Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Lynas, Clayton      
Daniel James Hinton - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Public Defender-, Ccc   Master Calendar  CR2018-142587-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Daniel James Hinton  13-3102A4 (F4)  POSS WPN BY PROHIB PERSON  8/29/2018  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  9/10/2018 
Daniel James Hinton  13-3102A4 (F4)  POSS WPN BY PROHIB PERSON  8/29/2018  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  5/21/2019 
Daniel James Hinton  13-1103 (F2)  MANSLAUGHTER  2/22/2018  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  5/21/2019 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
7/2/2019  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  7/3/2019   
6/26/2019  SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)  6/26/2019   
NOTE: SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration 
6/25/2019  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  6/27/2019  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: LETTERS 
6/25/2019  OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)  6/25/2019   
NOTE: Monetary Orders 
6/25/2019  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  6/25/2019   
NOTE: Order of Confinement 
6/25/2019  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  6/25/2019   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
6/25/2019  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  6/25/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review 
6/24/2019  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  6/24/2019   
NOTE: Sentencing Memorandum 
5/24/2019  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  5/24/2019   
5/21/2019  RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)  5/21/2019   
NOTE: Release Order 
5/21/2019  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  5/22/2019   
5/17/2019  331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)  5/17/2019   
4/18/2019  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  4/18/2019   
4/15/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/15/2019   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
3/4/2019  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  3/4/2019   
2/28/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/1/2019   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MAMAGEMENT PLAN 
12/20/2018  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)  12/20/2018   
12/13/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/14/2018   
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.1 Supplemental Motion for Specific Discovery 
12/12/2018  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  12/12/2018   
12/6/2018  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  12/6/2018   
12/5/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/6/2018   
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.1 Supplemental Motion for Specific Discovery  
12/5/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/6/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO SEVER COUNTS  
12/4/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/5/2018   
NOTE: Defendants Uncontested Motion for Complex-Case Designation 
11/29/2018  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  12/3/2018  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL 
11/13/2018  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/15/2018   
11/8/2018  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/13/2018   
11/8/2018  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/13/2018   
11/8/2018  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  11/13/2018   
10/31/2018  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  10/31/2018   
10/25/2018  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  10/26/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
10/19/2018  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/23/2018   
NOTE: THE TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF 
10/17/2018  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/19/2018   
10/17/2018  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  10/19/2018   
10/17/2018  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/19/2018   
NOTE: TEMPORARY 
10/15/2018  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  10/15/2018   
9/26/2018  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  9/26/2018   
9/13/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/14/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRESERVE AND DISCLOSE RECORDED 911 CALLS, POLICE RADIO BROADCASTS, AND PHOTOS/VIDEO FROM POLICE BODY CAMERAS 
9/11/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/11/2018   
9/10/2018  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  9/12/2018   
NOTE: CONTINUITY OF CARE PLAN 
9/7/2018  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  9/10/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
9/7/2018  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  9/10/2018   
9/7/2018  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  9/10/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
9/7/2018  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  9/10/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
9/6/2018  REQ - Request - Party (001)  9/6/2018   
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.1 Request for Disclosure  
9/6/2018  MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)  9/6/2018   
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.1 Supplemental Motion for Specific Discovery  
9/6/2018  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/6/2018   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE 
9/6/2018  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  9/6/2018   
NOTE: INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS 
9/4/2018  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  9/4/2018   
9/4/2018  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  9/5/2018   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
9/4/2018  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  9/5/2018   
NOTE: IA Packet 
9/4/2018  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  9/5/2018   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
8/30/2018  11:00   Initial Appearance 
9/6/2018  8:30   Status Conference 
9/10/2018  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
9/14/2018  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
10/29/2018  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
12/4/2018  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
12/19/2018  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
1/10/2019  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/17/2019  8:00   Trial 
2/28/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/16/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/10/2019  13:30   Settlement Conference 
5/21/2019  8:18   Status Conference 
5/28/2019  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
6/3/2019  8:00   Trial 
6/25/2019  8:30   Sentencing 
7/31/2019  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/7/2019  8:00   Trial