29/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/29/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
11/6/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
12/17/2019 | 8:15 | Oral Argument |
1/30/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/6/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/13/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
2/27/2020 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
3/2/2020 | 11:00 | Status Conference |
3/6/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
3/12/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
3/12/2020 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
3/24/2020 | 11:00 | Oral Argument |
3/25/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
3/30/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
3/31/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/1/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/2/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/6/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
4/6/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/7/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/8/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/9/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/13/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/14/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/15/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/16/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/20/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/21/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/22/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/27/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/28/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/29/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
4/30/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
5/4/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
5/5/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |
5/6/2020 | 10:31 | Trial |