« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 2 Family Violence East
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Jay Edwards Fields - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Sullivan, Courtney
Judge
Starr
Case #
CR2017-135781-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2017-135781-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Jay Edwards Fields 
Crime Date
8/4/2017
Date
8/14/2017
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Jay Edwards Fields 
Crime Date
8/4/2017
Date
8/14/2017
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Jay Edwards Fields 
Crime Date
8/4/2017
Date
8/14/2017
Description
BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1508 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Jay Edwards Fields 
Crime Date
8/4/2017
Date
2/9/2018
Description
BURGLARY 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1508A (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Jay Edwards Fields 
Crime Date
8/4/2017
Date
2/9/2018
Description
DISORDERLY CONDUCT
ARSCode
13-2904 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Jay Edwards Fields 
Crime Date
8/4/2017
Date
2/9/2018
Description
AGG ASLT-DEADLY WPN/DANG INST
ARSCode
13-1204A2 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2023
Description
OSJ - Order re: Setting Aside Judgment of Guilt - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2023
Description
ORR - Order re: Restoring Civil Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING the application to restore civil rights and right to possess or own a firearm
Filing Date
10/18/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2022
Description
CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
Filing Date
10/7/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S SECOND APPLICATION TO DESIGNATE A CLASS 6 UNDESIGNATED FELONY AS A MISDEMEANOR
Filing Date
10/5/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE CONVICTION
Filing Date
9/30/2022
Description
ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SET ASIDE CONVICTION/RESTORE GUN RIGHTS
Filing Date
9/30/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
APPLICATION TO DESIGNATE A CLASS 6 UNDESIGNATED FELONY AS A MISDEMEANOR
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/4/2022
Description
119 - ME: Ord Discharge/Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2022
Description
CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S APPLICATION TO DESIGNATE A CLASS 6 UNDESIGNATED FELONY AS A MISDEMEANOR; AND STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE CONVICTION
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
APPLICATION TO DESIGNATE A CLASS 6 UNDESIGNATED FELONY AS A MISDEMEANOR
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
RESTORE GUN RIGHTS
Filing Date
11/13/2019
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms COUNT 2
Filing Date
10/4/2019
Description
PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/4/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
4/2/2018
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2
Filing Date
3/29/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2018
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
3/15/2018
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
3/15/2018
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
3/15/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
3/15/2018
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2 Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
3/15/2018
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
2/13/2018
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2018
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2018
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2018
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
12/22/2017
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2017
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2017
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL
Filing Date
10/19/2017
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2017
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY $5000 UNIVERSAL FIRE & CASUALTY
Filing Date
10/9/2017
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2017
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2017
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order/$5,000
Filing Date
10/3/2017
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
10/2/2017
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify Release Conditions to Allow Out-of-State Travel and to Remove Electronic Monitoring
Filing Date
9/27/2017
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/25/2017
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Rule 15.2 Disclosure and Request for Disclosure
Filing Date
9/14/2017
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2017
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2017
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E)
Filing Date
9/11/2017
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
9/8/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
$5000
Filing Date
8/22/2017
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2017
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE OR TO REDUCE BOND OR TO RELEASE DEFENDANT TO PRETRIAL SERVICES
Filing Date
8/18/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order $15,000.00
Filing Date
8/18/2017
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Within Firm
Filing Date
8/17/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
8/16/2017
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
8/11/2017
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/11/2017
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/11/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/7/2017
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
8/7/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/5/2017
Time
11:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
8/11/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/15/2017
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
8/18/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
9/5/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/29/2017
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
10/6/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/1/2017
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
12/7/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/14/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/18/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/16/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/16/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/23/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/9/2018
Time
15:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
3/6/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/14/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/15/2018
Time
8:40
Event
Sentencing