Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Barnett, Tamara | ||
Ashley Marie Fuller - (2) |
Defendant | F | Green, Lincoln | Master Calendar | CR2018-006820-001 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Ashley Marie Fuller | 13-2008A (F4) | TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER | 9/20/2017 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 12/9/2020 |
Ashley Marie Fuller | 13-2008A (F4) | TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER | 3/11/2017 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 12/9/2020 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
6/17/2021 | SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment - Party (001) | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |||
4/1/2021 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 4/5/2021 | |
3/25/2021 | SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001) | 3/25/2021 | |
NOTE: SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration | |||
3/24/2021 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 3/24/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
3/24/2021 | OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001) | 3/24/2021 | |
NOTE: Monetary Orders | |||
3/24/2021 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 3/24/2021 | |
NOTE: Presentence Report | |||
3/24/2021 | PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001) | 3/24/2021 | |
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents | |||
3/24/2021 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 3/24/2021 | |
NOTE: Order of Confinement | |||
3/9/2021 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001) | 3/9/2021 | |
3/1/2021 | NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001) | 3/2/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Release of Deposit MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER $750.00 | |||
2/26/2021 | NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001) | 3/2/2021 | |
NOTE: $750 | |||
2/19/2021 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001) | 2/19/2021 | |
1/21/2021 | 196 - ME: Bond Exonerated - Party (001) | 1/21/2021 | |
1/19/2021 | ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001) | 1/25/2021 | |
1/19/2021 | BFJ - Bond Forfeiture Judgment - Party (001) | 1/27/2021 | |
1/19/2021 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001) | 1/19/2021 | |
1/12/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 1/12/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT’S SENTENCING | |||
12/14/2020 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 12/14/2020 | |
12/9/2020 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: PLEA AGREEMENT | |||
12/8/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 12/8/2020 | |
12/1/2020 | 081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001) | 12/1/2020 | |
11/23/2020 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 11/23/2020 | |
11/3/2020 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001) | 11/3/2020 | |
10/28/2020 | WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001) | 10/30/2020 | |
NOTE: 10/20/2020 | |||
10/21/2020 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 10/21/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/21/2020 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 10/21/2020 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/19/2020 | 133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (001) | 10/19/2020 | |
10/19/2020 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 10/19/2020 | |
10/13/2020 | IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001) | 10/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Issued 2020-10-13 | |||
10/12/2020 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 10/12/2020 | |
10/12/2020 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 10/12/2020 | |
10/5/2020 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001) | 10/5/2020 | |
9/30/2020 | EMF - Email Filed - Party (001) | 10/2/2020 | |
9/1/2020 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 9/1/2020 | |
7/15/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 7/15/2020 | |
6/17/2020 | 180 - ME: Bond Forfeiture Hrg - Party (001) | 6/17/2020 | |
6/12/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 6/12/2020 | |
4/28/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 4/28/2020 | |
3/27/2020 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 3/27/2020 | |
3/25/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 3/25/2020 | |
3/24/2020 | BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (001) | 3/24/2020 | |
NOTE: Quashed 2020-03-24 | |||
3/23/2020 | IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001) | 3/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Issued 2020-03-23 | |||
3/18/2020 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/18/2020 | |
3/9/2020 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001) | 3/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Release Order $1000 | |||
3/9/2020 | ROR - Release Order - Party (001) | 3/12/2020 | |
2/14/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 2/14/2020 | |
2/11/2020 | BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (001) | 2/11/2020 | |
NOTE: Quashed 2020-02-11 | |||
2/10/2020 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001) | 2/10/2020 | |
2/6/2020 | MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (001) | 2/7/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO QUASH BENCH WARRANT AND VACATE BOND FORFEITURE HEARING | |||
2/4/2020 | 133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (001) | 2/4/2020 | |
1/27/2020 | IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001) | 1/27/2020 | |
NOTE: Issued 2020-01-27 | |||
1/17/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 1/23/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 01/02/20 | |||
1/17/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 1/23/2020 | |
NOTE: 01/07/20 | |||
12/13/2019 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 12/17/2019 | |
NOTE: SERVED 12/05/19 | |||
12/3/2019 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 12/3/2019 | |
12/3/2019 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 12/5/2019 | |
NOTE: SERVED 112619 | |||
11/25/2019 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 12/2/2019 | |
NOTE: SERVED 11/21/19 | |||
11/20/2019 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 11/21/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
10/24/2019 | NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001) | 10/28/2019 | |
10/22/2019 | 331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001) | 10/22/2019 | |
10/4/2019 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 10/4/2019 | |
9/12/2019 | 004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001) | 9/12/2019 | |
8/14/2019 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 8/14/2019 | |
8/7/2019 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 8/9/2019 | |
NOTE: TRIAL | |||
8/6/2019 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 8/6/2019 | |
7/30/2019 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 8/1/2019 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |||
6/18/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 6/18/2019 | |
6/11/2019 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 6/12/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS | |||
6/10/2019 | BON - Bond - Party (001) | 6/13/2019 | |
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY/AMERICAN PRIDE BB/$1000 | |||
6/10/2019 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 6/10/2019 | |
5/2/2019 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 5/2/2019 | |
4/30/2019 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 5/1/2019 | |
NOTE: TRIAL | |||
3/27/2019 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/27/2019 | |
3/21/2019 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 3/22/2019 | |
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |||
2/26/2019 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 2/26/2019 | |
2/25/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/25/2019 | |
2/20/2019 | ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001) | 2/21/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS | |||
2/20/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 2/21/2019 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE | |||
2/20/2019 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 2/21/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
2/20/2019 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 2/21/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
2/20/2019 | RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001) | 2/21/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING | |||
2/20/2019 | AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001) | 2/21/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13- 708(C) | |||
1/25/2019 | MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001) | 1/28/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion for Discovery | |||
1/25/2019 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 1/28/2019 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR REBUTTAL WITNESSES | |||
1/10/2019 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 1/10/2019 | |
1/3/2019 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 1/4/2019 | |
1/2/2019 | WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001) | 1/2/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
12/31/2018 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 1/2/2019 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
12/31/2018 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 1/2/2019 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
12/21/2018 | PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001) | 1/2/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
12/21/2018 | OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001) | 1/2/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
12/21/2018 | 086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001) | 1/2/2019 | |
12/6/2018 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 1/2/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
12/6/2018 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 1/2/2019 | Plaintiff (1) |
12/6/2018 | 604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001) | 1/2/2019 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
12/31/2018 | 14:00 | Initial Appearance |
1/8/2019 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
2/19/2019 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
3/21/2019 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
4/30/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/7/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
6/4/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/11/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
6/13/2019 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
7/30/2019 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
8/7/2019 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
8/29/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/5/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
9/9/2019 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
9/26/2019 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
10/15/2019 | 9:00 | Settlement Conference |
10/15/2019 | 13:30 | Settlement Conference |
10/24/2019 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
10/28/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
11/4/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
11/21/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/4/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
1/27/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/3/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
2/11/2020 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
3/9/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/10/2020 | 13:30 | Bond Forfeiture Hearing |
3/12/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/23/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
3/23/2020 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
3/30/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
4/28/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/7/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
6/1/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/8/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
7/9/2020 | 13:30 | Bond Forfeiture Hearing |
7/15/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
7/22/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
8/31/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/31/2020 | 10:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/8/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
9/15/2020 | 13:30 | Bond Forfeiture Hearing |
10/1/2020 | 11:00 | Trial |
10/5/2020 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
10/6/2020 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
10/8/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
10/12/2020 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
10/12/2020 | 13:00 | Status Conference |
10/13/2020 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
10/14/2020 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
10/21/2020 | 11:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/28/2020 | 10:50 | Status Conference - Post Warrant |
11/19/2020 | 9:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
11/25/2020 | 10:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/8/2020 | 11:00 | Trial |
12/9/2020 | 8:50 | Status Conference |
1/13/2021 | 8:50 | Sentencing |
1/19/2021 | 13:30 | Bond Forfeiture Hearing |
1/19/2021 | 13:30 | Bond Forfeiture Hearing |
2/3/2021 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
2/17/2021 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
3/4/2021 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
3/24/2021 | 8:30 | Sentencing |