Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Fisher, Lacey | ||
Brittany Ann Zamora - (2) |
Defendant | F | To Be Determined | Master Calendar | CR2018-114770-001 |
B Victim - (3) |
Victim | N/A | Richelsoph, Russell | ||
B Victim - (4) |
Victim | N/A | To Be Determined | ||
B Victim - (5) |
Victim | N/A | To Be Determined | ||
B Victim - (6) |
Victim | N/A | To Be Determined |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/2/2018 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/2/2018 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/2/2018 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1410A (F2) | MOLESTATION OF CHILD | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/2/2018 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/2/2018 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/2/2018 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-3506A (F4) | OBSCENE MATL-FURNISH TO MINORS | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/2/2018 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1410A (F2) | MOLESTATION OF CHILD | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/2/2018 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1403A1 (F5) | PUBLIC SEXUAL INDEC-CONTACT | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/2/2018 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/2/2018 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/2/2018 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-3506A (F4) | OBSCENE MATL-FURNISH TO MINORS | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/2/2018 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/2/2018 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/2/2018 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 4/2/2018 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 6/10/2019 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1410A (F3) | MOLESTATION OF CHILD | 9/1/2017 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 6/10/2019 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/10/2019 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/10/2019 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/10/2019 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/10/2019 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/10/2019 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/10/2019 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/10/2019 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1405A (F2) | SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/10/2019 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1410A (F2) | MOLESTATION OF CHILD | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/10/2019 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1410A (F2) | MOLESTATION OF CHILD | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/10/2019 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-3506A (F4) | OBSCENE MATL-FURNISH TO MINORS | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/10/2019 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-3506A (F4) | OBSCENE MATL-FURNISH TO MINORS | 9/1/2017 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/10/2019 |
Brittany Ann Zamora | 13-1403A (F5) | PUBLIC SEXUAL INDECENCY | 9/1/2017 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 6/10/2019 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
7/20/2022 | 099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001) | 7/20/2022 | |
7/5/2022 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001) | 7/6/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record | |||
7/24/2019 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 7/25/2019 | |
7/15/2019 | SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation - Party (001) | 7/15/2019 | |
NOTE: SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation | |||
7/15/2019 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 7/15/2019 | |
7/12/2019 | NLB - Notice to Licensing Board - Party (001) | 7/15/2019 | |
NOTE: Licensing Board Notification (Restricted) | |||
7/12/2019 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 7/12/2019 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
7/12/2019 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 7/12/2019 | |
NOTE: Presentence Report | |||
7/12/2019 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 7/12/2019 | |
NOTE: Order of Confinement | |||
7/12/2019 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 7/12/2019 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
7/12/2019 | PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001) | 7/12/2019 | |
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents | |||
7/12/2019 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 7/12/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review | |||
7/10/2019 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 7/11/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Limited Appearance by Phoenix Newspapers, Inc. | |||
7/9/2019 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party () | 7/10/2019 | |
NOTE: Amended Notice of Appearance | |||
7/5/2019 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 7/5/2019 | |
NOTE: Sentencing Memorandum, Victim Impact Statement and Request for an Award of Restitution to Victim A By and Through His Mother D Doe | |||
6/14/2019 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 6/14/2019 | |
6/12/2019 | 331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001) | 6/12/2019 | |
6/12/2019 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 6/12/2019 | |
6/10/2019 | RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001) | 6/11/2019 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
6/10/2019 | RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001) | 6/11/2019 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
6/10/2019 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 6/11/2019 | |
6/7/2019 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001) | 6/7/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw | |||
5/22/2019 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001) | 5/22/2019 | |
5/2/2019 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 5/2/2019 | |
4/29/2019 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 4/29/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial | |||
4/5/2019 | NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001) | 4/8/2019 | |
NOTE: Substitution of Counsel | |||
1/25/2019 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 1/25/2019 | |
1/15/2019 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 1/17/2019 | |
12/20/2018 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 12/20/2018 | |
12/19/2018 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 12/24/2018 | |
NOTE: THAT THE INFORMATION CONTAINED IN THE CALL PHONE EXTRACTIONS DISCLOSED BY THE MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE SHALL NOT BE DISSEMINATED TO ANYONE OTHER THAN COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANT | |||
12/18/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 12/19/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S STIPULATED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 15.5 | |||
11/2/2018 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 11/5/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
10/25/2018 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 10/25/2018 | |
10/24/2018 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 10/26/2018 | |
NOTE: TRIAL | |||
10/5/2018 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 10/8/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
8/13/2018 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 8/13/2018 | |
6/8/2018 | 591 - ME: Complex Case/Trial Setting - Party (001) | 6/8/2018 | |
5/25/2018 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 5/25/2018 | |
5/24/2018 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 5/25/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE'S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
5/24/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/25/2018 | |
NOTE: STATES/TO FILE UNDER SEAL | |||
5/24/2018 | SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001) | 5/25/2018 | |
5/24/2018 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 5/29/2018 | Victim (5) |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
5/22/2018 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 5/22/2018 | |
5/21/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/22/2018 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION | |||
5/11/2018 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 5/15/2018 | |
5/7/2018 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 5/9/2018 | |
5/7/2018 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 5/9/2018 | |
NOTE: OR TAPES PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E) | |||
5/7/2018 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 5/9/2018 | |
5/4/2018 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 5/7/2018 | |
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 04/27/18 | |||
5/4/2018 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 5/8/2018 | |
5/2/2018 | AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001) | 5/2/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13- 704 | |||
5/2/2018 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 5/2/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
4/27/2018 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 5/7/2018 | |
NOTE: MOTION | |||
4/27/2018 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 5/7/2018 | |
NOTE: ORDER | |||
4/27/2018 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 5/7/2018 | |
NOTE: FINANCIAL INFORMATION | |||
4/26/2018 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 5/1/2018 | |
4/26/2018 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 4/30/2018 | |
4/26/2018 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 5/1/2018 | |
NOTE: AUTHORIZING AND DIRECTING CLERK OF SUPERIOR COURT TO SURRENDER INTO TEMPORARY CUSTODY OF ATTY SEEKING CUSTODY OF GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT TO BE RETURNED ON OR BEFORE 05/03/18 5pm | |||
4/24/2018 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 4/24/2018 | |
NOTE: Motion to Extend time for Filing Defendants Motion to Remand | |||
4/23/2018 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 4/23/2018 | |
4/19/2018 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 4/19/2018 | |
4/16/2018 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 4/16/2018 | |
NOTE: Request for Declaration of Indigency and Eligibility for Court Appointed Experts and Investigators | |||
4/6/2018 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001) | 4/6/2018 | |
NOTE: SECURED $250,000 | |||
3/30/2018 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 4/2/2018 | Plaintiff (1) |
3/30/2018 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 4/2/2018 | |
3/30/2018 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 4/2/2018 | Plaintiff (1) |
3/30/2018 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 4/2/2018 | Plaintiff (1) |
3/30/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 4/2/2018 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM | |||
3/29/2018 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 3/30/2018 | |
NOTE: 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES | |||
3/28/2018 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 4/3/2018 | |
3/28/2018 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 3/28/2018 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
3/28/2018 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 3/28/2018 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
3/28/2018 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 3/28/2018 | |
NOTE: Request for Discovery | |||
3/28/2018 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 3/28/2018 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
3/27/2018 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 3/27/2018 | |
3/27/2018 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 3/28/2018 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
3/27/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/28/2018 | |
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM | |||
3/27/2018 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 3/28/2018 | |
3/27/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/3/2018 | |
NOTE: STATES TO SEAL FORM IV AND ORDER | |||
3/27/2018 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 4/3/2018 | |
3/27/2018 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 4/3/2018 | |
NOTE: FORM IV | |||
3/27/2018 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 3/28/2018 | |
NOTE: IA Packet |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
3/23/2018 | 8:00 | Initial Appearance |
3/29/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
4/2/2018 | 8:45 | Preliminary Hearing |
4/6/2018 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
5/18/2018 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
6/5/2018 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
7/26/2018 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/2/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
8/8/2018 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
10/24/2018 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
11/20/2018 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
11/26/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
1/15/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
2/26/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/4/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
5/1/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
6/10/2019 | 14:30 | Settlement Conference |
6/12/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
7/2/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
7/8/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
7/11/2019 | 8:15 | Status Conference |
7/12/2019 | 10:00 | Sentencing |
9/16/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/19/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/23/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |