« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Pennell, Lonnie
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Raul Perez Parra - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Lelli, Debora
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2018-131319-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Raul Perez Parra
Crime Date
6/24/2018
Date
7/3/2018
Description
FAIL TO STAY/WITH DEATH/INJURY
ARSCode
28-661B (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Raul Perez Parra
Crime Date
6/24/2018
Date
7/3/2018
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Raul Perez Parra
Crime Date
6/24/2018
Date
7/3/2018
Description
DANGEROUS DRUG-POSS/USE
ARSCode
13-3407A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Raul Perez Parra
Crime Date
6/24/2018
Date
2/25/2019
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Raul Perez Parra
Crime Date
6/24/2018
Date
2/25/2019
Description
LEAVE ACCIDENT W/DEATH/INJURY
ARSCode
28-661A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Raul Perez Parra
Crime Date
6/24/2018
Date
2/25/2019
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3415A (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2019
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2019
Description
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation
Filing Date
4/1/2019
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2019
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
4/1/2019
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
4/1/2019
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
4/1/2019
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
4/1/2019
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
4/1/2019
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
3/29/2019
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
3/29/2019
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sentencing Memorandum
Filing Date
3/1/2019
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2019
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2019
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2019
Description
RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Rule 7.2(b)/Rule 7.2(c)
RELEASE TYPE
Not Bailable As A Matter of Right
Filing Date
2/25/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/2019
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Settlement Conference Memorandum and Request for Teleconference Accommodations
Filing Date
1/10/2019
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/3/2019
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/12/2018
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
12/12/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/5/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
10/29/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING STATES MOTION FOR RELEASE OF VICTIMS MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
10/12/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR REDETERMINATION OF INDIGENCY
Filing Date
10/9/2018
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION FOR RELEASE
OF VICTIMS MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
9/24/2018
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
9/20/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/31/2018
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S 15.2 NOITCE OF DEFENSES AND LIST OF WITNESSES
Filing Date
7/17/2018
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2018
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2018
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
7/2/2018
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/2/2018
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2018
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/2/2018
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/27/2018
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2018
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
6/27/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
6/27/2018
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2018
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/25/2018
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
7/2/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/5/2018
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
7/10/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/22/2018
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/24/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
10/29/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/5/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/7/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/16/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/11/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/25/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
2/26/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
2/27/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/1/2019
Time
9:30
Event
Sentencing