« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, T R L East Valley
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Bruce Tyrone MaxwellIII - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Kimerer, Michael
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2017-149698-001
Party Name
B Victim - (3)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
M
Attorney
Udelman, Randall
Judge
Case #
CR2017-149698-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2017-149698-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Bruce Tyrone Maxwell III
Crime Date
10/28/2017
Date
11/7/2017
Description
DISORD CONDUCT-WEAPON/INSTR
ARSCode
13-2904A6 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Bruce Tyrone Maxwell III
Crime Date
10/28/2017
Date
11/7/2017
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Bruce Tyrone Maxwell III
Crime Date
10/28/2017
Date
4/13/2018
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Bruce Tyrone Maxwell III
Crime Date
10/28/2017
Date
4/13/2018
Description
DISORDERLY CONDUCT
ARSCode
13-2904A (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2019
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MAXWELL’S
MOTION TO DESIGNATE OFFENSE
A MISDEMEANOR
Filing Date
2/26/2019
Description
119 - ME: Ord Discharge/Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2019
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MAXWELL’S
EXPEDITED AND UNOPPOSED
MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO PERMIT EXTENDED OUT-OF-COUNTRY TRAVEL
Filing Date
10/12/2018
Description
118 - ME: Modifica/Terms Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Maxwells Motion to Modify Terms of Unsupervised Probation to Delete Jail Term and Delete All Remaining Terms Except 1 and 15
Filing Date
8/23/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MAXWELL’S MOTION TO APPROVE SUBSTANCE ABUSE TREATMENT COMPLETION
Filing Date
8/10/2018
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Establish Start Date
Filing Date
7/10/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2018
Description
SOU - Sentencing Order Unsupervised - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOU - Sentencing Order Unsupervised
Filing Date
7/3/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2018
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
7/2/2018
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
7/2/2018
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement Jail
Filing Date
7/2/2018
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2 Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
7/2/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
6/29/2018
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sentencing Memorandum
Filing Date
6/8/2018
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2018
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT/AVOWAL OF DEFENSE CUNSEL REGARDING SENTENCING HEARING DATE
Filing Date
5/7/2018
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit/Avowal of Defense Counsel regarding Sentencing Hearing DATE
Filing Date
5/4/2018
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2018
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2018
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order/$10,000
Filing Date
3/7/2018
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Release Conditions to Permit Open Travel - Unopposed
Filing Date
2/13/2018
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
2/7/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2018
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL CONTINUANCE/FORM
Filing Date
1/29/2018
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Expedited Unopposed Motion to Extend Travel and Permit Travel to Georgia
Filing Date
12/29/2017
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/2017
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S UNOPPOSED
MOTION FOR PERMISSION
TO TRAVEL
Filing Date
12/19/2017
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2017
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2017
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2017
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/14/2017
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE STILL AND ELECTRONIC CAMERAS
Filing Date
12/12/2017
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
12/12/2017
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/8/2017
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2017
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2017
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLIEN TO FILE MOTION FOR REMAND PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9 OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
12/6/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Defenses, Witnesses and Exhibits
Filing Date
12/6/2017
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPTS PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E)
Filing Date
12/6/2017
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E)
Filing Date
11/30/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2017
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2017
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURETY/$10,000/UNIVERAL FIRE AND CASUALTY
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order $10,000.00,
Filing Date
11/13/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Motion for Permission to Travel (Expedited Ruling Requested)
Filing Date
11/10/2017
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF VICTIM
COUNSEL PURSUANT TO A.R.S.
SECTION 13-4437(A) AND RULE
39(C)(4) OF THE ARIZONA RULES
OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT BRUCE TYRONE MAXWELL
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/29/2017
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
11/6/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/8/2017
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
11/14/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/28/2017
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/29/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
2/12/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
2/12/2018
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
3/14/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/3/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/10/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/13/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
6/4/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
6/6/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/2/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
8/2/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/9/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/7/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference