« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Walker, Stephen      
Christopher Jordan Crawford - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Wooten, Robert   Mata  CR2017-109659-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Christopher Jordan Crawford  13-1204A (F6)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  2/25/2017  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  4/24/2018 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
7/31/2018  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  8/1/2018   
7/30/2018  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  7/30/2018   
7/26/2018  SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)  7/26/2018   
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
7/24/2018  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (001)  7/24/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review
7/24/2018  PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)  7/24/2018   
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents
7/24/2018  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  7/24/2018   
NOTE: Presentence Report
7/24/2018  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  7/24/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 1 Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
7/24/2018  ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)  7/24/2018   
NOTE: ORDER EXONERATING BOND
7/24/2018  OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)  7/24/2018   
NOTE: Order of Confinement Jail
7/23/2018  SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)  7/24/2018   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
6/7/2018  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  6/7/2018   
5/7/2018  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  5/10/2018   
NOTE: SERVED 4-10-18
4/27/2018  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  4/27/2018   
4/27/2018  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  4/27/2018   
4/24/2018  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  4/25/2018   
4/23/2018  REQ - Request - Party (001)  4/24/2018   
NOTE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE FORM
4/11/2018  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  4/11/2018   
4/5/2018  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  4/5/2018   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE
3/27/2018  331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)  3/27/2018   
3/26/2018  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  3/26/2018   
2/27/2018  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  2/27/2018   
2/14/2018  REQ - Request - Party (001)  2/22/2018   
NOTE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE /FORM
12/21/2017  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  12/21/2017   
12/4/2017  REQ - Request - Party (001)  12/11/2017   
NOTE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE / FORM
11/28/2017  331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)  11/28/2017   
11/20/2017  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  11/22/2017   
NOTE: Defendants Settlement Conference Memorandum
10/26/2017  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  10/26/2017   
10/13/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  10/13/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance
10/5/2017  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  10/6/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record
10/2/2017  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  10/2/2017   
9/19/2017  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  9/19/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial
8/29/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/29/2017   
7/24/2017  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  7/24/2017   
7/17/2017  REQ - Request - Party (001)  7/26/2017   
NOTE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE/ FORM
6/22/2017  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  6/22/2017   
6/14/2017  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  6/14/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
6/14/2017  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  6/14/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
6/14/2017  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  6/14/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF VIOLENT CRIME PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-901.03
6/14/2017  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  6/15/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES, WITNESSES AND EVIDENCE, NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR REBUTTAL WITNESSES
5/3/2017  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  5/3/2017   
5/2/2017  WPH - Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)  5/5/2017   
5/2/2017  INF - Information - Party (001)  6/7/2017   
NOTE: INFORMATION
4/27/2017  BON - Bond - Party (001)  5/1/2017   
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY/$5000/AMERICAN SURETY
4/13/2017  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/13/2017   
4/12/2017  ORD - Order - Party (001)  4/17/2017   
NOTE: NUNC PRO TUNC/MINUTE ENTRY DATED 03/24/17 TITLED SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL IS CORRECTED
4/5/2017  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  4/5/2017   
4/4/2017  OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)  4/6/2017   
4/4/2017  ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)  4/4/2017   
NOTE: Secured Appearance Bond $5000
4/3/2017  RES - Response - Party (001)  4/3/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
3/27/2017  098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (001)  3/27/2017   
3/27/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/28/2017   
NOTE: MOTION FOR NUNC PRO TUNC CORRECTION OF MARCH 24, 2016 MINUTE ENTRY
3/27/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/28/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Modify Release Conditions
3/24/2017  ORD - Order - Party (001)  3/28/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE AND /OF ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER TO THE OFFICE OF LEGAL ADVOCATE
3/16/2017  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)  3/16/2017   
3/7/2017  OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)  3/9/2017   
3/6/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  3/7/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
3/3/2017  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  3/3/2017   
3/2/2017  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  3/3/2017   
NOTE: IA Release Order
3/2/2017  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  3/3/2017   
NOTE: IA Packet
3/2/2017  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  3/2/2017   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
3/7/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
3/7/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
3/10/2017  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
4/4/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
4/7/2017  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
5/2/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
5/2/2017  8:31   Original Arraignment Hearing 
5/4/2017  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
6/15/2017  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
7/17/2017  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
8/21/2017  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/21/2017  8:45   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
8/28/2017  8:00   Trial 
9/25/2017  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/2/2017  8:00   Trial 
10/5/2017  13:30   Settlement Conference 
11/22/2017  8:00   Settlement Conference 
12/4/2017  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
12/11/2017  8:00   Trial 
2/14/2018  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
2/21/2018  8:00   Trial 
3/20/2018  8:45   Status Conference 
3/22/2018  8:00   Settlement Conference 
4/16/2018  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/23/2018  8:00   Trial 
4/23/2018  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/24/2018  8:30   Change Of Plea 
4/30/2018  8:00   Trial 
5/24/2018  8:45   Pre-Trial Conference 
5/31/2018  8:00   Trial 
6/7/2018  8:30   Sentencing 
7/24/2018  8:30   Sentencing 
click here for Law Library Resource Center