Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Paine, Edward | ||
Annaleah Aalayah Nico Dominguez - (2) |
Defendant | F | Blumenreich, Joshua | Master Calendar | CR2017-149739-001 |
B Victim - (3) |
Victim | M | Dodge, Benjamin | ||
B Victim - (4) |
Victim | M | To Be Determined |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Annaleah Aalayah Nico Dominguez | 13-3415A (F6) | DRUG PARAPHERNALIA-POSSESS/USE | 10/29/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 11/8/2017 |
Annaleah Aalayah Nico Dominguez | 13-1103A1 (F2) | MANSLAUGHTER-RECKLESS | 10/29/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 11/8/2017 |
Annaleah Aalayah Nico Dominguez | 13-3405A1 (F6) | MARIJUANA-POSSESS/USE | 10/29/2017 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 11/8/2017 |
Annaleah Aalayah Nico Dominguez | 13-1102A (F4) | NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE | 10/29/2017 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 7/29/2022 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
12/12/2022 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 12/12/2022 | |
12/9/2022 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 12/14/2022 | |
NOTE: RESTITUTION | |||
12/2/2022 | STP - Stipulation - Party (001) | 12/5/2022 | |
NOTE: RESTITUTION STIPULATION | |||
12/1/2022 | STP - Stipulation - Party (001) | 12/2/2022 | |
NOTE: RESTITUTION STIPULATION | |||
10/31/2022 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 11/3/2022 | |
10/19/2022 | NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001) | 10/20/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Release of Deposit | |||
10/17/2022 | SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001) | 10/17/2022 | |
NOTE: SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration | |||
10/14/2022 | ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001) | 10/14/2022 | |
NOTE: Bond Exoneration | |||
10/14/2022 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 10/14/2022 | |
NOTE: Order of Confinement | |||
10/14/2022 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 10/14/2022 | |
NOTE: | |||
10/14/2022 | OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001) | 10/14/2022 | |
NOTE: Monetary Orders | |||
10/14/2022 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 10/14/2022 | |
NOTE: Presentence Report | |||
10/14/2022 | PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001) | 10/14/2022 | |
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents | |||
10/13/2022 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 10/14/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM | |||
10/13/2022 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 10/17/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM | |||
10/11/2022 | SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001) | 10/12/2022 | |
NOTE: Sentencing Memorandum and Notice of Filing of Letters | |||
10/4/2022 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 10/4/2022 | |
8/2/2022 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 8/2/2022 | |
NOTE: PLEA AGREEMENT | |||
8/1/2022 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 8/1/2022 | |
7/26/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 7/26/2022 | |
6/10/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 6/10/2022 | |
6/3/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 6/6/2022 | |
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
4/8/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 4/8/2022 | |
4/6/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 4/11/2022 | |
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
2/28/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 2/28/2022 | |
2/22/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 2/23/2022 | |
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
1/19/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 1/19/2022 | |
1/18/2022 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 1/18/2022 | |
1/14/2022 | OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001) | 1/24/2022 | |
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
1/10/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 1/11/2022 | |
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
11/19/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 11/19/2021 | |
11/16/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 11/17/2021 | |
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
9/27/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 9/27/2021 | |
9/22/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 9/27/2021 | |
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
9/7/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 9/7/2021 | |
9/1/2021 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 9/3/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE | |||
8/31/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 9/1/2021 | |
NOTE: Request to Travel Out of State from 9/23/2021 to 09/25/2021 | |||
7/22/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 7/22/2021 | |
7/12/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 7/13/2021 | |
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
4/14/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 4/14/2021 | |
4/12/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 4/13/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE OF APRIL 27, 2021 | |||
1/14/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 1/14/2021 | |
1/11/2021 | OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001) | 1/20/2021 | |
1/11/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 1/11/2021 | |
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
10/19/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 10/19/2020 | |
10/14/2020 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 10/22/2020 | |
NOTE: THAT THE TRIAL BE CONTINUED TO 01/26/21 @ 11:00 MAC;FTMC: 1/12/21 @ 9:00AM | |||
10/12/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 10/13/2020 | |
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
7/10/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 7/10/2020 | |
7/6/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 7/8/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
6/9/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 6/9/2020 | |
5/12/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 5/12/2020 | |
2/25/2020 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 2/25/2020 | |
2/19/2020 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 2/19/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE OF FEBRUARY 26, 2020 | |||
2/3/2020 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 2/3/2020 | |
1/28/2020 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 1/29/2020 | |
NOTE: AFFIRMING DEFENDANTS INDIGENCY FOR THE PURPOSE OF OBTAINING EXPERTS | |||
1/15/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 1/15/2020 | |
1/15/2020 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001) | 1/16/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Reconsider Defendants Affirmation of Indigence and Proposed Order | |||
12/13/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 12/13/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO AFFIRM DEFENDANT’S INDIGENCY | |||
12/3/2019 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 12/3/2019 | |
11/25/2019 | NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001) | 12/4/2019 | |
11/22/2019 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 11/25/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
10/18/2019 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 10/18/2019 | |
8/26/2019 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001) | 8/26/2019 | |
8/19/2019 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 8/20/2019 | |
NOTE: STATE’S COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT | |||
7/25/2019 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 7/30/2019 | |
7/18/2019 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
7/18/2019 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
7/18/2019 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
7/12/2019 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 7/12/2019 | |
6/17/2019 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 6/17/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
5/9/2019 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 5/9/2019 | |
3/28/2019 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/28/2019 | |
3/7/2019 | 099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001) | 3/7/2019 | |
2/7/2019 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001) | 2/8/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |||
1/18/2019 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 1/18/2019 | |
11/21/2018 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 11/21/2018 | |
11/5/2018 | 081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001) | 11/5/2018 | |
10/18/2018 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 10/19/2018 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: REQUEST CHANGE OF COUNSEL | |||
9/21/2018 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 9/21/2018 | |
9/12/2018 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 9/18/2018 | |
7/12/2018 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001) | 7/12/2018 | |
7/2/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/3/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CHANGE FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE | |||
6/26/2018 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 6/26/2018 | |
6/11/2018 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 6/14/2018 | |
NOTE: TRIAL | |||
5/2/2018 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 5/2/2018 | |
3/5/2018 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/5/2018 | |
1/9/2018 | 599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 1/9/2018 | |
1/8/2018 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 1/11/2018 | |
1/5/2018 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 1/11/2018 | |
NOTE: PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E) | |||
1/5/2018 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 1/11/2018 | |
1/5/2018 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 1/12/2018 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
1/4/2018 | NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001) | 1/4/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY | |||
1/4/2018 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 1/4/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
1/2/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 1/3/2018 | |
NOTE: Motion for Complex Case Designation | |||
12/26/2017 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 12/27/2017 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR SPECIFIC ITEMS OF EVIDENCE | |||
12/26/2017 | RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001) | 12/27/2017 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(a) and (b) AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1(c) | |||
12/26/2017 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 12/27/2017 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR REBUTTAL WITNESSES | |||
12/6/2017 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 12/11/2017 | |
NOTE: CASH BAIL | |||
11/30/2017 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 11/30/2017 | |
11/21/2017 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 11/21/2017 | |
11/14/2017 | FIN - Financial Information - Party (001) | 11/14/2017 | |
NOTE: IA SUMMONS FINANCIAL INFORMATION | |||
11/7/2017 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 11/8/2017 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/7/2017 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 11/8/2017 | |
11/7/2017 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 11/8/2017 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/7/2017 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 11/8/2017 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/3/2017 | NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001) | 11/6/2017 | |
NOTE: $2500 | |||
10/31/2017 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 10/31/2017 | |
10/31/2017 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 11/1/2017 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/31/2017 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 11/1/2017 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/31/2017 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 11/2/2017 | Plaintiff (1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
10/29/2017 | 23:00 | Initial Appearance |
11/6/2017 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
11/8/2017 | 8:45 | Preliminary Hearing |
11/14/2017 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
1/3/2018 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
2/1/2018 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
2/28/2018 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
4/30/2018 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
6/11/2018 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
7/11/2018 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
7/18/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
9/11/2018 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/12/2018 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/18/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
10/31/2018 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
11/7/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
11/14/2018 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
1/16/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/5/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/14/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
4/30/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
7/8/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
8/20/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
10/14/2019 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
11/25/2019 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/2/2019 | 8:00 | Trial |
1/28/2020 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
1/28/2020 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
2/20/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/26/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
5/11/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/18/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
6/16/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/23/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
8/13/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/20/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
10/13/2020 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/20/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
1/12/2021 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
1/26/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
1/26/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
4/13/2021 | 9:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/27/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
7/15/2021 | 9:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
7/29/2021 | 9:00 | Trial |
9/23/2021 | 9:20 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/7/2021 | 9:00 | Trial |
11/17/2021 | 9:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
11/30/2021 | 9:00 | Trial |
1/11/2022 | 10:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
1/20/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
2/23/2022 | 9:50 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/10/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
4/7/2022 | 9:50 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/21/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
6/6/2022 | 10:10 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/16/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
7/20/2022 | 9:50 | Pre-Trial Conference |
7/29/2022 | 9:00 | Settlement Conference |
8/2/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
9/19/2022 | 9:20 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/3/2022 | 9:00 | Acceptance Of Plea/Snt |
10/4/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
10/14/2022 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
10/14/2022 | 9:00 | Acceptance Of Plea/Snt |
12/2/2022 | 9:00 | Restitution Hearing |