Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Bizzozero, Gregory | ||
Michael Calvin Richardson - (2) |
Defendant | M | Brown, Carlos | Gantz | CR2018-127787-001 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Michael Calvin Richardson | 13-3408A2 (F2) | NARCOTIC DRUG-POSSESS FOR SALE | 6/5/2018 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/12/2018 |
Michael Calvin Richardson | 13-3408A2 (F2) | NARCOTIC DRUG-POSSESS FOR SALE | 6/5/2018 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/12/2018 |
Michael Calvin Richardson | 13-1806A (F5) | UNLAW FAIL RETURN RENTED PROP | 6/5/2018 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/12/2018 |
Michael Calvin Richardson | 13-3407A2 (F2) | DANGEROUS DRUG-POSS FOR SALE | 6/5/2018 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/12/2018 |
Michael Calvin Richardson | 13-3415A (F6) | DRUG PARAPHERNALIA-POSSESS/USE | 6/5/2018 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/12/2018 |
Michael Calvin Richardson | 13-3415A (F6) | DRUG PARAPHERNALIA-POSSESS/USE | 6/5/2018 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 6/12/2018 |
Michael Calvin Richardson | 13-3407A2 (F2) | DANGEROUS DRUG-POSS FOR SALE | 6/5/2018 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 2/7/2019 |
Michael Calvin Richardson | 13-3408A2 (F2) | NARCOTIC DRUG-POSSESS FOR SALE | 6/5/2018 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 2/7/2019 |
Michael Calvin Richardson | 13-3408A2 (F2) | NARCOTIC DRUG-POSSESS FOR SALE | 6/5/2018 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 2/7/2019 |
Michael Calvin Richardson | 13-1806A (F5) | UNLAW FAIL RETURN RENTED PROP | 6/5/2018 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 2/7/2019 |
Michael Calvin Richardson | 13-3415A (F6) | DRUG PARAPHERNALIA-POSSESS/USE | 6/5/2018 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 2/7/2019 |
Michael Calvin Richardson | 13-3415A (F6) | DRUG PARAPHERNALIA-POSSESS/USE | 6/5/2018 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 2/7/2019 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
11/3/2022 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001) | 11/4/2022 | |
10/31/2022 | DHI - Dispo: Revoke/prison - Party (001) | 10/31/2022 | |
NOTE: DHI - Disposition Order - Imprisonment | |||
10/25/2022 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 10/25/2022 | |
NOTE: | |||
10/25/2022 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 10/25/2022 | |
NOTE: Presentence Report | |||
10/25/2022 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 10/25/2022 | |
NOTE: Order of Confinement | |||
9/30/2022 | 117 - ME: Guilt New Chg/Prob Violation - Party (001) | 9/30/2022 | |
8/3/2022 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 8/3/2022 | |
8/1/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 8/2/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE NON-WITNESS VIOLATION HEARING | |||
6/15/2022 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 6/15/2022 | |
5/17/2022 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 5/17/2022 | |
4/29/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 5/2/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE NON-WITNESS VIOLATION HEARING | |||
1/21/2022 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 1/21/2022 | |
1/18/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 1/19/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE NON-WITNESS VIOLATION HEARING | |||
1/5/2022 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 1/5/2022 | |
11/16/2021 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 11/16/2021 | |
9/24/2021 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 9/24/2021 | |
8/12/2021 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 8/12/2021 | |
7/27/2021 | 099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001) | 7/27/2021 | |
7/23/2021 | OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001) | 8/3/2021 | |
7/21/2021 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001) | 7/26/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |||
7/14/2021 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 7/14/2021 | |
5/13/2021 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 5/13/2021 | |
3/10/2021 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 3/10/2021 | |
1/21/2021 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 1/21/2021 | |
1/11/2021 | 112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001) | 1/11/2021 | |
1/7/2021 | WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001) | 1/13/2021 | |
NOTE: 12/30/2020 | |||
12/31/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 12/31/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
12/31/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 12/31/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
12/31/2020 | ASN – Amended/Supp Pet/Order to Revoke Probation no warrant - Party (001) | 12/31/2020 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1 | |||
12/24/2020 | 133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (001) | 12/24/2020 | |
12/21/2020 | IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001) | 12/22/2020 | |
NOTE: Issued 2020-12-21 | |||
12/14/2020 | RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001) | 12/14/2020 | |
NOTE: | |||
12/8/2020 | 021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001) | 12/8/2020 | |
12/1/2020 | 112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001) | 12/1/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001) | 11/30/2020 | |
NOTE: | |||
11/25/2020 | WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001) | 12/2/2020 | |
NOTE: 11/13/2020 | |||
11/24/2020 | BON - Bond - Party (001) | 12/1/2020 | |
NOTE: SURETY $5000 BANKERS INSURANCE | |||
11/13/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 11/13/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
11/13/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 11/13/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
11/12/2020 | 133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (001) | 11/12/2020 | |
11/12/2020 | WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001) | 11/17/2020 | |
NOTE: 11/03/2020 | |||
11/10/2020 | IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001) | 11/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Issued 2020-11-10 | |||
11/9/2020 | BON - Bond - Party (001) | 11/16/2020 | |
NOTE: SURETY $3600 BOND UNIVERSAL FIRE AND CASUALTY | |||
11/3/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
11/3/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/27/2020 | 021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001) | 10/27/2020 | |
10/22/2020 | 133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (001) | 10/22/2020 | |
10/14/2020 | IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001) | 10/14/2020 | |
NOTE: Issued 2020-10-14 | |||
8/24/2020 | 112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001) | 8/24/2020 | |
7/24/2020 | 004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001) | 7/24/2020 | |
6/2/2020 | 004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001) | 6/2/2020 | |
4/9/2020 | 004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001) | 4/9/2020 | |
3/4/2020 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 3/4/2020 | |
3/3/2020 | WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001) | 3/9/2020 | |
NOTE: 2/25/2020 | |||
2/28/2020 | ASN – Amended/Supp Pet/Order to Revoke Probation no warrant - Party (001) | 2/28/2020 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1: | |||
2/25/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 2/25/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
2/25/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 2/25/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
1/24/2020 | PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001) | 1/24/2020 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1 Appearance Bond (Secured) set at $1,800 | |||
1/24/2020 | PVI - Probation Violation Warrant Issued - Party (001) | 1/27/2020 | |
NOTE: Issued 2020-01-24 | |||
3/20/2019 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 3/21/2019 | |
3/15/2019 | SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001) | 3/15/2019 | |
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation | |||
3/14/2019 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 3/14/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review | |||
3/14/2019 | PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001) | 3/14/2019 | |
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents | |||
3/14/2019 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 3/14/2019 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
3/14/2019 | OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001) | 3/14/2019 | |
NOTE: Order of Confinement Jail | |||
3/14/2019 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 3/14/2019 | |
NOTE: Presentence Report | |||
2/28/2019 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 3/1/2019 | |
NOTE: SENTENCING MEMORANDUM | |||
2/15/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/15/2019 | |
2/14/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/14/2019 | |
2/13/2019 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 2/14/2019 | |
NOTE: REQUEST TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS PURSUANT TO ARIZ. R. CRIM. P. 7.4(c) | |||
2/8/2019 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 2/8/2019 | |
2/7/2019 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 2/7/2019 | |
2/7/2019 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 2/15/2019 | |
2/1/2019 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 2/4/2019 | |
NOTE: FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
2/1/2019 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 2/4/2019 | |
NOTE: Requested Voir Dire | |||
2/1/2019 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 2/4/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S AMENDED AND/OR SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
2/1/2019 | RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001) | 2/4/2019 | |
NOTE: JOINT REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORM | |||
2/1/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/4/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS PURSUANT TO ARIZ. R. CRIM. P. 7.4(c) | |||
1/28/2019 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 1/29/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S AMENDED AND/OR SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
1/24/2019 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 1/24/2019 | |
1/11/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 1/11/2019 | |
12/28/2018 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 12/31/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S AMENDED AND/OR SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
12/27/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 12/27/2018 | |
NOTE: Defendants Supplemental Rule 15.2 Notice of Defenses and Disclosure | |||
12/25/2018 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 12/26/2018 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SEVER COUNTS | |||
12/25/2018 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 12/26/2018 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT’S MOTION PRECLUDE DRUG TRAFFICKING EXPERT | |||
12/24/2018 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 12/26/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE DRUG TRAFFICKING EXPERT | |||
12/21/2018 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 12/24/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION TO SEVER COUNTS | |||
12/14/2018 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001) | 12/14/2018 | |
12/13/2018 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001) | 12/13/2018 | |
12/12/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 12/13/2018 | |
NOTE: Motion to Preclude Drug Trafficking Expert | |||
12/10/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 12/11/2018 | |
NOTE: Motion to Sever Counts | |||
12/7/2018 | 196 - ME: Bond Exonerated - Party (001) | 12/7/2018 | |
12/4/2018 | ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001) | 12/6/2018 | |
11/29/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 11/30/2018 | |
NOTE: Defendants Supplemental Rule 15.2 Notice of Defenses and Disclosure | |||
11/20/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 11/21/2018 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL WITHIN PUBLIC DEFENDER’S OFFICE | |||
11/16/2018 | 331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001) | 11/16/2018 | |
11/8/2018 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 11/8/2018 | |
11/6/2018 | WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001) | 11/9/2018 | |
NOTE: SERVED 10-24-18 | |||
11/5/2018 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 11/5/2018 | |
11/2/2018 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001) | 11/2/2018 | |
10/29/2018 | AEB - Affidavit for Exoneration of Bond - Party (001) | 10/30/2018 | |
10/25/2018 | 133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (001) | 10/25/2018 | |
10/25/2018 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 10/25/2018 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/25/2018 | AEB - Affidavit for Exoneration of Bond - Party (001) | 10/25/2018 | |
NOTE: IA Bond Surrender Form | |||
10/25/2018 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 10/25/2018 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/23/2018 | IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001) | 10/24/2018 | |
NOTE: Issued 2018-10-23 | |||
10/17/2018 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 10/17/2018 | |
10/15/2018 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 10/16/2018 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |||
10/15/2018 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001) | 10/15/2018 | |
NOTE: Secured Appearance Bond $ 2700 | |||
8/29/2018 | WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001) | 8/31/2018 | |
NOTE: QUASHED 08/22/18 | |||
8/24/2018 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 8/24/2018 | |
8/24/2018 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001) | 8/24/2018 | |
8/22/2018 | BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (001) | 8/22/2018 | |
NOTE: Quashed 2018-08-22 | |||
8/22/2018 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001) | 8/22/2018 | |
NOTE: Secured Appearance Bond $ 2700 | |||
8/20/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/20/2018 | |
NOTE: Defendants Motion to Quash Bench Warrant and Reset IPTC | |||
8/15/2018 | 133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (001) | 8/15/2018 | |
8/14/2018 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 8/15/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
8/14/2018 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 8/15/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
8/14/2018 | IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001) | 8/14/2018 | |
NOTE: Issued 2018-08-14 | |||
8/8/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 8/8/2018 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE OF SPECIFIC ITEMS OF EVIDENCE | |||
8/7/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 8/7/2018 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITHIN PUBLIC DEFENDER’S OFFICE | |||
7/26/2018 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 8/1/2018 | |
7/24/2018 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 7/27/2018 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
7/24/2018 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 7/27/2018 | |
7/24/2018 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 7/30/2018 | |
7/20/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 7/23/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE | |||
7/20/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 7/23/2018 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE OF SPECIFIC ITEMS OF EVIDENCE | |||
7/20/2018 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 7/23/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.1 (a), (b), (c), (d), (e) REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
7/6/2018 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 7/6/2018 | |
7/6/2018 | BON - Bond - Party (001) | 7/10/2018 | |
NOTE: SURETY/$2700/UNIVERAL FIRE & CASUALTY | |||
7/6/2018 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 7/9/2018 | |
NOTE: SURETY BOND | |||
7/3/2018 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 7/17/2018 | |
7/3/2018 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001) | 7/3/2018 | |
NOTE: $2700 | |||
7/3/2018 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001) | 7/3/2018 | |
NOTE: $2700 | |||
7/3/2018 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001) | 7/5/2018 | |
NOTE: $2700 | |||
6/20/2018 | 173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (001) | 6/20/2018 | |
6/11/2018 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 6/12/2018 | Plaintiff (1) |
6/11/2018 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 6/12/2018 | |
6/11/2018 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 6/12/2018 | Plaintiff (1) |
6/11/2018 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 6/12/2018 | Plaintiff (1) |
6/7/2018 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 6/7/2018 | |
6/7/2018 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 6/7/2018 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
6/7/2018 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 6/8/2018 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
6/7/2018 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 6/8/2018 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
6/5/2018 | 23:00 | Initial Appearance |
6/12/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
6/15/2018 | 8:45 | Preliminary Hearing |
6/19/2018 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
7/3/2018 | 8:30 | Arraignment Hearing |
7/31/2018 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
8/14/2018 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
8/22/2018 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
8/22/2018 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
9/4/2018 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
9/11/2018 | 13:30 | Bond Forfeiture Hearing |
9/12/2018 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
10/15/2018 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
10/15/2018 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
10/23/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
10/23/2018 | 13:30 | Settlement Conference |
10/25/2018 | 5:00 | Initial Appearance |
11/1/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference - Post Warrant |
11/2/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
11/7/2018 | 15:30 | Settlement Conference |
11/15/2018 | 14:30 | Settlement Conference |
11/27/2018 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/4/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
12/4/2018 | 13:30 | Bond Forfeiture Hearing |
1/7/2019 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
1/8/2019 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
1/23/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
1/29/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
2/5/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/7/2019 | 8:30 | Change Of Plea |
2/11/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
2/21/2019 | 11:30 | Oral Argument |
3/14/2019 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
2/25/2020 | 14:00 | Initial Appearance |
3/3/2020 | 8:30 | Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing |
3/3/2020 | 8:31 | Disposition Hearing |
4/9/2020 | 8:29 | Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing |
4/9/2020 | 8:31 | Disposition Hearing |
6/1/2020 | 8:29 | Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing |
6/1/2020 | 8:31 | Disposition Hearing |
7/20/2020 | 10:29 | Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing |
7/20/2020 | 10:31 | Disposition Hearing |
8/20/2020 | 10:30 | Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing |
8/20/2020 | 10:31 | Disposition Hearing |
10/14/2020 | 10:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 11:00 | Initial Appearance |
11/10/2020 | 8:30 | Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing |
11/10/2020 | 8:31 | Disposition Hearing |
11/10/2020 | 8:31 | Disposition Hearing |
11/13/2020 | 23:00 | Initial Appearance |
11/19/2020 | 8:30 | Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing |
11/19/2020 | 8:31 | Disposition Hearing |
12/21/2020 | 10:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
12/21/2020 | 10:1 | Disposition Hearing |
12/31/2020 | 2:00 | Initial Appearance |
1/6/2021 | 8:29 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
1/6/2021 | 8:30 | Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing |
1/6/2021 | 8:31 | Disposition Hearing |
1/7/2021 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
1/12/2021 | 14:20 | Bond Forfeiture Hearing |
1/12/2021 | 14:20 | Bond Forfeiture Hearing |
1/14/2021 | 10:31 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
1/19/2021 | 10:31 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
3/4/2021 | 8:16 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
4/8/2021 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
4/8/2021 | 8:31 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
4/29/2021 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
5/10/2021 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
5/13/2021 | 11:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
8/6/2021 | 8:15 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
8/17/2021 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
9/14/2021 | 8:31 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
11/1/2021 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
12/15/2021 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
1/24/2022 | 8:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
2/24/2022 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
5/10/2022 | 9:30 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
5/24/2022 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
7/18/2022 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
8/2/2022 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
8/4/2022 | 11:20 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
9/9/2022 | 10:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
9/13/2022 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
9/21/2022 | 9:15 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
9/27/2022 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
9/27/2022 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
10/25/2022 | 10:00 | Disposition Hearing |
10/31/2022 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
11/15/2022 | 9:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |