Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, S P 2 Family Violence East      
Mayra Yomali Solis - (2)
 
Defendant  F   Martinez, Jon   Master Calendar  CR2018-005765-001  
B Witness - (3)
 
Witness  F   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Mayra Yomali Solis  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/1/2016  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  8/7/2019 
Mayra Yomali Solis  13-3623A1 (F3)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/17/2016  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  8/7/2019 
Mayra Yomali Solis  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/17/2016  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/7/2019 
Mayra Yomali Solis  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/16/2016  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  8/7/2019 
Mayra Yomali Solis  13-2310A (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  9/30/2015  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/7/2019 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
12/27/2019  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  12/30/2019   
12/16/2019  SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation - Party (001)  12/16/2019   
NOTE: SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation 
12/13/2019  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  12/13/2019   
NOTE: Terms and Conditions of Probation 
12/13/2019  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  12/13/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review 
12/13/2019  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  12/13/2019   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
12/13/2019  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  12/13/2019   
NOTE: Order of Confinement 
12/13/2019  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  12/13/2019   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
12/13/2019  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  12/13/2019   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
12/13/2019  PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)  12/13/2019   
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents 
11/22/2019  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  11/22/2019   
9/20/2019  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  9/20/2019   
8/13/2019  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  8/13/2019   
8/7/2019  RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001)  8/7/2019   
NOTE: Release Order 
8/7/2019  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  8/7/2019   
8/6/2019  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  8/6/2019   
7/2/2019  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  7/2/2019   
5/29/2019  331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)  5/29/2019   
5/22/2019  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  5/24/2019   
NOTE: TRIAL 
5/22/2019  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  5/22/2019   
5/21/2019  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  5/22/2019   
NOTE: Settlement Conference Memorandum 
4/24/2019  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  4/24/2019   
4/16/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/17/2019   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN 
3/7/2019  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  3/7/2019   
2/7/2019  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)  2/7/2019   
1/4/2019  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  1/4/2019   
12/3/2018  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  12/3/2018   
11/26/2018  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  11/26/2018   
11/19/2018  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/20/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF OPPORTUNITY TO INSPECT CONTRABAND EVIDENCE 
11/16/2018  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/20/2018   
11/13/2018  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  11/15/2018   
11/13/2018  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/15/2018   
11/13/2018  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/19/2018   
11/8/2018  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  11/9/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704 
11/8/2018  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  11/9/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
11/8/2018  REQ - Request - Party (001)  11/9/2018   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR COURT INTERPRETER 
11/1/2018  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  11/2/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW (OPDS APPOINTED ON OTHER MATTER) 
10/30/2018  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  10/31/2018   
10/25/2018  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  10/25/2018   
10/16/2018  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  10/16/2018   
10/8/2018  WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)  10/8/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: 10/05/2018 
10/6/2018  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  10/8/2018   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
10/6/2018  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  10/15/2018   
NOTE: IA Packet 
10/4/2018  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/8/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: rule 2.3 victim identifier information form 
10/4/2018  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  10/8/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
10/4/2018  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  10/8/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
10/4/2018  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)  10/8/2018   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
10/6/2018  5:00   Initial Appearance 
10/12/2018  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
10/22/2018  8:30   Status Conference 
11/26/2018  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
1/2/2019  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
1/31/2019  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
3/1/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/4/2019  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/11/2019  8:00   Trial 
4/17/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/16/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/22/2019  11:00   Settlement Conference 
6/10/2019  8:00   Trial 
6/26/2019  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/5/2019  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/7/2019  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/12/2019  8:00   Trial 
9/20/2019  13:30   Sentencing 
11/22/2019  13:30   Sentencing 
12/13/2019  9:00   Sentencing