« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Gray, Lacey      
Joshua Michael Schroder - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Horan, Adnan   Master Calendar  CR2017-106952-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Joshua Michael Schroder  13-1405A (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  9/1/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/21/2017 
Joshua Michael Schroder  13-3613A (M1)  CONTRIB DELINQ/DEPEND OF MINOR  10/1/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/21/2017 
Joshua Michael Schroder  13-1405A (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  10/1/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/21/2017 
Joshua Michael Schroder  13-3613A (M1)  CONTRIB DELINQ/DEPEND OF MINOR  10/1/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/21/2017 
Joshua Michael Schroder  13-1405A (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  9/1/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/21/2017 
Joshua Michael Schroder  13-1405A (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  9/1/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  2/21/2017 
Joshua Michael Schroder  13-1405A (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  10/1/2016  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  9/12/2017 
Joshua Michael Schroder  13-1405A (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  9/1/2016       
Joshua Michael Schroder  13-1405A (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  9/1/2016       
Joshua Michael Schroder  13-1405A (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  9/1/2016  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  9/12/2017 
Joshua Michael Schroder  13-3613A (M1)  CONTRIB DELINQ/DEPEND OF MINOR  10/1/2016       
Joshua Michael Schroder  13-3613A (M1)  CONTRIB DELINQ/DEPEND OF MINOR  10/1/2016       
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
9/19/2017  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  9/19/2017   
9/12/2017  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  9/13/2017   
8/24/2017  ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  8/25/2017   
NOTE: Order Regarding Counsel
7/28/2017  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  7/28/2017   
7/20/2017  REQ - Request - Party (001)  7/25/2017   
NOTE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE FORM
6/29/2017  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  6/29/2017   
6/20/2017  REQ - Request - Party (001)  6/26/2017   
NOTE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE/ FORM
5/26/2017  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  5/26/2017   
5/19/2017  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  5/19/2017   
NOTE: STATES ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
5/17/2017  REQ - Request - Party (001)  5/18/2017   
NOTE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE / FORM
5/3/2017  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  5/3/2017   
4/12/2017  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  4/12/2017   
4/6/2017  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  4/6/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
4/5/2017  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/7/2017   
NOTE: TEMPORARY
4/5/2017  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  4/5/2017   
NOTE: Defendants Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Filing Motion for Remand
3/30/2017  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/4/2017   
NOTE: TEMPORARY
3/30/2017  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  4/4/2017   
NOTE: TAPES
3/30/2017  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/4/2017   
3/29/2017  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/29/2017   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
3/23/2017  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  3/23/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
3/23/2017  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)  3/23/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
3/22/2017  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/27/2017   
3/17/2017  ORD - Order - Party (001)  3/21/2017   
NOTE: AUTHORIZING AND DIRECTING THE CLERK OF SUPERIOR COURT TO SURRENDER INTO THE TEMPORARY CUSTODY OF THE ATTORNEY SEEKING CUSTODY OF THE GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT
3/17/2017  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  3/22/2017   
3/17/2017  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  3/21/2017   
3/13/2017  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  3/14/2017   
3/9/2017  BON - Bond - Party (001)  3/13/2017   
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY/$10000/ACCREDITED SURETY & CASUALTY
3/2/2017  REQ - Request - Party (001)  3/2/2017   
NOTE: Request for Discovery
3/2/2017  STA - Statement - Party (001)  3/2/2017   
NOTE: Defendants Rule 15.2 Disclosure Statement
3/1/2017  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  3/1/2017   
2/22/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  2/22/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance and Request for Entry of Plea of "Not Guilty"
2/17/2017  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  2/21/2017  Plaintiff (1)  
2/17/2017  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  2/21/2017   
2/17/2017  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  2/21/2017  Plaintiff (1)  
2/17/2017  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  2/21/2017  Plaintiff (1)  
2/17/2017  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/21/2017  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
2/16/2017  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/16/2017   
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM INDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
2/15/2017  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  2/15/2017   
2/15/2017  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  2/16/2017   
NOTE: IA Packet
2/15/2017  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  2/16/2017   
NOTE: IA Release Order
2/15/2017  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  2/16/2017   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
2/13/2017  8:00   Initial Appearance 
2/17/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
2/23/2017  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
2/24/2017  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
4/7/2017  8:15   Oral Argument 
4/12/2017  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
5/17/2017  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
6/20/2017  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
7/13/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/20/2017  8:00   Trial 
7/20/2017  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
8/14/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/21/2017  8:00   Trial 
9/12/2017  8:00   Settlement Conference 
9/13/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/14/2017  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
9/20/2017  8:00   Trial 
10/10/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/12/2017  8:30   Sentencing 
10/24/2017  8:00   Trial 
click here for Law Library Resource Center