« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Brady, Tiffany
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Alex John Bashaw - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Public Defender-, Ccc
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2018-002492-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Alex John Bashaw
Crime Date
3/13/2018
Date
4/26/2019
Description
NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE
ARSCode
13-1102 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Alex John Bashaw
Crime Date
3/13/2018
Date
4/26/2019
Description
NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE
ARSCode
13-1102 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Alex John Bashaw
Crime Date
3/13/2018
Date
4/26/2019
Description
NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE
ARSCode
13-1102 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Alex John Bashaw
Crime Date
3/13/2018
Date
4/26/2019
Description
NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE
ARSCode
13-1102 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2020
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2020
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
LIFTING PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
1/13/2020
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/14/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO LIFT
PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
9/12/2019
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2019
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2019
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR NUNC PRO TUNC
Filing Date
8/12/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUEST FOR NUNC PRO TUNC
Filing Date
8/1/2019
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2019
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
7/19/2019
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
7/19/2019
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
7/19/2019
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
7/19/2019
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
7/19/2019
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
7/19/2019
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
7/18/2019
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
7/17/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Document Filing
Filing Date
7/17/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Second Notice of Document Filing
Filing Date
7/17/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Third Notice of Document Filing
Filing Date
7/17/2019
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sentencing Memorandum
Filing Date
5/16/2019
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2019
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Sentencing
Filing Date
4/30/2019
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2019
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2019
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2019
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/5/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Settlement Conference Memorandum
Filing Date
2/8/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2018
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2018
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order$250,000.00,
Filing Date
10/9/2018
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO MODIFY DEFENDANT’S RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
10/8/2018
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue CCMC
Filing Date
10/3/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY DEFENDANT’S
RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
9/17/2018
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss Indictment and Remand to the Grand Jury
Filing Date
9/10/2018
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Complex Case Designation
Filing Date
8/27/2018
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2018
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2018
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2018
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2018
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2018
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2018
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2018
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2018
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/13/2018
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
8/13/2018
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
8/13/2018
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
8/13/2018
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2018
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
8/2/2018
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2018
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2018
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Specific Items of Evidence
Filing Date
7/31/2018
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
7/31/2018
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Automatic Disclosure Required by Rule 15.1(a) and (b) and Request for Additional Disclosure Required by Rule 15.1(c)
Filing Date
7/31/2018
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR
EXTENSION OF TIME TO
CHALLENGE THE GRAND
JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
7/27/2018
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2018
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
07/19/2018
Filing Date
7/20/2018
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
7/20/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
7/16/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF ENDORSEMENT
Filing Date
7/10/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE
ORDER
Filing Date
7/5/2018
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/5/2018
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/5/2018
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2018
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/20/2018
Time
5:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
7/27/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/15/2018
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/7/2018
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
10/9/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/9/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
10/22/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/29/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/11/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/6/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/18/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/25/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/5/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/5/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/11/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/26/2019
Time
9:30
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
4/29/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/14/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Sentencing
Date
6/17/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/24/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/19/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing