« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Scipione, Alethia
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Tahnee Savanna Gonzales - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Victor, Marc
Judge
Edelstein
Case #
CR2018-113649-001
Party Name
Elizabeth Ann Dauenhauer - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Edelstein
Case #
CR2018-113649-002
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2018-113649-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Tahnee Savanna Gonzales 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
3/23/2018
Description
ENDANGER LIFE/HEALTH OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3619 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Tahnee Savanna Gonzales 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
3/23/2018
Description
DISORDERLY CONDUCT
ARSCode
13-2904 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Tahnee Savanna Gonzales 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
3/23/2018
Description
AGGRAVATED CRIMINAL DAMAGE
ARSCode
13-1604 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Tahnee Savanna Gonzales 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
3/23/2018
Description
ENDANGER LIFE/HEALTH OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3619 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Tahnee Savanna Gonzales 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
3/23/2018
Description
BURGLARY 3RD DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1506 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Tahnee Savanna Gonzales 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
3/23/2018
Description
ENDANGER LIFE/HEALTH OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3619 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Elizabeth Ann Dauenhauer 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
3/23/2018
Description
BURGLARY 3RD DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1506 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Elizabeth Ann Dauenhauer 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
3/23/2018
Description
AGGRAVATED CRIMINAL DAMAGE
ARSCode
13-1604 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Tahnee Savanna Gonzales 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
4/25/2019
Description
BURGLARY 3RD DEG-UNLAW ENTRY
ARSCode
13-1506A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Tahnee Savanna Gonzales 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
4/25/2019
Description
DISORD CONDUCT-LANG/GESTURE
ARSCode
13-2904A3 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Tahnee Savanna Gonzales 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
4/25/2019
Description
AGGRAVATED CRIMINAL DAMAGE
ARSCode
13-1604 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Tahnee Savanna Gonzales 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
4/25/2019
Description
ENDANGER LIFE/HEALTH OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3619 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Tahnee Savanna Gonzales 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
4/25/2019
Description
ENDANGER LIFE/HEALTH OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3619 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Tahnee Savanna Gonzales 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
4/25/2019
Description
ENDANGER LIFE/HEALTH OF MINOR
ARSCode
13-3619 (M1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Elizabeth Ann Dauenhauer 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
10/4/2018
Description
BURGLARY 3RD DEG-UNLAW ENTRY
ARSCode
13-1506A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Elizabeth Ann Dauenhauer 
Crime Date
3/4/2018
Date
10/4/2018
Description
AGGRAVATED CRIMINAL DAMAGE
ARSCode
13-1604 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
ORR - Order re: Restoring Civil Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE APPLICATION TO RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS AND THE RIGHT TO POSSESS OR OWN A FIREARM
Filing Date
12/23/2022
Description
ORR - Order re: Restoring Civil Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING the application to restore civil rights and right to possess or own a firearm
Filing Date
12/23/2022
Description
OSJ - Order re: Setting Aside Judgment of Guilt - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING a Certificate of Second Chance, and accordingly, pursuant to A.R.S. § 13-905
Filing Date
12/8/2022
Description
CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
Filing Date
12/2/2022
Description
APL - Application - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
APPLICATION UPON DISCHARGE TO RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS RESTORE FIREARM RIGHTS
Filing Date
11/29/2022
Description
CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
Filing Date
11/28/2022
Description
APL - Application - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
APPLICATION
Filing Date
10/4/2022
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S APPLICATION TO DESIGNATE A CLASS 6 UNDESIGNATED FELONY AS A MISDEMEANOR
Filing Date
8/26/2022
Description
CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
Filing Date
8/18/2022
Description
APL - Application - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO DESIGNATE A CLASS 6 UNDESIGNATED FELONY AS A MISDEMEANOR
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE CONVICTION
Filing Date
6/15/2022
Description
CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
Filing Date
6/15/2022
Description
CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
Filing Date
6/13/2022
Description
ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
RESTORE GUN RIGHTS
Filing Date
6/13/2022
Description
APL - Application - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS/ RESTORE GUN RIGHTS
Filing Date
11/2/2020
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 3
Filing Date
9/22/2020
Description
PFC - Petition for Earned Time Credit - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
7/13/2020
Description
118 - ME: Modifica/Terms Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOTION TO MODIFY TERMS AND CONDITIONS OF PROBATION
Filing Date
5/5/2020
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 3
Filing Date
4/22/2020
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/22/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
ORDER TO DESIGNATE CLASS 6 UNDESIGNATED FELONY A MISDEMEANOR
Filing Date
4/6/2020
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S APPLICATION TO DESIGNATE A CLASS 6 UNDESIGNATED FELONY AS A MISDEMEANOR
Filing Date
2/13/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/14/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
APPLICATION TO DESIGNATE A CLASS 6 UNDESIGNATED FELONY AS A MISDEMEANOR
Filing Date
1/17/2020
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF DISCHARGE FROM PROBATION COUNT 5
Filing Date
1/17/2020
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 5
Filing Date
12/12/2019
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
11/25/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RETURN OF PROPERTY
Filing Date
11/6/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RETURN OF PROPERTY
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
cCOUNT 5
Filing Date
6/28/2019
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/28/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2019
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2019
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record
Filing Date
6/10/2019
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2019
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement Jail
Filing Date
5/31/2019
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
4/30/2019
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2019
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
3/22/2019
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION AND WAIVING DEFENDANTS PRESENCE FOR THE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DET FOR 3/19/2019
Filing Date
3/14/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Unopposed Motion to Waive Defendants Appearance for Final Trial Management Conference or in the Alternative Appear Telephonically
Filing Date
2/22/2019
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/21/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
1/9/2019
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2019
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2018
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
11/8/2018
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
11/8/2018
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 5 Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
11/8/2018
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement Jail
Filing Date
11/8/2018
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
11/8/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
11/6/2018
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2018
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
11/1/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
10/10/2018
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2018
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
9/13/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
8/17/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2018
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2018
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supervised Release
Filing Date
7/12/2018
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
6/14/2018
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2018
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2018
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2018
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Defenses
Filing Date
5/7/2018
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2018
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2018
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RULE 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND
Filing Date
5/7/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO HOLD 12.9 MOTION TO REMAND IN ABEYANCE
Filing Date
5/2/2018
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE NOTICE
Filing Date
4/30/2018
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
4/25/2018
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/25/2018
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/24/2018
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2018
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS OR EXHIBTS
Filing Date
4/13/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
4/13/2018
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2018
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2018
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2018
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2018
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
3/30/2018
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
3/29/2018
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
3/29/2018
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
3/26/2018
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Discovery
Filing Date
3/26/2018
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
3/26/2018
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/23/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/23/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/23/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/23/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
3/21/2018
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/21/2018
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/21/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/21/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/20/2018
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2018
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2018
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2018
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2018
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/29/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/29/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/29/2018
Time
8:33
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/29/2018
Time
8:33
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/5/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/5/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/30/2018
Time
8:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/30/2018
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/11/2018
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/11/2018
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
6/12/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
6/12/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
7/12/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
7/12/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
8/14/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
8/14/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
8/28/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/28/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/4/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/4/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/13/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
9/13/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
9/27/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/27/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/4/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/4/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/4/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
11/1/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
11/8/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
11/13/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
12/4/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/4/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/11/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/11/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/3/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/4/2019
Time
10:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
1/4/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
1/10/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/19/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/26/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/19/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/26/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/25/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
5/15/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/22/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/4/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing