« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Smith, Jordan      
Hezron Michri Parks - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Crawford, Stephen   Master Calendar  CR2018-106492-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Hezron Michri Parks  13-1104A1 (F1)  MURDER 2ND DEG-INTENTIONAL  2/4/2018  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/13/2018 
Hezron Michri Parks  13-1104A1 (F1)  MURDER 2ND DEG-INTENTIONAL  2/4/2018       
Hezron Michri Parks  13-1204A2 (F3)  AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST  2/4/2018       
Hezron Michri Parks  13-1204A2 (F3)  AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST  2/4/2018       
Hezron Michri Parks  13-1204A2 (F3)  AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST  2/4/2018       
Hezron Michri Parks  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  2/4/2018       
Hezron Michri Parks  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  2/4/2018       
Hezron Michri Parks  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  2/4/2018       
Hezron Michri Parks  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  2/4/2018       
Hezron Michri Parks  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  2/4/2018       
Hezron Michri Parks  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  2/4/2018       
Hezron Michri Parks  13-1201A (F6)  ENDANGERMENT  2/4/2018       
Hezron Michri Parks  28-662A2 (M2)  FAIL TO STAY/ACCID/ATTEND VEH  2/4/2018       
Hezron Michri Parks  13-1203A3 (M3)  ASSAULT-TOUCHED TO INJURE  2/4/2018       
Hezron Michri Parks  13-2904A1 (M1)  DISORDERLY CONDUCT-FIGHTING  2/4/2018       
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/17/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/17/2018   
4/12/2018  599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  4/12/2018   
3/30/2018  REQ - Request - Party (001)  3/30/2018   
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.1 Request for Disclosure
3/30/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/30/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO PRESERVE AND DISCLOSE TAPE RECORDINGS OF 911 TAPES AND POLICE RADIO BROADCASTS
3/23/2018  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)  3/26/2018   
NOTE: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
3/20/2018  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)  3/20/2018   
3/19/2018  ORD - Order - Party (001)  3/21/2018   
NOTE: RE: STILL AND ELECTRONIC CAMERAS
3/18/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/19/2018   
NOTE: Motion For Complex Designation
3/1/2018  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  3/2/2018   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MEDIA COVERAGE
3/1/2018  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  3/6/2018   
3/1/2018  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/6/2018   
NOTE: PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E)
3/1/2018  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/6/2018   
3/1/2018  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/6/2018   
2/23/2018  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  2/26/2018   
2/22/2018  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  2/22/2018   
2/20/2018  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)  2/20/2018   
NOTE: $300,000 CASH ONLY
2/16/2018  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  2/20/2018   
NOTE: Objection to Media Coverage
2/13/2018  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  2/14/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
2/13/2018  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  2/14/2018   
2/13/2018  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  2/14/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
2/13/2018  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  2/14/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
2/8/2018  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  2/8/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance
2/8/2018  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/8/2018   
NOTE: INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
2/7/2018  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  2/7/2018   
2/7/2018  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  2/8/2018   
NOTE: IA Release Order
2/7/2018  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  2/8/2018   
NOTE: IA Packet
2/7/2018  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  2/8/2018   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
2/5/2018  5:00   Initial Appearance 
2/12/2018  8:30   Status Conference 
2/14/2018  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
2/20/2018  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
2/20/2018  8:30   Oral Argument 
3/19/2018  9:00   Oral Argument 
4/4/2018  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
5/3/2018  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
10/11/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/18/2018  8:00   Trial 
click here for Law Library Resource Center