« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Harder, Aaron
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mitchell Timothy Taebel - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Ortega, Alane
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2018-104389-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mitchell Timothy Taebel
Crime Date
1/24/2018
Date
2/2/2018
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mitchell Timothy Taebel
Crime Date
1/24/2018
Date
2/2/2018
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201A (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mitchell Timothy Taebel
Crime Date
1/24/2018
Date
2/2/2018
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201A (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mitchell Timothy Taebel
Crime Date
1/24/2018
Date
2/2/2018
Description
UNLAW FLIGHT FROM LAW ENF VEH
ARSCode
28-622.01 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mitchell Timothy Taebel
Crime Date
1/24/2018
Date
4/9/2021
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismis Mental Incompeten
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Mental Incompetence
Party Name
Mitchell Timothy Taebel
Crime Date
1/24/2018
Date
4/9/2021
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201A (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismis Mental Incompeten
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Mental Incompetence
Party Name
Mitchell Timothy Taebel
Crime Date
1/24/2018
Date
4/9/2021
Description
UNLAW FLIGHT FROM LAW ENF VEH
ARSCode
28-622.01 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismis Mental Incompeten
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Mental Incompetence
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY
Filing Date
6/15/2021
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S
MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT’S
PERSONAL PROPERTY
Filing Date
6/9/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RELEASE OF PROPERTY
Filing Date
4/30/2021
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISCHARGE AND DETERMINE EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/14/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT BY DR. LESLIE DANA-KIRBY DATED 07/09/2020
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT BY DR. LESLIE DANA-KIRBY DATED 09/06/2020
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT BY DR. LESLIE DANA-KIRBY DATED 11/06/2020
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT BY DR. SCOTT E. KIRKORSKY DATED 12/10/2020
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT BY DR. LESLIE DANA-KIRBY DATED 02/11/2021
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT BY DR. SCOTT E. KIRKORSKY DATED 02/12/2021
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES' NOTICE OF FOURTH REVISED TREATMENT PLAN-JULY 15, 2020
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES' NOTICE OF FIFTH REVISED TREATMENT PLAN-AUGUST 14, 2020
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES' NOTICE OF SIXTH REVISED TREATMENT PLAN-SEPTEMBER 11, 20202
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES' NOTICE OF SEVENTH REVISED TREATMENT PLAN-NOVEMBER 3, 2020
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES' NOTICE OF EIGHTH REVISED TREATMENT PLAN-NOVEMBER 24, 2020
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES' NOTICE OF NINTH REVISED TREATMENT PLAN-DECEMBER 18, 2020
Filing Date
3/30/2021
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2021
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES NOTICE OF TENTH REVISED TREATMENT PLAN-FEBRUARY 12 2021
Filing Date
3/2/2021
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2021
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2021
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
1/5/2021
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/24/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
11/23/2020
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Document Under Seal
Filing Date
10/22/2020
Description
124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
10/1/2020
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF TIME COMPUTATION
Filing Date
9/25/2020
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
9/11/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
9/2/2020
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/2/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
8/20/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PRO SE
Filing Date
8/14/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
8/11/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Filing Date
7/30/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2020
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2020
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2020
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PER
Filing Date
7/20/2020
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PRO SE
Filing Date
7/15/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
7/14/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO SE
Filing Date
7/13/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
7/13/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES' NOTICE OF TREATMENT PLAN-JUNE 2020 DATED 06/09/2020
Filing Date
7/13/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES' NOTICE OF REVISED TREATMENT PLAN-JUNE 2020 DATED 06/12/2020
Filing Date
6/30/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
6/25/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/26/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
6/23/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
6/12/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
6/10/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO SE
Filing Date
6/10/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PRO SE
Filing Date
6/9/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
6/9/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
6/9/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO SE
Filing Date
6/4/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCESS
Filing Date
6/3/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/4/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO SE
Filing Date
5/29/2020
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF TREATMENT PLAN
Filing Date
5/28/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPETENCY STATUS REPORT
Filing Date
5/28/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
5/28/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES STATUS REPORT TO COURT
Filing Date
5/26/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO SE
Filing Date
5/20/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
5/13/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Document Under Seal
Filing Date
5/11/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2020
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
4/28/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED
Filing Date
4/15/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PER
Filing Date
3/27/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Document under Seal
Filing Date
3/18/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2020
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. LESLIE DANA-KIRBY DATED 09/26/2019
Filing Date
3/16/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. LESLIE DANA-KIRBY DATED 11/08/2019
Filing Date
3/16/2020
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. SCOTT E. KIRKORSKY DATED 12/31/2019
Filing Date
3/9/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PRO SE
Filing Date
3/4/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO SE
Filing Date
3/3/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/5/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PRO SE
Filing Date
3/2/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO SE
Filing Date
2/25/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
2/24/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
2/21/2020
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2020
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED
Filing Date
2/18/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO-SE
Filing Date
2/18/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PER
Filing Date
2/13/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PER
Filing Date
2/3/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
1/30/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
1/24/2020
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED
Filing Date
1/22/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
1/17/2020
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2020
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL / TO PROCEED PROPER
Filing Date
1/6/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
1/2/2020
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2020
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR PRO PER SELF REPRESENTATION
Filing Date
12/24/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PREPARED PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
12/23/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/24/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PER
Filing Date
12/18/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT FOR PROPERSONA
Filing Date
12/16/2019
Description
122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED
Filing Date
12/5/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PER
Filing Date
12/2/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PER
Filing Date
12/2/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/4/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PER
Filing Date
12/2/2019
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PER
Filing Date
11/25/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR SPEEDY TRIAL VIOLATION
Filing Date
11/25/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PER
Filing Date
11/25/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PER
Filing Date
11/22/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PER
Filing Date
11/19/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PER
Filing Date
11/12/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
11/6/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
10/29/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
10/14/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RULE 10.4 CHANGE OF COUNTY
Filing Date
10/7/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
10/7/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CHANGE PLACE OF TRIAL
Filing Date
10/4/2019
Description
124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PER
Filing Date
9/10/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
8/26/2019
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2019
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL
Filing Date
8/19/2019
Description
124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. M. DAVID MCGADY DATED 6/22/19
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. WAYNE R. GENERAL DATED 06/26/19
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. SARAH GALLIMORE DATED 08/01/19
Filing Date
7/15/2019
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
CLERK OF COURT,COURT OF APPEALS DIVISION ONE
Filing Date
7/15/2019
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL
Filing Date
7/15/2019
Description
122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PROPER
Filing Date
7/9/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
7/9/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
7/2/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Filing Date
7/1/2019
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
6/27/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE THE
RULE 11 HEARING
Filing Date
6/11/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PER
Filing Date
6/6/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR PRO PER
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
6/3/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 11 /OF APPOINTMENT APPOINTING THE FOLLOWING QUALIFIED MENTAL HEALTH EXPERTS TO CONDUCT AN EVALUATION
Filing Date
6/3/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
5/31/2019
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2019
Description
120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANT’S PRO PER MOTIONS
Filing Date
5/21/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO
DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROPERSONA
FILED APRIL 16, 2019
Filing Date
5/20/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR RULE 11
EVALUATION
Filing Date
5/16/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR PRO PER
Filing Date
5/10/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
5/2/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTA (MOTION FOR PRO PERSONA)
Filing Date
4/29/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
4/26/2019
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
4/16/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR PRO PER PERSONA
Filing Date
4/15/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S PRO PER MOTIONS
Filing Date
4/12/2019
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT
Filing Date
4/12/2019
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD
Filing Date
4/12/2019
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL
Filing Date
4/12/2019
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION
Filing Date
4/11/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
4/11/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2019
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
CLERK OF COURT, COURT OF APPEALSDIVISION ONE
Filing Date
4/3/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
4/3/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPORTING MOTION FOR PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
4/1/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/2/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR SPEED TRIAL DISMISSAL
Filing Date
3/29/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RULE 16.4 DISMISSAL
Filing Date
3/28/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RULE 8.6 DISMISSED
Filing Date
3/28/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO VACATE MEDIA PRECLUSION
Filing Date
3/28/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CHANGE OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/27/2019
Description
098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
3/22/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:
ENTERING OF A NOT GUILTY PLEA
Filing Date
3/22/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/22/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
15.2 Defense Disclosure/Notice of Defenses
Filing Date
3/21/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL FOR PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
3/15/2019
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
3/15/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
3/15/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
3/13/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
3/11/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO RELEASE MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
3/7/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
3/1/2019
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
CLERK OF COURT, COURT OF APPEALS DIVISION ONE
Filing Date
2/25/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
2/19/2019
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
2/19/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR RELEASE
OF VICTIM’S MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
2/15/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
2/14/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO PROCEED PRO PERSONA
Filing Date
2/7/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
2/4/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO PROCEED PRO-PERSONA
Filing Date
1/31/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
1/28/2019
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
1/24/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
1/23/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
1/22/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
1/16/2019
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2019
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR O R OR BAIL REDUCTION
Filing Date
1/10/2019
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2019
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
12/27/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/31/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
12/26/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
12/20/2018
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2018
Description
123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2018
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
$400,000 CASH ONLY
Filing Date
12/14/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. LESLIE DANA-KIRBY DATED 09/27/18
Filing Date
12/14/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. LESLIE DANA-KIRBY DATED 09/27/18
Filing Date
11/5/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
10/26/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
10/8/2018
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS
Filing Date
8/13/2018
Description
124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2018
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2018
Description
SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. KEVIN D. HURLEY DATED 08/03/18
Filing Date
8/7/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. KEVIN D. HURLEY DATED 03/12/18
Filing Date
8/7/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. RICK WEBSTER DATED 08/01/18
Filing Date
8/7/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. RICK WEBSTER DATED 05/17/18
Filing Date
8/7/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL REPORT: DR. KEVIN D. HURLEY DATED 05/07/18
Filing Date
8/2/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
7/30/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL
Filing Date
7/25/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
PITCHESS MOTION
Filing Date
7/10/2018
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
7/5/2018
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR BAIL REDUCTION HEARING
Filing Date
7/3/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OMNIBUS MOTION
Filing Date
7/2/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
7/2/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/28/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR RELEASE OF VICTIM’S MEDICAL RECORDS
Filing Date
6/20/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
6/18/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE
Filing Date
6/14/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2018
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Schedule Status Conference
Filing Date
6/8/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTIONN TO DISMISS
Filing Date
6/6/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
5/29/2018
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO REDUCE BOND
Filing Date
5/11/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SQUASH
Filing Date
5/11/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Filing Date
5/9/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR O R OR BOND REDUCTION
Filing Date
4/19/2018
Description
905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/19/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 or A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2
REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF
COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL
EVIDENCE
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR
RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF
AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
4/16/2018
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2018
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
3/27/2018
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2018
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/23/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/21/2018
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
3/20/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
LETTER
Filing Date
3/16/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL
Filing Date
2/27/2018
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 11/OF APPOINTMENT
Filing Date
2/16/2018
Description
120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2018
Description
173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2018
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MOTION TO CHANGE COUNSEL
Filing Date
2/6/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
2/1/2018
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/1/2018
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2018
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/1/2018
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/31/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Preclude Media Access to Defendant
Filing Date
1/31/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Motion for Examination Pursuant to A R S 13 4506
Filing Date
1/30/2018
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
1/30/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Rule 11 Examination
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2018
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/25/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
2/1/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/5/2018
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/8/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/15/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
3/20/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
3/26/2018
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/2/2018
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
4/3/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
4/24/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
5/1/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
5/22/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
6/12/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/26/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
6/26/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
6/29/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
8/7/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
10/2/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
10/23/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
12/11/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
12/14/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
1/8/2019
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/16/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/7/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
4/4/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/11/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/17/2019
Time
15:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
5/23/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/30/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/2/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
7/9/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
8/6/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
10/1/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
11/26/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
12/10/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
1/7/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
1/14/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
1/23/2020
Time
14:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/27/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/20/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
5/6/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Review Hearing
Date
5/13/2020
Time
9:15
Event
Review Hearing
Date
7/17/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
7/20/2020
Time
15:00
Event
Review Hearing
Date
7/22/2020
Time
15:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
9/17/2020
Time
9:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
9/18/2020
Time
9:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
9/22/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Review Hearing
Date
9/30/2020
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
11/16/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Review Hearing
Date
11/16/2020
Time
10:00
Event
Review Hearing
Date
12/18/2020
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/19/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Review Hearing
Date
2/24/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
3/24/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Rule 11 Hearing
Date
4/9/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Rule 11 Hearing