Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Strange, Daniel      
Christopher Clements - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Schlicksup, Andrew   Master Calendar  CR2018-000917-001  
Melissa Stark - (3)
 
Defendant  F   Rothschild, David   Master Calendar  CR2018-000917-002  
B Witness - (4)
 
Witness  M   Acosta, Jesus      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Christopher Clements  13-2310A (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  4/6/2017       
Melissa Stark  13-2310A (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  4/6/2017       
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
1/14/2020  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  1/14/2020   
11/15/2019  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  11/15/2019   
11/15/2019  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)  11/15/2019   
11/8/2019  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  11/8/2019   
11/7/2019  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  11/7/2019   
NOTE: County Attorneys Adels and MCAOS Opposition to Defendants Motion to Allow Defense to Ask Hostile and Adverse Witnesses Leading Questions 
11/1/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/4/2019   
NOTE: Motion to Allow Leading Questions to Adverse Witnesses  
10/23/2019  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  10/24/2019   
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEY ADELS AND MCAOS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE  
9/6/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/6/2019   
9/5/2019  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  9/5/2019   
9/3/2019  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  9/3/2019   
8/21/2019  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  8/21/2019   
8/20/2019  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  8/20/2019   
8/19/2019  RNM - Returned Mail - Party (002)  8/19/2019   
NOTE:  
8/15/2019  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  8/16/2019   
NOTE: Motion for Reconsideration or Clarification of the Courts Order Concerning Camera Coverage 
8/14/2019  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  8/16/2019   
8/13/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  8/13/2019   
8/13/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/15/2019   
NOTE: NOTICE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION – PHYSICAL DESCRIPTION OF HANDWRITTEN NOTES 
8/9/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/12/2019   
NOTE: MOTION FOR ORDER UNSEALING RECORDS  
8/7/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/8/2019   
NOTE: NOTICE STIPULATIONS AND JOINT MOTION RE COURTS DISCLOSURE ORDER DATED 6-14-19 
8/5/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  8/5/2019   
8/5/2019  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  8/5/2019   
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEY MONTGOMERYS AND MCAOS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE 
8/2/2019  RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)  8/2/2019   
NOTE:  
7/31/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  8/1/2019   
NOTE: CORRECTED STIPULATED MOTION FOR ORDER UNSEALING RECORDS FOR USE AT EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 16, 2019 AND AUGUST 23, 2019  
7/30/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  7/31/2019   
NOTE: MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE FOR TRAVEL 
7/29/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  8/1/2019   
NOTE: 07/25/19 
7/25/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/26/2019   
NOTE: County Attorney Montogmerys and MCAOS Notice of Production of Unredacted Records 
7/23/2019  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  7/23/2019   
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEY MONTGOMERYS AND MCAO NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE 
7/22/2019  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)  7/22/2019   
7/22/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/23/2019   
NOTE: Stipulated Motion for Order Unsealing Records for use at Evidentiary Hearings Scheduled for August 16, 2019 and August 23, 2019 
7/22/2019  REL - Reply - Party (001)  7/23/2019   
NOTE: to States Response to Supplement to Motion to Dismiss - Right to Counsel and Due Process 
7/18/2019  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  7/18/2019   
7/18/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/18/2019   
NOTE: County Attorneys and MCAOS Motion to Limit Scope of Defense Examination of MCAO Prosecutors, MCAO Detectives and Tucson PD Detectives 
7/17/2019  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)  7/17/2019   
7/16/2019  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  7/16/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Limited Appearance 
7/12/2019  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/15/2019   
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS â€" RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS RE: CELL SEARCHES WITH RESERVATION OF RIGHTS TO SUPPLEMENT 
7/12/2019  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/15/2019   
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS KAUFMANN HOME NUMBER JAIL CALLS CLAIM ASSERTED IN HIS SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND “SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS â€" RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS â€" RECORDED JAIL CALLS” and MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY, OTHER EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING “KAUFMANN HOME NUMBER JAIL CALLS CLAIM” AT THE EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 16, 2019 AND AUGUST 23, 2019 
7/12/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/15/2019   
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEY MONTGOMERY’S AND MCAO’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION RE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ “SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS â€" RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS” RE: CELL SEARCHES WITH RESERVATION OF RIGHTS TO SUPPLEMENT 
7/12/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/15/2019   
NOTE: NOTICE OF SUBMITTAL OF EXHIBIT 3, ELECTRONIC RECORD, RE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ “KAUFMANN HOME NUMBER JAIL CALLS CLAIM” ASSERTED IN HIS “SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS” AND “SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISSâ€" RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS â€" RECORDED JAIL CALLS” and MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY, OTHER EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING “KAUFMANN HOME NUMBER JAIL CALLS CLAIM” AT THE EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 16, 2019 AND AUGUST 23, 2019 
7/11/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/11/2019   
7/9/2019  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)  7/10/2019   
NOTE: County Attorney Montgomerys and MCAOs Notice of Supplemental Disclosure 
7/9/2019  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  7/10/2019   
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEY MONTGOMERY’S AND MCAO’S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE 
7/8/2019  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  7/9/2019   
NOTE: County Attorneys and MCAOs Joint Motion for Open Extension of time and Open Continuance of Evidentiary (s) Re: Allegations/Claims Re: Non-Disclosed "Handwritten Notes"/Contents of "Legal Box" Expedited Consideration Requested 
7/8/2019  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)  7/9/2019   
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEY’S AND MCAO’S JOINT MOTION FOR OPEN EXTENSION OF TIME AND OPEN CONTINUANCE OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING(S) RE: ALLEGATIONS/CLAIMS RE:NON-DISCLOSED “HANDWRITTEN NOTES”/CONTENTS OF “LEGAL BOX” 
7/5/2019  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  7/8/2019   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS – RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS – RECORDED JAIL CALLS 
7/2/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/2/2019   
7/2/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/3/2019   
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXPEDITED RULING – REQUEST FOR STAY 
6/25/2019  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  6/26/2019   
NOTE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER COURT ORDER FROM 6/14/19 STATUS CONFERENCE 
6/20/2019  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  6/20/2019   
6/20/2019  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  6/20/2019   
6/20/2019  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)  6/20/2019   
6/19/2019  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  6/19/2019   
6/14/2019  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  6/17/2019   
NOTE: County Attorney Montgomerys and MCAOs Notice of Supplemental Disclosure 
6/14/2019  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)  6/17/2019   
NOTE: County Attorney Montgomerys and MCAOs Notice of Supplemental Disclosure 
6/13/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  6/13/2019   
NOTE: of Disclosure Pursuant to Criminal Rule 15.2 
6/4/2019  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  6/5/2019   
NOTE: Motion for Extension of time Re: Response to Defendant Clements Supplement to Motion to Dismiss Right to Counsel and Due Process Expedited Consideration Requested 
4/24/2019  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)  4/24/2019   
4/24/2019  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  4/24/2019   
4/24/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  4/25/2019   
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEY/MCAOS REQUEST FOR DEFENSE DISCLOSURE PER RULE 15.2, ARIZ. R. CRIM. P. 
4/1/2019  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  4/1/2019   
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS â€" RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION REQUESTED 
3/29/2019  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  4/1/2019   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS – RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS 
3/29/2019  REL - Reply - Party (001)  4/1/2019   
NOTE: REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES 
3/21/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/21/2019   
3/14/2019  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  3/14/2019   
NOTE: Supplemental Notice of Disclosure Re: Witness Information 
3/12/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/12/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Disclosure Re: Witness Information 
3/12/2019  REL - Reply - Party (001)  3/13/2019   
NOTE: to States Response to Motion to Strike States Filings (Docket Entries 185, 187, 188, 189, 190, 192, 193, and 219) 
3/11/2019  RES - Response - Party (001)  3/12/2019   
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ SECOND MOTION TO STRIKE 
3/4/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  3/5/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Disclosure Re: Defense Email Request Dated March 1, 2019 
3/1/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/4/2019   
NOTE: to Strike Fillings 
2/27/2019  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/28/2019   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT RE: VIDEO AND AUDIO RECORDINGS RE: 06/28/18 CLEMENTS CELL SEARCH AND AUDIO RECORDING RE: 07/04/18 RETURN/DELIVERY OF SEIZED BOX TO CLEMENTS 
2/14/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/14/2019   
2/13/2019  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  2/13/2019   
2/13/2019  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  2/13/2019   
2/7/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/7/2019   
2/7/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  2/7/2019   
2/7/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  2/7/2019   
2/6/2019  REQ - Request - Party (001)  2/7/2019   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR EN CAMERA REVIEW OF PRIVILEGED INFORMATION  
2/6/2019  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  2/6/2019   
2/6/2019  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)  2/6/2019   
2/4/2019  RES - Response - Party (001)  2/5/2019   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ MOTION TO FILE UNTIMELY REPLY TO RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP AND EXCEED PAGE LIMIT 
2/4/2019  REL - Reply - Party (001)  2/5/2019   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION RE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTEFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES 
2/1/2019  RES - Response - Party (001)  2/4/2019   
NOTE: to States Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation RE: Response in Opposition to Defendant Clements Claims RE: Intentional Interference with his Confidential Attorney-Client Relationship RE: Clements Cell Searches 
2/1/2019  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/4/2019   
NOTE: Motion to File Untimely Reply to States Response to Defendant Clements Claims RE: Intentional Interference with his Confidential Attorney-Client Relationship and Exceed Page Limit 
1/31/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  1/31/2019   
1/31/2019  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  1/31/2019   
1/30/2019  RES - Response - Party (001)  1/31/2019   
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTEFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES  
1/30/2019  RES - Response - Party (001)  1/31/2019   
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTEFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES 
1/30/2019  STA - Statement - Party (001)  1/31/2019   
NOTE: STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ PRIVILEGE CLAIMS RE: 06/20/18 CLEMENTS CELL SEARCH AND 06/28/18 CLEMENTS CELL SEARCH 
1/30/2019  STA - Statement - Party (001)  1/31/2019   
NOTE: STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ PRIVILEGE CLAIMS RE: 06/20/18 CLEMENTS CELL SEARCH AND 06/28/18 CLEMENTS CELL SEARCH 
1/30/2019  RES - Response - Party (001)  1/30/2019   
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTEFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES 
12/17/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  12/17/2018   
12/14/2018  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  12/17/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Privileged Material 
12/6/2018  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)  12/6/2018   
12/6/2018  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)  12/6/2018   
10/17/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  10/17/2018   
10/17/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  10/17/2018   
10/10/2018  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  10/10/2018   
10/5/2018  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  10/5/2018   
10/4/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  10/5/2018   
NOTE: SCRIPPS MEDIA, INC.S’ MOTION TO INTERVENE FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF SECURING CAMERA COVERAGE OF DEFENDANT’S OCTOBER 19, 2018 EVIDENTIARY HEARING 
10/1/2018  STP - Stipulation - Party (001)  10/1/2018   
NOTE: CORRECTED STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINES1 
10/1/2018  STP - Stipulation - Party (002)  10/1/2018   
NOTE: CORRECTED STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINES1 
9/21/2018  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  9/24/2018   
NOTE: OBJECTION TO MEDIA COVERAGE 
9/11/2018  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  9/11/2018   
9/11/2018  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  9/11/2018   
9/4/2018  STP - Stipulation - Party (001)  9/4/2018   
NOTE: STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINES 
9/4/2018  STP - Stipulation - Party (002)  9/4/2018   
NOTE: STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINES 
8/17/2018  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  8/20/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS – RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS VIOLATION 
8/17/2018  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)  8/20/2018   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss - Right to Counsel and Due Process Violation 
8/13/2018  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  8/13/2018   
8/13/2018  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (002)  8/13/2018   
7/27/2018  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)  7/27/2018   
7/27/2018  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  7/27/2018   
7/17/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  7/17/2018   
7/16/2018  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)  7/16/2018   
7/16/2018  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  7/16/2018   
7/13/2018  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/16/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
7/13/2018  ORD - Order - Party (002)  7/17/2018   
NOTE: THAT SERGIO PAUL MACIAS THE WITNESS ABOVE-NAMED IS HEREBY REQUIRED TO GIVE TESTIMONY OR PRODUCE EVIDENCE AS TO THE WITHIN MATTER 
7/13/2018  ORD - Order - Party (001)  7/17/2018   
NOTE: THAT SERGIO PAUL MACIAS THE WITNESS ABOVE-NAMED IS HEREBY REQUIRED TO GIVE TESTIMONY OR PRODUCE EVIDENCE AS TO THE WITHIN MATTER 
7/10/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  7/10/2018   
7/6/2018  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  7/9/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
7/6/2018  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)  7/9/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
7/3/2018  PTT - Petition - Party (001)  7/3/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S PETITION FOR ORDER GRANTING IMMUNITY TO WITNESS 
7/3/2018  PTT - Petition - Party (002)  7/3/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S PETITION FOR ORDER GRANTING IMMUNITY TO WITNESS 
6/28/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  6/29/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE - TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE 
5/31/2018  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)  5/31/2018   
5/31/2018  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  5/31/2018   
5/29/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/29/2018   
5/23/2018  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  5/29/2018   
NOTE: TRIAL 
5/18/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  5/21/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR 5TH AMENDMENT COUNSEL FOR WITNESS SERGIO MACIAS 
5/17/2018  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  5/17/2018   
5/14/2018  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  5/14/2018   
5/7/2018  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  5/7/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
5/7/2018  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  5/7/2018   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS 
5/7/2018  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  5/7/2018   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTIONS UPON CONVICTION IN A CURRENTLY PENDING CASE 
5/7/2018  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  5/7/2018   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
5/7/2018  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (002)  5/7/2018   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTIONS UPON CONVICTION IN A CURRENTLY PENDING CASE 
5/7/2018  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (002)  5/7/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13- 704 
5/7/2018  ALG - Allegation - Party (002)  5/7/2018   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
5/7/2018  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  5/7/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 or A.R.S. § 13-704  
5/7/2018  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  5/7/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING 
5/7/2018  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)  5/7/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13- 704 
5/7/2018  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)  5/7/2018   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
5/2/2018  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)  5/2/2018   
5/2/2018  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  5/2/2018   
4/13/2018  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  4/13/2018   
4/9/2018  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  4/9/2018   
4/9/2018  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  4/9/2018   
4/4/2018  STA - Statement - Party (001)  4/5/2018   
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 
3/22/2018  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)  3/22/2018   
3/20/2018  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)  3/20/2018   
3/19/2018  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  3/19/2018   
3/16/2018  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  3/20/2018   
3/15/2018  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)  3/20/2018   
3/15/2018  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  3/20/2018   
3/15/2018  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  3/20/2018   
3/13/2018  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)  3/13/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND RULE 12.9 DEADLINE 
3/13/2018  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  3/13/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Defenses 
3/13/2018  REQ - Request - Party (002)  3/13/2018   
NOTE: Request for Discovery 
2/23/2018  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (002)  2/26/2018   
NOTE: Release Order 
2/23/2018  ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (002)  2/26/2018   
NOTE: Release Order 
2/16/2018  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  2/23/2018   
NOTE: THE TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF 
2/14/2018  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  2/16/2018   
2/14/2018  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  2/16/2018   
NOTE: PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E) 
2/14/2018  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  2/16/2018   
2/9/2018  SUM - Summons - Party (002)  2/9/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: SERVED 01/19/2018 
2/2/2018  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  2/2/2018   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE; REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES 
2/2/2018  REQ - Request - Party (001)  2/2/2018   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1 (a), (b), (d), (e) 
2/1/2018  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  2/1/2018   
1/29/2018  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  1/29/2018   
1/22/2018  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  1/23/2018   
1/22/2018  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)  1/23/2018   
1/12/2018  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  1/12/2018   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
1/12/2018  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  1/12/2018   
NOTE: IA Packet 
1/12/2018  WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)  1/12/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: 01/11/2018 
1/10/2018  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  1/12/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
1/10/2018  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  1/17/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
1/10/2018  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)  1/17/2018   
1/10/2018  IND - Indictment - Party (002)  2/9/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
1/10/2018  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)  2/13/2018  Plaintiff (1)  
1/10/2018  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (002)  2/13/2018   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/12/2018  5:00   Initial Appearance 
1/19/2018  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
1/23/2018  8:30   Status Conference 
2/22/2018  8:30   Status Conference 
2/23/2018  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
3/6/2018  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
4/4/2018  8:30   Status Conference 
4/4/2018  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
4/6/2018  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
4/24/2018  8:30   Status Conference 
4/24/2018  8:30   Status Conference 
5/7/2018  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
5/9/2018  8:30   Status Conference 
5/9/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/9/2018  8:30   Status Conference 
5/16/2018  8:00   Trial 
5/23/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/23/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/23/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
6/6/2018  8:00   Trial 
6/6/2018  8:00   Trial 
6/6/2018  8:00   Trial 
7/16/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/16/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/18/2018  8:00   Trial 
7/18/2018  8:00   Trial 
8/10/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/10/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/16/2018  8:00   Trial 
8/16/2018  8:00   Trial 
9/6/2018  8:30   Status Conference 
9/6/2018  8:30   Status Conference 
10/5/2018  9:00   Oral Argument 
10/5/2018  9:00   Oral Argument 
10/19/2018  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
10/19/2018  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
11/30/2018  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
11/30/2018  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
11/30/2018  8:30   Status Conference 
11/30/2018  8:30   Status Conference 
1/24/2019  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
2/4/2019  8:30   Oral Argument 
2/8/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
2/8/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
4/12/2019  9:00   Status Conference 
4/12/2019  9:00   Status Conference 
6/14/2019  9:00   Status Conference 
6/14/2019  9:00   Status Conference 
7/17/2019  8:30   Status Conference 
8/15/2019  10:00   Status Conference 
8/16/2019  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
8/16/2019  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
8/23/2019  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
8/23/2019  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
11/1/2019  13:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
11/1/2019  13:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
11/8/2019  9:00   Status Conference 
11/8/2019  9:00   Evidentiary Hearing 
11/8/2019  9:00   Status Conference 
11/8/2019  9:00   Evidentiary Hearing 
1/10/2020  10:00   Evidentiary Hearing 
1/10/2020  10:00   Evidentiary Hearing 
1/24/2020  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
1/24/2020  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing