« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Brady, Tiffany      
Shannon Marie Scott - (2)
 
Defendant  F   Finefrock, Scott   Master Calendar  CR2017-150505-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Shannon Marie Scott  13-1103A1 (F2)  MANSLAUGHTER-RECKLESS  11/2/2017  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  11/9/2017 
Shannon Marie Scott  13-1103A1 (F2)  MANSLAUGHTER-RECKLESS  11/2/2017       
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
7/6/2018  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  7/6/2018   
5/22/2018  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  5/22/2018   
5/16/2018  REQ - Request - Party (001)  5/22/2018   
NOTE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE/FORM
4/10/2018  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  4/10/2018   
3/28/2018  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  3/28/2018   
2/27/2018  BON - Bond - Party (001)  3/2/2018   
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY/$25000/UNIVERAL FIRE AND CASUALTY
2/26/2018  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  2/26/2018   
1/9/2018  599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  1/9/2018   
12/28/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/29/2017   
NOTE: Motion To Designate Case Complex
12/19/2017  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  12/27/2017   
12/18/2017  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  12/21/2017   
12/18/2017  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  12/22/2017   
12/18/2017  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  12/22/2017   
NOTE: TEMPORARY
12/14/2017  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  12/14/2017   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR REBUTTAL WITNESSES
12/8/2017  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  12/13/2017   
12/5/2017  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  12/7/2017   
NOTE: OFFICIAL
12/5/2017  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  12/7/2017   
NOTE: OR TAPES PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E)
12/5/2017  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  12/8/2017   
12/1/2017  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  12/1/2017   
11/29/2017  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  11/30/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
11/29/2017  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  11/30/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
11/21/2017  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  11/21/2017   
11/16/2017  FIN - Financial Information - Party (001)  11/16/2017   
NOTE: Financial
11/8/2017  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  11/9/2017  Plaintiff (1)  
11/8/2017  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  11/9/2017   
11/8/2017  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  11/9/2017  Plaintiff (1)  
11/8/2017  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  11/9/2017  Plaintiff (1)  
11/6/2017  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  11/6/2017   
11/6/2017  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  11/7/2017   
NOTE: IA Packet
11/6/2017  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  11/7/2017   
NOTE: IA Release Order
11/6/2017  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  11/7/2017   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
11/2/2017  20:00   Initial Appearance 
11/8/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
11/13/2017  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
11/16/2017  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
1/3/2018  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
2/1/2018  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
2/22/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/29/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/5/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/16/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/3/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/5/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/12/2018  8:00   Trial 
8/10/2018  13:30   Settlement Conference 
8/20/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/12/2018  8:00   Trial 
click here for Law Library Resource Center