« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Micflikier, Sara      
William Knight - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Beauchamp, Melanie   Master Calendar  CR2018-002267-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
William Knight  13-1405A (F2)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  4/1/2017       
William Knight  13-1405A (F2)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  4/1/2017       
William Knight  13-1404A (F3)  SEXUAL ABUSE  4/1/2017       
William Knight  13-1404A (F3)  SEXUAL ABUSE  4/1/2017       
William Knight  13-1410A (F2)  MOLESTATION OF CHILD  4/1/2017       
William Knight  13-1410A (F2)  MOLESTATION OF CHILD  4/1/2017       
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
8/13/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  8/13/2018   
8/13/2018  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  8/13/2018   
7/30/2018  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  8/1/2018   
7/27/2018  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  7/27/2018   
7/27/2018  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  7/30/2018   
NOTE: QUASHED 07/18/18
7/24/2018  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)  7/24/2018   
7/23/2018  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  7/25/2018   
7/23/2018  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/25/2018   
7/23/2018  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/25/2018   
7/18/2018  ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (001)  7/24/2018   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE
7/16/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/17/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO FILE VICTIM IDENTIFIER UNDER SEAL AND 15.1 STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE UNDER SEAL
7/16/2018  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  7/18/2018   
7/13/2018  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  7/16/2018   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS AND QUASH WARRANT OR SUMMONS
7/9/2018  WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)  7/12/2018   
NOTE: NO SERVED DATE
7/9/2018  PSO - Pretrial Services Order Issued - Party (001)  7/12/2018   
NOTE: WARRANT ISSUED
7/6/2018  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  7/9/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
7/6/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/6/2018   
7/6/2018  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  7/9/2018   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
7/5/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/9/2018   
7/5/2018  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  7/6/2018   
NOTE: ORDER
7/5/2018  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  7/6/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO REVOKE DEFENDANT'S RELEASE AND REMAND
7/5/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/6/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
7/5/2018  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  7/6/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO REVOKE DEFENDANT’S RELEASE AND REMAND
7/3/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/3/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO MODIFY DEFENDANT’S TERMS OF RELEASE
7/3/2018  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)  7/6/2018   
6/29/2018  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  7/2/2018   
NOTE: Release Order
6/28/2018  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  6/28/2018   
6/26/2018  BON - Bond - Party (001)  6/29/2018   
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY $100,000 ACCREDITED SURETY & CASUALTY
6/20/2018  ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  6/21/2018   
NOTE: Order Regarding Counsel
6/15/2018  WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)  6/15/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: 06/13/2018
6/14/2018  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  6/15/2018   
NOTE: IA Packet
6/14/2018  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  6/15/2018   
NOTE: IA Release Order
6/13/2018  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  6/18/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
6/13/2018  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  6/18/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
6/13/2018  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)  6/18/2018   
6/13/2018  SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)  6/18/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
6/14/2018  8:00   Initial Appearance 
6/20/2018  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
7/12/2018  10:30   Oral Argument 
8/1/2018  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
8/30/2018  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
click here for Law Library Resource Center