Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Hernandez, Evelyn | ||
Christopher Clements - (2) |
Defendant | M | Forner, Nikolas | Master Calendar | CR2017-005669-001 |
Melissa Stark - (3) |
Defendant | F | Rothschild, David | Yost | CR2017-005669-002 |
Christopher Cooley - (4) |
Witness | M | Foutz, Brian |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Christopher Clements | 13-2310A (F2) | FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES | 10/28/2015 | Guilty By Jury | Guilty By Jury | 4/18/2022 |
Christopher Clements | 13-1507A (F3) | BURGLARY 2ND DEGREE | 10/28/2015 | Guilty By Jury | Guilty By Jury | 4/18/2022 |
Christopher Clements | 13-1802A1 (F3) | THEFT-CONTROL PROPERTY | 10/28/2015 | Guilty By Jury | Guilty By Jury | 4/18/2022 |
Christopher Clements | 13-1507A (F3) | BURGLARY 2ND DEGREE | 11/11/2015 | Guilty By Jury | Guilty By Jury | 4/18/2022 |
Melissa Stark | 13-2310A (F2) | FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES | 10/28/2015 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 6/4/2021 |
Melissa Stark | 13-1507A (F3) | BURGLARY 2ND DEGREE | 10/28/2015 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/4/2021 |
Melissa Stark | 13-1802A1 (F3) | THEFT-CONTROL PROPERTY | 10/28/2015 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/4/2021 |
Melissa Stark | 13-1507A (F3) | BURGLARY 2ND DEGREE | 11/11/2015 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 6/4/2021 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
11/3/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 11/3/2023 | |
11/3/2023 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002) | 11/3/2023 | |
11/2/2023 | ORD - Order - Party (002) | 11/3/2023 | |
NOTE: ORDER SEALING THE MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING HEARING | |||
11/2/2023 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 11/3/2023 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING HEARING | |||
11/2/2023 | OTC – Order to Continue - Party (002) | 11/8/2023 | |
10/30/2023 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002) | 11/1/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL | |||
8/28/2023 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 9/1/2023 | |
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL | |||
8/28/2023 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 9/5/2023 | |
NOTE: Public defender | |||
8/21/2023 | AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001) | 8/30/2023 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
8/21/2023 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001) | 8/30/2023 | |
8/3/2023 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002) | 8/3/2023 | |
8/1/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 8/1/2023 | |
7/31/2023 | MEM - Memorandum - Party (001) | 8/1/2023 | |
7/31/2023 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 8/1/2023 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING HEARING | |||
7/31/2023 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 8/1/2023 | |
NOTE: AMENDED MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING HEARING | |||
7/31/2023 | OTC – Order to Continue - Party (002) | 8/10/2023 | |
7/24/2023 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002) | 7/27/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL | |||
7/21/2023 | SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002) | 8/10/2023 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING HEARING | |||
4/26/2023 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002) | 4/26/2023 | |
4/25/2023 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 4/27/2023 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING HEARING | |||
4/25/2023 | SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002) | 5/10/2023 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING HEARING (UNDER SEAL) | |||
4/25/2023 | OTC – Order to Continue - Party (002) | 5/10/2023 | |
4/17/2023 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002) | 4/17/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing Document Under Seal | |||
1/31/2023 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002) | 1/31/2023 | |
1/30/2023 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 2/3/2023 | |
NOTE: TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL | |||
1/30/2023 | OTC – Order to Continue - Party (002) | 2/21/2023 | |
1/30/2023 | OTC – Order to Continue - Party (002) | 2/21/2023 | |
1/26/2023 | SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002) | 2/7/2023 | |
1/26/2023 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 1/31/2023 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING HEARING | |||
1/23/2023 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002) | 1/23/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing Under Seal | |||
11/1/2022 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002) | 11/1/2022 | |
10/25/2022 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002) | 10/25/2022 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL | |||
10/24/2022 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 10/25/2022 | |
NOTE: PUBLIC DEFENDER | |||
10/24/2022 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 10/25/2022 | |
NOTE: PUBLIC DEFENDER | |||
8/1/2022 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002) | 8/1/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing Document Under Seal | |||
8/1/2022 | REC - Receipt - Party (001) | 8/2/2022 | |
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL | |||
7/27/2022 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001) | 7/28/2022 | |
7/27/2022 | AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001) | 7/28/2022 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
7/26/2022 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001) | 7/27/2022 | |
7/8/2022 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 7/19/2022 | |
7/7/2022 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 7/18/2022 | |
7/7/2022 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 7/18/2022 | |
7/7/2022 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 7/19/2022 | |
6/30/2022 | 021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001) | 6/30/2022 | |
6/28/2022 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 7/1/2022 | |
6/24/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 6/24/2022 | |
6/24/2022 | DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (001) | 6/27/2022 | |
NOTE: AMENDED DESIGNATION OF RECORD FOR APPEAL | |||
6/22/2022 | DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (001) | 6/22/2022 | |
NOTE: Designation of Record for Appeal | |||
6/21/2022 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001) | 6/22/2022 | |
6/17/2022 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 6/20/2022 | |
NOTE: NOTIFICATION NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED | |||
6/16/2022 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 6/21/2022 | |
6/10/2022 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001) | 6/14/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appeal from Superior Court | |||
6/9/2022 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 6/9/2022 | |
6/8/2022 | SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001) | 6/8/2022 | |
NOTE: SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration | |||
6/7/2022 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 6/8/2022 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM WITH ATTACHMENTS | |||
6/7/2022 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 6/8/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE'S SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION WITH ATTACHMENTS | |||
6/7/2022 | WSH - Worksheet - Party (001) | 6/10/2022 | |
NOTE: TRIAL | |||
6/7/2022 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001) | 6/7/2022 | |
NOTE: Order of Confinement | |||
6/7/2022 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 6/7/2022 | |
NOTE: Presentence Report | |||
6/7/2022 | OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001) | 6/7/2022 | |
NOTE: Monetary Orders | |||
6/7/2022 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 6/7/2022 | |
NOTE: | |||
6/7/2022 | PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001) | 6/7/2022 | |
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents | |||
5/27/2022 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 6/1/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO STRIKE STATE’S UNTIMELY ALLEGATION OF ADDITIONAL HISTORICAL PRIOR/PRECLUDE RECENTLY DISCLOSED MATERIALS | |||
5/18/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/19/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Strike States Untimely Allegation of Addition Historical Prior/ Preclude Recently Disclosed Materials | |||
5/12/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 5/12/2022 | |
5/11/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 5/11/2022 | |
5/11/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 5/11/2022 | |
5/10/2022 | ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001) | 5/11/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF ADDITIONAL HISTORICAL PRIORS | |||
5/9/2022 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 5/10/2022 | |
NOTE: Reply to States Response to Defendants Renewed Motion for Judgment of Acquittal | |||
5/9/2022 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 5/10/2022 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL | |||
5/6/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 5/6/2022 | |
5/4/2022 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002) | 5/4/2022 | |
5/3/2022 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 5/4/2022 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL | |||
5/3/2022 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 5/4/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING HEARING | |||
5/3/2022 | ORD - Order - Party (002) | 5/4/2022 | |
5/3/2022 | ORD - Order - Party (002) | 5/4/2022 | |
5/3/2022 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002) | 5/4/2022 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL | |||
5/2/2022 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 5/3/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL | |||
5/2/2022 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 5/3/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL | |||
5/2/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/3/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL | |||
4/29/2022 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002) | 5/2/2022 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL | |||
4/22/2022 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 4/28/2022 | |
4/21/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/22/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion for New Trial | |||
4/21/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/25/2022 | |
NOTE: RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL | |||
4/20/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 4/20/2022 | |
4/18/2022 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 4/20/2022 | |
NOTE: SEALED JURY QUESTIONNAIRES | |||
4/18/2022 | JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
4/18/2022 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: AGGRAVATING | |||
4/18/2022 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: AGGRAVATING | |||
4/18/2022 | WSH - Worksheet - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: TRIAL | |||
4/18/2022 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
4/18/2022 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
4/18/2022 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
4/18/2022 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
4/18/2022 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
4/18/2022 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
4/18/2022 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
4/18/2022 | VER - Verdict - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
4/18/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 4/18/2022 | |
4/18/2022 | RON – Release Order No Bond - Party (001) | 4/18/2022 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
4/15/2022 | 085 - ME: Conference - Party (001) | 4/15/2022 | |
4/14/2022 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: FINAL | |||
4/14/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 4/14/2022 | |
4/14/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 4/14/2022 | |
4/13/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 4/13/2022 | |
4/13/2022 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: FINAL | |||
4/13/2022 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: FINAL | |||
4/12/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #31 | |||
4/12/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #32 | |||
4/12/2022 | MEM - Memorandum - Party (001) | 4/14/2022 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO STATE’S MEMORANDUM ADDRESSING DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR MISTRIAL | |||
4/12/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/14/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL | |||
4/11/2022 | MEM - Memorandum - Party (001) | 4/13/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MEMORANDUM ADDRESSING DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR MISTRIAL | |||
4/11/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/12/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion for Mistrial | |||
4/11/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 4/11/2022 | |
4/8/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 4/8/2022 | |
4/7/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 4/7/2022 | |
4/7/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #23 | |||
4/7/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #24 | |||
4/7/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #25 | |||
4/7/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #26 | |||
4/7/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #27 | |||
4/7/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #28 | |||
4/7/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #29 | |||
4/7/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #30 | |||
4/6/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #22 | |||
4/6/2022 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 4/8/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S 404(B) LIMITING INSTRUCTION | |||
4/6/2022 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 4/11/2022 | |
NOTE: E-MAIL TO COUNCEL REGARDING JUROR 11 DATED 04/06/2022 | |||
4/5/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 4/5/2022 | |
4/4/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 4/4/2022 | |
4/1/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 4/1/2022 | |
4/1/2022 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 4/5/2022 | |
NOTE: INDEX OF 404(B) EXHIBITS FOR TRIAL (FILED FOR APPELLATE PURPOSES) | |||
4/1/2022 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 4/6/2022 | |
NOTE: LIMITING INSTRUCTION FOR 404(B) EVIDENCE | |||
4/1/2022 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 4/6/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice - Error of 404(B) Evidence | |||
3/31/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 3/31/2022 | |
3/31/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 3/31/2022 | |
3/31/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #17 | |||
3/31/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #18 | |||
3/31/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #19 | |||
3/31/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #20 | |||
3/31/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #21 | |||
3/30/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #13 | |||
3/30/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #14 | |||
3/30/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #15 | |||
3/30/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #16 | |||
3/30/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 3/30/2022 | |
3/29/2022 | EMF - Email Filed - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
3/29/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #7 | |||
3/29/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #8 | |||
3/29/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #9 | |||
3/29/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #6 | |||
3/29/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #11 | |||
3/29/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #12 | |||
3/28/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #1 | |||
3/28/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #2 | |||
3/28/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #3 | |||
3/28/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #4 | |||
3/28/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #5 | |||
3/28/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #6 | |||
3/28/2022 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: PRIMARY | |||
3/28/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #5 | |||
3/28/2022 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 3/30/2022 | |
NOTE: LETTER DATED 03/25/2022 | |||
3/28/2022 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (001) | 3/28/2022 | |
3/24/2022 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 3/28/2022 | |
NOTE: SERVED 03/24/2022 | |||
3/24/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 3/24/2022 | |
3/23/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 3/23/2022 | |
3/23/2022 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 3/30/2022 | |
NOTE: THA THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SET FOR TRIAL COMMENCING MARCH 24,2022 IN THE MARICOPA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, PHOENIX ARIZONA | |||
3/22/2022 | EMF - Email Filed - Party (001) | 3/31/2022 | |
3/21/2022 | PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001) | 3/24/2022 | |
3/21/2022 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 3/21/2022 | |
3/18/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 3/18/2022 | |
3/17/2022 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 3/21/2022 | |
NOTE: DEFENSE MOTION IN LIMINE – NO.4 | |||
3/17/2022 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 3/31/2022 | |
3/16/2022 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/21/2022 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF OFFER OF PROOF: ALEX LONGACRE | |||
3/16/2022 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 3/21/2022 | |
NOTE: DEFENSE MOTION IN LIMINE – NO.3 | |||
3/14/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 3/14/2022 | |
3/11/2022 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 3/22/2022 | |
3/10/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 3/10/2022 | |
3/10/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
3/10/2022 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: PRELIMINARY | |||
3/10/2022 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: PRELIMINARY | |||
3/9/2022 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 3/14/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SANCTION FOR DISCLOSURE VIOLATION | |||
3/9/2022 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 3/14/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 | |||
3/9/2022 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 3/14/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS REQUEST TO USE RULE 609 EVIDENCE | |||
3/9/2022 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 3/14/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, INFERENCES OR ARGUMENTS THAT DIRECTLY CONTRADICT THE DEFENDANT’S PREVIOUSLY SWORN TESTIMONY | |||
3/9/2022 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 3/14/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO LIMIT THIRD PARTY DEFENSE | |||
3/7/2022 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/14/2022 | |
NOTE: CERTOFOCATE TP SECIRE ATTEMDAMCE PF PIT PF STATE WOTMESS | |||
3/7/2022 | EMF - Email Filed - Party (001) | 3/14/2022 | |
3/7/2022 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 3/10/2022 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 | |||
3/7/2022 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 3/10/2022 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO STATE’S REQUEST TO USE RULE 609 EVIDENCE | |||
3/7/2022 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 3/10/2022 | |
NOTE: SEPARATE STATEMENT FOR RULE 15.7 SANCTION MOTION | |||
3/7/2022 | PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001) | 3/11/2022 | |
3/7/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 3/7/2022 | |
3/7/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 3/7/2022 | |
3/7/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 3/7/2022 | |
3/7/2022 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/7/2022 | |
3/7/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 3/7/2022 | |
3/4/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 3/9/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR SANCTION FOR DISCLOSURE VIOLATION | |||
3/4/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
NOTE: #1 | |||
3/4/2022 | EMF - Email Filed - Party (001) | 4/21/2022 | |
3/3/2022 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 3/10/2022 | |
NOTE: RE THE STATES 404(b) NOTICE AND SUPPLEMENT DEFENDANTS RESPONSE AND EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY PRESENTED | |||
3/3/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 3/3/2022 | |
3/3/2022 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 3/8/2022 | |
NOTE: Response to States Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Testimony, Inferences or Arguments that Directly Contradict the Defendants Previously Sworn Testimony | |||
3/2/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 3/2/2022 | |
3/1/2022 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 3/2/2022 | |
NOTE: MEMORANDUM OF RELEVANT FACTUAL SUMMARY AND PROCEDURAL HISTORY | |||
3/1/2022 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001) | 3/1/2022 | |
3/1/2022 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 3/3/2022 | |
NOTE: Defense Motion in Limine No. 2 | |||
3/1/2022 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 3/4/2022 | |
NOTE: DEFENSE MOTION IN LIMINE – NO.1 | |||
3/1/2022 | PTT - Petition - Party (001) | 3/8/2022 | |
NOTE: TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS | |||
2/28/2022 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 3/3/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, INFERENCES OR ARGUMENTS THAT DIRECTLY CONTRADICT THE DEFENDANT’S PREVIOUSLY SWORN TESTIMONY | |||
2/28/2022 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 3/3/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE SELF-SERVING HEARSAY | |||
2/28/2022 | ORD - Order - Party (002) | 3/4/2022 | |
NOTE: TO TEMPORARILY UNSEAL PLEA AGREEMENT | |||
2/28/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 3/4/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO TEMPORARILY UNSEAL DEFENDANTS PLEA AGREEMENT | |||
2/28/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 3/2/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR MEMORANDUM OF RELEVANT FACTUAL SUMMARY AND PROCEDURAL HISTORY | |||
2/18/2022 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 2/18/2022 | |
2/18/2022 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001) | 2/23/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO WITHDRAW EXHIBIT 207 FROM 404(B) HEARING | |||
2/18/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/23/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR FORMAL ADMISSION OF EXHIBITS 202 AND 203 FROM 404(B) HEARING | |||
2/17/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 2/18/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO TEMPORARILY UNSEAL DEFENDANT’S PLEA AGREEMENT | |||
2/15/2022 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/23/2022 | |
NOTE: SERVED 02/2022 | |||
2/15/2022 | SUB - Subpoena - Party (001) | 2/25/2022 | |
2/15/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/25/2022 | |
NOTE: SERVED 02/10/2022 | |||
2/15/2022 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 2/15/2022 | |
2/15/2022 | WSH - Worksheet - Party (001) | 3/1/2022 | |
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING | |||
2/14/2022 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 2/14/2022 | |
2/14/2022 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 2/16/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
2/11/2022 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 2/11/2022 | |
2/11/2022 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 2/11/2022 | |
2/9/2022 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 2/15/2022 | |
NOTE: THAT USAA INSURANCE PROVIDE A CERTIFIED COPY OF ALL RECORDS RELATED TO INSURANCE CLAIMS | |||
2/9/2022 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 2/10/2022 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
2/8/2022 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/16/2022 | |
NOTE: SERVED 01/25/2022 | |||
2/7/2022 | JQU - Jury Question - Party (001) | 2/9/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUESTED JURY QUESTIONNAIRE | |||
2/7/2022 | MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001) | 2/9/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion for Discovery Pursuant to Rule 15.1(g): USAA Claim Records for Melissa Stark | |||
2/7/2022 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 2/9/2022 | |
NOTE: FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
2/4/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/4/2022 | |
2/2/2022 | PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001) | 2/8/2022 | |
2/2/2022 | PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001) | 2/9/2022 | |
2/2/2022 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 2/3/2022 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO ALLOW VIRTUAL LIVE TESTIMONY FROM WITNESS CYNTHIA BUTLER | |||
2/1/2022 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/3/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO ALLOW VIRTUAL LIVE TESTIMONY FROM WITNESS CYNTHIA BUTLER | |||
2/1/2022 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 2/1/2022 | |
2/1/2022 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 2/3/2022 | |
NOTE: SUBPOENA SERVED 02/01/22 | |||
1/24/2022 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 1/24/2022 | |
NOTE: Response to Supplement to States Notice of Intent to Use Defendants Other Crimes, Wrong or Acts Pursuant to Rule 404(b), Arizona Rules of Evidence | |||
1/7/2022 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 1/11/2022 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
1/7/2022 | NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001) | 1/11/2022 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TOUSE DEFENDANT’S OTHER CRIMES,WRONG OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(b), ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE | |||
12/6/2021 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002) | 12/6/2021 | |
11/30/2021 | ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (002) | 11/30/2021 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/30/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002) | 12/1/2021 | |
NOTE: Amended Motion to Continue | |||
11/29/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 12/2/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue | |||
11/22/2021 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 11/24/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Disclosure | |||
11/12/2021 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001) | 11/12/2021 | |
11/9/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 11/9/2021 | |
11/3/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (002) | 11/8/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER TO FILE MOTION UNDER SEAL | |||
11/3/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 11/8/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS | |||
11/3/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 11/8/2021 | |
NOTE: REQUEST TO FILE MOTION AND ORDER TO KEEP MOTION AND ORDER UNDER SEAL | |||
10/25/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 10/25/2021 | |
10/25/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 10/25/2021 | |
10/18/2021 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 10/19/2021 | |
NOTE: SERVED 10/18/2021 | |||
10/18/2021 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 10/19/2021 | |
NOTE: Response to States Motion to Continue Trial | |||
10/18/2021 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 10/19/2021 | |
NOTE: Response: Motion to Limit Third Party Defense | |||
10/15/2021 | MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001) | 10/18/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 | |||
10/15/2021 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 10/18/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.6 | |||
10/15/2021 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 10/18/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
10/15/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 10/19/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO LIMIT DEFENDANT’S THIRD PARTY CULPABILITY DEFENSE | |||
10/13/2021 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 10/14/2021 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO STRIKE STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE DEFENDANT’S OTHER CRIMES, WRONGS OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(b), ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE | |||
10/12/2021 | SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001) | 10/13/2021 | |
NOTE: SERVED 10/12/2021 | |||
10/12/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 10/13/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
10/12/2021 | SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001) | 10/13/2021 | |
NOTE: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED 10/12/21 | |||
10/12/2021 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 10/13/2021 | |
NOTE: SERVED 10/12/2021 | |||
10/7/2021 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 10/8/2021 | |
NOTE: Reply: Motion to Preclude | |||
10/7/2021 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 10/11/2021 | |
NOTE: Supplemental Notice of Defense Pursuant to Rule 15.2 | |||
10/6/2021 | SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum - Party (001) | 10/7/2021 | |
NOTE: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED 10/05/21 | |||
10/6/2021 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 10/7/2021 | |
NOTE: SERVED 10/06/2021 | |||
10/6/2021 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 10/8/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO PRODUCE WITNESSES JOHN ATENCIO AND CHRISTOPHER COOLEY FOR DEFENSE INTERVIEWS | |||
10/6/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 10/8/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Strike States Notice of Intent to Use Defendants Other Crimes, Wrong or Acts Pursuant to Rule 404(b), Arizona Rules of Evidence | |||
10/5/2021 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 10/7/2021 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO STATE’S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO PRODUCE WITNESSES JOHN ATENCIO AND CHRISTOPHER COOLEY FOR DEFENSE INTERVIEWS | |||
10/5/2021 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 10/7/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
10/4/2021 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 10/7/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO PRECLUDE | |||
10/1/2021 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 10/1/2021 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.2 | |||
9/30/2021 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 10/1/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO PRODUCE WITNESSES JOHN ATENCIO AND CHRISTOPHER COOLEY FOR DEFENSE INTERVIEWS | |||
9/29/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 9/30/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Preclude | |||
9/28/2021 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001) | 9/28/2021 | |
9/27/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 9/27/2021 | |
9/21/2021 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 9/21/2021 | |
9/20/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 9/22/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL FOR WITNESS CHRISTOPHER COOLEY | |||
9/15/2021 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 9/17/2021 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE DEFENDANT’S OTHER CRIMES, WRONG OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(b), ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE | |||
9/13/2021 | NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001) | 9/16/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE DEFENDANT’S OTHER CRIMES, WRONG OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(b), ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE | |||
9/10/2021 | CER - Certificate - Party (001) | 9/17/2021 | |
NOTE: TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS | |||
9/7/2021 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 9/7/2021 | |
9/3/2021 | PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001) | 9/8/2021 | |
9/1/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002) | 9/2/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
8/31/2021 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 9/2/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENSE CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT | |||
7/28/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 7/30/2021 | |
NOTE: 022/MINUTE ENTRY | |||
7/27/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (002) | 8/3/2021 | |
NOTE: GRANTING THE MOTION | |||
7/16/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 7/16/2021 | |
7/15/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 7/15/2021 | |
7/12/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002) | 7/13/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |||
7/8/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 7/9/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW STATE’S MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO DISCLOSE SEALED DOCUM | |||
7/8/2021 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 7/9/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
7/8/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 7/12/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW STATE’S MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO DISCLOSE SEALED DOCUMENTS | |||
7/8/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 7/22/2021 | |
NOTE: RE MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO DISCLOSE SEAL DOCUMENTS | |||
7/7/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 7/9/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO DISCLOSE SEALED DOCUMENTS | |||
7/7/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 7/8/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO DISCLOSE SEALED DOCUMENTS | |||
6/17/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 6/17/2021 | |
6/15/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 6/15/2021 | |
6/9/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 6/9/2021 | |
NOTE: PLEA AGREEMENT | |||
6/8/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (002) | 6/8/2021 | |
6/2/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 6/2/2021 | |
6/2/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002) | 6/2/2021 | |
5/25/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002) | 5/25/2021 | |
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
5/19/2021 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 5/21/2021 | |
NOTE: GRANTING ORDER ACCESS TO THE DRIVE OR DEVICES | |||
4/28/2021 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 4/29/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Sever Defendants | |||
4/27/2021 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001) | 4/27/2021 | |
4/27/2021 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001) | 4/27/2021 | |
NOTE: DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION | |||
3/29/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 3/29/2021 | |
3/29/2021 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 4/2/2021 | |
3/2/2021 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 3/2/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 2/24/2021 | |
2/23/2021 | WSH - Worksheet - Party (001) | 3/18/2021 | |
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING | |||
2/23/2021 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001) | 2/23/2021 | |
2/18/2021 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 2/18/2021 | |
2/12/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/12/2021 | |
2/11/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 2/11/2021 | |
2/11/2021 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002) | 2/11/2021 | |
2/5/2021 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001) | 2/8/2021 | |
2/5/2021 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001) | 2/8/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION | |||
2/1/2021 | NOT - Notice - Party (002) | 2/1/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Joining Co-Defendants Motion to Continue | |||
1/28/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 1/28/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Continue Trial | |||
1/12/2021 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001) | 1/12/2021 | |
1/4/2021 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001) | 1/6/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER/ REQUEST FOR FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW | |||
12/18/2020 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 12/18/2020 | |
12/17/2020 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 12/29/2020 | |
11/23/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 11/23/2020 | |
11/19/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 11/19/2020 | |
11/17/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 11/17/2020 | |
11/16/2020 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 11/17/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST TO ESTABLISH BURDEN FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON MOTION TO SUPPRESS | |||
11/16/2020 | STP - Stipulation - Party (001) | 11/17/2020 | |
NOTE: JOINT STIPULATIONS FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SUPPRESS | |||
11/16/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 11/16/2020 | |
11/10/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 11/12/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 11/09/2020 | |||
11/10/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 11/12/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 11/9/2020 | |||
11/10/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 11/12/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 11/9/2020 | |||
11/10/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 11/13/2020 | |
NOTE: STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS | |||
11/9/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 11/10/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF CORRECTION TO MOTION TO COMPEL – REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS | |||
11/5/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 11/6/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO COMPEL – REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS | |||
11/3/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 11/3/2020 | |
NOTE: to Establish Burden for Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Suppress | |||
10/30/2020 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 11/2/2020 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO STATE’S SUPPLEMENT TO ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SUPPRESS | |||
10/28/2020 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001) | 10/28/2020 | |
10/19/2020 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENT TO ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SUPPRESS | |||
10/12/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 10/13/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 10/08/2020 | |||
10/12/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 10/13/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 10/08/2020 | |||
10/12/2020 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 10/13/2020 | |
NOTE: SERVED 10/08/20 | |||
9/30/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 9/30/2020 | |
9/30/2020 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 9/30/2020 | |
8/24/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/24/2020 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO SUPPRESS | |||
8/18/2020 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (002) | 8/19/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING STIPULATION | |||
8/18/2020 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001) | 8/19/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING STIPULATION | |||
8/18/2020 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/20/2020 | |
NOTE: ORDERT TO FILE FINAL ARGUMENT FOR EVEDENTIARY HEARING ON VIOLATION OF RIGHT TO CPUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS UNDER SEAL | |||
8/14/2020 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001) | 8/14/2020 | |
8/11/2020 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/14/2020 | |
NOTE: TO FILE FINAL ARGUMENT FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON VIOLATION OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS UNDER SEAL | |||
8/10/2020 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/11/2020 | |
NOTE: ORDER RE: COUNTY ATTORNEY'S AND MCAO'S MOTION TO SEAL AND FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW RE: UNREDACTED EXHIBIT A AND UNREDACTED EXHIBIT B TO THEIR POST-HEARING BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS' "MOTION TO DISMISS - RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS VIOLATS | |||
8/10/2020 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 8/11/2020 | |
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEY'S AND MCAO'S POST-HEARING BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS' "MOTION TO DISMISS - RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS VIOLATION | |||
8/7/2020 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 8/7/2020 | |
8/7/2020 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002) | 8/7/2020 | |
8/6/2020 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 8/7/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR STAY | |||
8/5/2020 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 8/6/2020 | |
NOTE: Joint Case Management Report | |||
8/3/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 8/3/2020 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR STAY | |||
7/30/2020 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 7/30/2020 | |
7/24/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/28/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL – FINAL ARGUMENT FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON VIOLATION OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS | |||
7/21/2020 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 7/22/2020 | |
NOTE: County Attorney/MCAOs Post-Hearing Brief In Opposition To Defendant Clements Motion To Dismiss Right To Counsel And Due Process Violation | |||
7/21/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 7/22/2020 | |
NOTE: County Attorney/MCAOs Notice of Submittal Under Seal to Court and Defense Counsel Only re: Unredacted Exhibit A and Unredacted Exhibit B to their Post-Heraing Brief in Opposition to Defendant Clements "Motion to Dismiss-Right to Counsel and Due Process Violation:" and county Attorney/MCAOs Motion to Seal and In Camera Review re: Same | |||
7/6/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 7/6/2020 | |
7/1/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 7/6/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Errata and Amended Notice of Change of Address of Counsel and Firm | |||
6/30/2020 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 7/1/2020 | |
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEYS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE POST-HEARING BRIEFS | |||
6/29/2020 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 6/29/2020 | |
6/29/2020 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002) | 6/29/2020 | |
6/24/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 6/24/2020 | |
6/24/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 6/24/2020 | |
6/24/2020 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001) | 6/24/2020 | |
6/24/2020 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002) | 6/24/2020 | |
6/24/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 6/25/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Change of Address of Counsel and Firm | |||
6/19/2020 | REP - Report - Party (002) | 6/22/2020 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT CHRISTOPHER CLEMENTS, MELISSA STARK, Defendants. REQUEST FOR | |||
6/19/2020 | REP - Report - Party (002) | 6/22/2020 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT | |||
6/19/2020 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 6/22/2020 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT | |||
6/18/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 6/18/2020 | |
6/10/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 6/10/2020 | |
6/9/2020 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 6/10/2020 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR NEGATIVE INFERENCE FOR INCOMPLETE INTERNAL INVESTIGATION FOR TWO MCSO EMPLOYEES | |||
6/8/2020 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 6/8/2020 | |
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEY’S AND MCAO’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S “REQUEST FOR COURT TO FIND NEGATIVE INFERENCE FOR INCOMPLETE INTERNAL INVESTIGATION FOR TWO MCSO EMPLOYEES” | |||
6/8/2020 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 6/8/2020 | |
NOTE: County Attorneys and MCAOS Notice of Submittal Under Seal and Request for the Courts In Camera Review Re: Exhibit A to their Response in Opposition to Defendants "Request for Court to find Negative Inference for Incomplete Internal Investigation for Two MCSO Employees" | |||
5/28/2020 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 5/29/2020 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR COURT TO FIND NEGATIVE INFERENCE FOR INCOMPLETE INTERNAL INVESTIGATION FOR TWO MCSO EMPLOYEES | |||
5/26/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 5/26/2020 | |
5/26/2020 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 5/26/2020 | |
5/22/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/26/2020 | |
NOTE: County Attorneys and MCAOS Motion to Assign Court Reporter for Evidentiary Hearings Scheduled for June 16-19, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. - 4:30 p.m. | |||
5/21/2020 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 5/26/2020 | |
NOTE: GRANTING THE MOTION TO CORRECT ERRORS IN HEARING TRANSCRIPTS | |||
5/20/2020 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/20/2020 | |
NOTE: County Attorneys and MCAOS Motion to Correct Errors in Hearing Transcripts for Evidentiary Hearing Dates 11/01/2019; 11/08/2019 P.M.; 01/10/2020; and 01/24/2020 A.M. | |||
4/27/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 4/27/2020 | |
4/27/2020 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002) | 4/27/2020 | |
4/17/2020 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001) | 4/17/2020 | |
4/13/2020 | STP - Stipulation - Party (001) | 4/14/2020 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION | |||
4/13/2020 | STP - Stipulation - Party (002) | 4/14/2020 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION | |||
3/11/2020 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001) | 3/11/2020 | |
1/28/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 1/28/2020 | |
1/28/2020 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002) | 1/28/2020 | |
1/14/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 1/14/2020 | |
11/15/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 11/15/2019 | |
11/15/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002) | 11/15/2019 | |
11/8/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 11/8/2019 | |
11/7/2019 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001) | 11/7/2019 | |
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEY ADEL’S AND MCAO’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO ALLOW DEFENSE TO ASK HOSTILE AND ADVERSE WITNESSES LEADING QUESTIONS | |||
11/1/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 11/4/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO ALLOW DEFENSE COUNSEL TO ASK HOSTILE AND ADVERSE WITNESSES LEADING QUESTIONS | |||
10/23/2019 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 10/24/2019 | |
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEYS ADELS AND MCAOS NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE | |||
9/9/2019 | RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001) | 9/9/2019 | |
NOTE: | |||
9/6/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 9/6/2019 | |
9/5/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 9/5/2019 | |
9/3/2019 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 9/3/2019 | |
8/21/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 8/21/2019 | |
8/20/2019 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 8/20/2019 | |
8/19/2019 | RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001) | 8/19/2019 | |
NOTE: | |||
8/14/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/16/2019 | |
NOTE: RE MOTION FOR ORDER UNSEALING RECORDS | |||
8/14/2019 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001) | 8/16/2019 | |
8/14/2019 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001) | 8/16/2019 | |
8/14/2019 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001) | 8/16/2019 | |
8/13/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 8/13/2019 | |
8/13/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 8/15/2019 | |
NOTE: NOTICE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION – PHYSICAL DESCRIPTION OF HANDWRITTEN NOTES | |||
8/9/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/12/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR ORDER UNSEALING RECORDS | |||
8/8/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/12/2019 | |
NOTE: NOTICE, STIPULATIONS AND JOINT MOTION | |||
8/7/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 8/8/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice, Stipulations and Joint Motion Re: Courts Disclosure Order dated June 14, 2019 | |||
8/6/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 8/6/2019 | |
8/5/2019 | OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001) | 8/6/2019 | |
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEY MONTGOMERY’S AND MCAO’S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE | |||
8/5/2019 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 8/5/2019 | |
8/5/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 8/5/2019 | |
8/2/2019 | RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001) | 8/2/2019 | |
NOTE: | |||
8/1/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/6/2019 | |
NOTE: GRANTING CORRECTED STIPULATED MOTION FOR ORDER UNSEALING RECORDS | |||
7/31/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 8/1/2019 | |
NOTE: Corrected Stipulated Motion for Order Unsealing Records for use at Evidentiary Hearings scheduled for August 16, 2019 and August 23, 2019 | |||
7/30/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 7/31/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE TRAVEL | |||
7/29/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 8/1/2019 | |
NOTE: 07/25/19 | |||
7/25/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 7/26/2019 | |
NOTE: County Attorney Montgomerys and MCAOS Notice of Production of Unredacted Records | |||
7/23/2019 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEY MONTGOMERY’S AND MCAO’S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE | |||
7/22/2019 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002) | 7/22/2019 | |
7/22/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 7/25/2019 | |
NOTE: RE COUNTY ATTORNEYS AND MCAOS MOTION TO LIMIT SCOPE OF DEFENSE EXAMINATION OF MCAO PROSECUTORS AND MCAO DETECTIVES | |||
7/22/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
NOTE: Stipulated Motion for Order unsealing records for use at Evidentiary hearings scheduled for August 16, 2019 and August 23, 2019 | |||
7/22/2019 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 7/22/2019 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS – RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS | |||
7/19/2019 | AFF - Affidavit - Party (001) | 8/1/2019 | |
NOTE: AND RETURN | |||
7/19/2019 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/22/2019 | |
NOTE: Clements SERVED 07/18/2019 | |||
7/18/2019 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 7/18/2019 | |
7/18/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/18/2019 | |
NOTE: County Attorneys and MCSOS Motion to Limit Scope of Defense Examination of MCAO Prosecutors, MCAO Detectives and Tucson PD Detectives | |||
7/17/2019 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001) | 7/17/2019 | |
7/17/2019 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002) | 7/17/2019 | |
7/16/2019 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 7/16/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Limited Appearance | |||
7/16/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 7/17/2019 | |
NOTE: RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION RE RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS RE CELL SEARCHES WITH RESERVATION OF RIGHTS TO SUPPLEMENT | |||
7/16/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
7/16/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
7/16/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
NOTE: SERVED 07/15/19 | |||
7/16/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
7/16/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
NOTE: SERVED 07/15/19 | |||
7/16/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
NOTE: SERVED 07/15/19 | |||
7/16/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/23/2019 | |
NOTE: SERVED 07/15/19 | |||
7/16/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/24/2019 | |
NOTE: SERVED 7-15-19 | |||
7/16/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/22/2019 | |
NOTE: 7-15-19 | |||
7/16/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/22/2019 | |
NOTE: 7-15-19 | |||
7/16/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/22/2019 | |
NOTE: 7-15-19 | |||
7/16/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/22/2019 | |
NOTE: 7-15-19 | |||
7/16/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/22/2019 | |
NOTE: 7-15-19 | |||
7/16/2019 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/22/2019 | |
NOTE: 7-15-19 | |||
7/12/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 7/15/2019 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS™ SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS â€" RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS RE: CELL SEARCHES WITH RESERVATION OF RIGHTS TO SUPPLEMENT | |||
7/12/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/15/2019 | |
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEY MONTGOMERY’S AND MCAO’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION RE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ “SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS â€" RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS†RE: CELL SEARCHES WITH RESERVATION OF RIGHTS TO SUPPLEMENT | |||
7/12/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 7/15/2019 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ “KAUFMANN HOME NUMBER JAIL CALLS CLAIM†ASSERTED IN HIS “SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS†AND “SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS â€" RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS â€" RECORDED JAIL CALLS†and MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY, OTHER EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING “KAUFMANN HOME NUMBER JAIL CALLS CLAIM†AT THE EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 16, 2019 AND AUGUST 23, 2019 | |||
7/12/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 7/15/2019 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF SUBMITTAL OF EXHIBIT 3, ELECTRONIC RECORD, RE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ “KAUFMANN HOME NUMBER JAIL CALLS CLAIM†ASSERTED IN HIS “SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS†AND “SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISSâ€" RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS â€" RECORDED JAIL CALLS†and MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY, OTHER EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING “KAUFMANN HOME NUMBER JAIL CALLS CLAIM†AT THE EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 16, 2019 AND AUGUST 23, 2019 | |||
7/11/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 7/11/2019 | |
7/9/2019 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 7/10/2019 | |
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEY MONTGOMERY’S AND MCAO’S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE | |||
7/8/2019 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/9/2019 | |
NOTE: Clements 07/08/2019 | |||
7/8/2019 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/9/2019 | |
NOTE: Clements | |||
7/8/2019 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 7/9/2019 | |
NOTE: County Attormeys and MCAOs Joint Motion for open extension of time and open continuance od Evidentiary Hearing (s) Re: Allegations/Claims Re: Non-Disclosed "Handwritten Notes:/Contents of " Legal Box" Expedited Consideration Requested | |||
7/5/2019 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/8/2019 | |
NOTE: SERVED 6-28-19 | |||
7/5/2019 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/8/2019 | |
NOTE: Clements | |||
7/5/2019 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001) | 7/8/2019 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS – RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS – RECORDED JAIL CALLS | |||
7/2/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 7/2/2019 | |
7/2/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/3/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXPEDITED RULING – REQUEST FOR STAY | |||
6/25/2019 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001) | 6/26/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER COURT ORDER FROM 6/14/19 STATUS CONFERENCE | |||
6/20/2019 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 6/20/2019 | |
6/20/2019 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002) | 6/20/2019 | |
6/19/2019 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001) | 6/19/2019 | |
6/14/2019 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 6/17/2019 | |
NOTE: County Attorney Montgomerys and MCAOs Notice of Supplemental Disclosure | |||
6/13/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 6/13/2019 | |
NOTE: of Disclosure Pursuant to Criminal Rule 15.2 | |||
6/4/2019 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 6/5/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion for Extension of time Re: Response to Defendant Clements Supplement to Motion to Dismiss- Right to Counsel and Due Process | |||
4/24/2019 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002) | 4/24/2019 | |
4/24/2019 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001) | 4/24/2019 | |
4/24/2019 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 4/25/2019 | |
NOTE: COUNTY ATTORNEY / MCAOS REQUEST FOR DEFENSE DISCLOSURE PER RULE 15.2, ARIZ. R. CRIM. P. | |||
4/11/2019 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 4/12/2019 | |
NOTE: of Defense Case Management Plan | |||
4/2/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 4/3/2019 | |
NOTE: RE:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS | |||
4/1/2019 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 4/1/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion for Extension of time Re: Response to Defendant Clements Supplement to Motion to Dismiss-Right to Counsel and Due Process Expedited Consideration Requested | |||
3/29/2019 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 4/1/2019 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES | |||
3/29/2019 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001) | 4/1/2019 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS – RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS | |||
3/27/2019 | RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001) | 3/27/2019 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
3/21/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 3/21/2019 | |
3/14/2019 | SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001) | 3/14/2019 | |
NOTE: Supplemental Notice of Disclosure Re: Witness Information | |||
3/12/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/13/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Disclosure Re: Witness Information | |||
3/12/2019 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 3/13/2019 | |
NOTE: to States Response to Motion to Strike States Filings (Docket Entries 185, 187, 188, 189, 190, 192, 193, and 219) | |||
3/11/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 3/12/2019 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ SECOND MOTION TO STRIKE | |||
3/4/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/5/2019 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE RE: DEFENSE EMAIL REQUEST DATED MARCH 1, 2019 | |||
3/4/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 3/4/2019 | |
3/1/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 3/4/2019 | |
NOTE: to Strike States Filings (Docket Entries 185, 187, 188, 189, 190, 192, 193, and 219) | |||
2/27/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 2/28/2019 | |
NOTE: NOTICE TO CORRECT MINUTE ENTRY DATED 02/20/2019 | |||
2/27/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 2/28/2019 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT RE: VIDEO AND AUDIO RECORDINGS RE: 06/28/18 CLEMENTS CELL SEARCH AND AUDIO RECORDING RE: 07/04/18 RETURN/DELIVERY OF SEIZED BOX TO CLEMENTS | |||
2/27/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 2/28/2019 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
2/25/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/25/2019 | |
2/21/2019 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001) | 2/25/2019 | |
2/19/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 2/20/2019 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS, RESPONSES AND DISCLOSURES | |||
2/14/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/14/2019 | |
2/14/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/14/2019 | |
2/13/2019 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 2/13/2019 | |
2/13/2019 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002) | 2/13/2019 | |
2/12/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 2/15/2019 | |
NOTE: EX PARTE/OF SUBITTAL OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL/RE REQUEST FOR EN CAMERA REVIEW OF PRIVILEGED INFORMATION | |||
2/11/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 2/14/2019 | |
NOTE: ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR EN CAMERA REVIEW OF PRIVILEGED INFORMATION | |||
2/7/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 2/11/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENSE CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT | |||
2/7/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/7/2019 | |
2/7/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 2/7/2019 | |
2/7/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 2/7/2019 | |
2/6/2019 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 2/7/2019 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR EN CAMERA REVIEW OF PRIVILEGED INFORMATION | |||
2/6/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 2/6/2019 | |
2/6/2019 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002) | 2/6/2019 | |
2/4/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 2/5/2019 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ MOTION TO FILE UNTIMELY REPLY TO RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP AND EXCEED PAGE LIMIT | |||
2/4/2019 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 2/5/2019 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION RE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE INTENTIONAL INTEFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES | |||
2/1/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/4/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion to File Untimely Reply to States Response to Defendant Clements Claims RE: Intentional Interference with his Confidential Attorney-Client Relationship and Exceed Page Limit | |||
2/1/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 2/4/2019 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION RE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES | |||
2/1/2019 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 2/1/2019 | |
1/31/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/1/2019 | |
NOTE: FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO REMOVE CERTAIN FILINGS FROM DOCKET DUE TO FILING PARTYS INADVERTENT ERROR | |||
1/31/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 1/31/2019 | |
NOTE: Appendix Ex 1 parts 13 thru 16 of 17 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTEFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES | |||
1/31/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 1/31/2019 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTEFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES | |||
1/31/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 2/1/2019 | |
NOTE: RE MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO REMOVE CERTAIN FILINGS FROM DOCKET DUE TO FILING PARTYS INADVERTENT ERROR | |||
1/31/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 1/31/2019 | |
1/31/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 1/31/2019 | |
1/30/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 1/31/2019 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTEFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES | |||
1/30/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 1/31/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO REMOVE CERTAIN FILINGS FROM DOCKET DUE TO FILING PARTYS INADVERTENT ERROR | |||
1/30/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 1/31/2019 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTEFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES | |||
1/30/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 1/31/2019 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTEFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES | |||
1/30/2019 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 1/31/2019 | |
NOTE: STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ PRIVILEGE CLAIMS RE: 06/20/18 CLEMENTS CELL SEARCH AND 06/28/18 CLEMENTS CELL SEARCH | |||
1/30/2019 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 1/31/2019 | |
NOTE: STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ PRIVILEGE CLAIMS RE: 06/20/18 CLEMENTS CELL SEARCH AND 06/28/18 CLEMENTS CELL SEARCH | |||
1/30/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 1/31/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION RE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTEFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES | |||
1/30/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 1/30/2019 | |
1/29/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 1/30/2019 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTEFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES | |||
1/29/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 1/30/2019 | |
NOTE: STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ PRIVILEGE CLAIMS RE: 06/20/18 CLEMENTS CELL SEARCH AND 06/28/18 CLEMENTS CELL SEARCH | |||
1/29/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 1/30/2019 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ CLAIMS RE INTENTIONAL INTEFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES | |||
1/29/2019 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 1/30/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION RE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT Clement CLAIMS RE: INTENTIONAL INTEFERENCE WITH HIS CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP RE: CLEMENTS CELL SEARCHES | |||
1/29/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 1/31/2019 | |
NOTE: RE: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING RESPONSE BRIEF RE DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE CLAIMS FROM JANUARY 28,2019 TO JANUARY 29, 2019 | |||
1/25/2019 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 1/28/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING RESPONSE BRIEF RE Defendants PRIVILEGE CLAIMS FROM JANUARY 28, 2019 TO JANUARY 29, 2019 EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION REQUESTED | |||
1/23/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 1/24/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Disclosure | |||
1/22/2019 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 1/23/2019 | |
NOTE: to States Response in Opposition to Notice of Objection to Maricopa County Attorneys Office Conducting Depositions | |||
1/18/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 1/22/2019 | |
NOTE: RE: STIPULATED MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING DESIGNATED PERSONS TO REVIEW DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PER COURT ORDERS DATED DECEMBER 4,2018 DECEMBR 13,2018 | |||
1/18/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 1/18/2019 | |
1/17/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 1/18/2019 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |||
1/16/2019 | STP - Stipulation - Party (001) | 1/17/2019 | |
NOTE: STIPULATED MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING DESIGNATED PERSONS TO REVIEW DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PER COURT ORDERS DATED DECEMBER 4, 2018 AND DECEMBER 13, 2018 [Expedited Consideration Requested] | |||
1/14/2019 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 1/15/2019 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY’S OFFICE CONDUCTING DEPOSITIONS | |||
1/10/2019 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 1/15/2019 | |
NOTE: GRANTING THE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING RESPONSE BRIEF RE DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE CLAIMS | |||
1/8/2019 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001) | 1/9/2019 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING RESPONSE BRIEF RE DEFENDANT’S PRIVILEGE CLAIMS EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION REQUESTED | |||
1/7/2019 | EMF - Email Filed - Party (001) | 1/15/2019 | |
1/4/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 1/7/2019 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY’S OFFICE CONDUCTING DEPOSITIONS | |||
1/2/2019 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 1/3/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Disclosure | |||
12/17/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 12/17/2018 | |
12/13/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 12/14/2018 | |
NOTE: of Privileged Material | |||
12/13/2018 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 12/14/2018 | |
NOTE: REQUEST TO SEAL PHOTOGRAPHS SUBMITTED TO THE COURT AS EXHIBITS TO NOTICE OF PRIVILEGED MATERIAL | |||
12/6/2018 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001) | 12/6/2018 | |
12/6/2018 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002) | 12/6/2018 | |
12/6/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 12/6/2018 | |
11/27/2018 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 11/28/2018 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
11/27/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 11/28/2018 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT CLEMENTS’ DEFENSE COUNSEL | |||
10/17/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 10/17/2018 | |
10/17/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 10/17/2018 | |
10/10/2018 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 10/10/2018 | |
10/2/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 10/2/2018 | |
10/2/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 10/2/2018 | |
10/2/2018 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 10/3/2018 | |
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY DATED 09/28/2018 | |||
9/28/2018 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 10/3/2018 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO FILE PHOTOGRAPH AND MEMORANDUM UNDER SEAL | |||
9/28/2018 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 10/3/2018 | |
NOTE: ORDER | |||
9/28/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 10/1/2018 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO FILE PHOTOGRAPH AND MEMORANDUM UNDER SEAL | |||
9/28/2018 | MEM - Memorandum - Party (001) | 10/3/2018 | |
NOTE: MEMORANDUM - RELEVANCE OF INFORMATION CONTAINED IN PHOTOGRAPH | |||
9/26/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 9/27/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR DEPOSITIONS OF VICTIMS BETTY SOUERS, JUDSON SOUERS, AND SHIRLEY WESTBROOK | |||
9/26/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 9/27/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR DEPOSITIONS OF VICTIMS BETTY SOUERS, JUDSON SOUERS, AND SHIRLEY WESTBROOK | |||
9/25/2018 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001) | 9/25/2018 | |
9/25/2018 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (002) | 9/25/2018 | |
9/19/2018 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001) | 9/19/2018 | |
9/19/2018 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (002) | 9/19/2018 | |
9/19/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 9/19/2018 | |
9/19/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 9/19/2018 | |
9/12/2018 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 9/13/2018 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |||
9/11/2018 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002) | 9/11/2018 | |
9/11/2018 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 9/11/2018 | |
9/11/2018 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 9/14/2018 | |
NOTE: SERVED 9-7-18 | |||
9/10/2018 | 022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001) | 9/10/2018 | |
9/6/2018 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 9/11/2018 | |
NOTE: THAT DETECTIVE KIM (BADGE #8960) OF THE PHOENIX POLICE EPARTMENT SHALL DELIVER ALL PHOTOGRAPHS TAKEN FROM THE EXECUTION OF PIMA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT SEARCH WARRANT | |||
9/6/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 9/6/2018 | |
9/6/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 9/6/2018 | |
9/4/2018 | STP - Stipulation - Party (002) | 9/4/2018 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINES | |||
9/4/2018 | STP - Stipulation - Party (001) | 9/4/2018 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINES | |||
8/13/2018 | 081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001) | 8/13/2018 | |
8/13/2018 | 081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (002) | 8/13/2018 | |
8/10/2018 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001) | 8/10/2018 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS – RIGHT TO COUNSEL AND DUE PROCESS VIOLATION | |||
8/7/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 8/7/2018 | |
8/1/2018 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 8/2/2018 | |
NOTE: REQUEST TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS SET FOR AUGUST 10, 2018 | |||
7/30/2018 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 7/31/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO QUASH | |||
7/27/2018 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 7/27/2018 | |
7/27/2018 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002) | 7/27/2018 | |
7/25/2018 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 7/26/2018 | |
NOTE: to States Response to Motion to Quash Subpoena | |||
7/20/2018 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 7/23/2018 | |
NOTE: Joann Kennedy | |||
7/20/2018 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001) | 7/20/2018 | |
7/19/2018 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 7/20/2018 | |
NOTE: SECOND AMENDED STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
7/19/2018 | ALG - Allegation - Party (002) | 7/20/2018 | |
NOTE: AMENDED STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
7/18/2018 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 7/19/2018 | |
7/17/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 7/17/2018 | |
7/13/2018 | CER - Certificate - Party (001) | 7/17/2018 | |
NOTE: TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT-OF-STATE WITNESS | |||
7/13/2018 | PTT - Petition - Party (001) | 7/17/2018 | |
NOTE: STATES/TO SECURE ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS | |||
7/12/2018 | MTQ - Motion To Quash - Party (001) | 7/13/2018 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA | |||
7/11/2018 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 7/19/2018 | |
7/11/2018 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 7/19/2018 | |
7/11/2018 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 7/19/2018 | |
7/10/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 7/10/2018 | |
6/29/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 6/29/2018 | |
6/29/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002) | 6/29/2018 | |
6/28/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 6/29/2018 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE-TO TRAVEL OUT OF STATE | |||
6/27/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (002) | 6/28/2018 | |
NOTE: NOTICE JOINING CO-DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SUPPRESS, MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT AND REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SUPPRESS | |||
6/25/2018 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 6/26/2018 | |
NOTE: STATES REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO CONTINUE THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING SET FOR 6-29-18 | |||
6/22/2018 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 6/25/2018 | |
NOTE: to States Motion to Continue the Evidentiary Hearing set for June 29 2018 | |||
6/22/2018 | SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 6/25/2018 | |
NOTE: SERVED 06/22/2018 | |||
6/20/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 6/20/2018 | |
6/20/2018 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001) | 6/21/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO CONTINUE THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING SET FOR JUNE 29, 2018 | |||
6/8/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 6/9/2018 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT | |||
6/8/2018 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 6/9/2018 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SUPPRESS | |||
6/1/2018 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001) | 6/4/2018 | |
NOTE: 06/01/2018 | |||
6/1/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 6/4/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT IN STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SUPPRESS | |||
6/1/2018 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 6/4/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO SUPPRESS | |||
5/22/2018 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 5/22/2018 | |
NOTE: to States Notice of Intent to Use Defendants Other Crimes, Wrongs or Acts Pursuant to Rule 404(b), Arizona Rules of Evidence (RE: Testimony of Sian Watt-Hayes) | |||
5/17/2018 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001) | 5/17/2018 | |
5/17/2018 | 598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002) | 5/17/2018 | |
5/15/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 5/16/2018 | |
NOTE: NOTICE JOINING CODEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEVER | |||
5/11/2018 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 5/11/2018 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS – DUE PROCESS VIOLATION | |||
5/10/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 5/11/2018 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO SUPPRESS | |||
5/9/2018 | NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001) | 5/9/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE DEFENDANT’S OTHER CRIMES, WRONG OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(b), ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE (RE: TESTIMONY OF SIAN WATT-HAYES) | |||
5/9/2018 | NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002) | 5/9/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE DEFENDANT’S OTHER CRIMES, WRONG OR ACTS PURSUANT TO RULE 404(b), ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE (RE: TESTIMONY OF SIAN WATT-HAYES) | |||
5/9/2018 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 5/9/2018 | |
NOTE: Defendant Melissa Starks Motion to Sever | |||
5/8/2018 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 5/9/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS – DUE PROCESS VIOLATION | |||
5/8/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 5/9/2018 | |
NOTE: JOINT COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |||
5/2/2018 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002) | 5/2/2018 | |
5/2/2018 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 5/2/2018 | |
5/2/2018 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 5/2/2018 | |
NOTE: AMENDED STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
4/30/2018 | REL - Reply - Party (001) | 5/1/2018 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO STATE’S MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS | |||
4/27/2018 | MEM - Memorandum - Party (001) | 4/27/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS | |||
4/23/2018 | REP - Report - Party (001) | 4/24/2018 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |||
4/23/2018 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001) | 4/24/2018 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS – DUE PROCESS VIOLATION | |||
4/13/2018 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002) | 4/13/2018 | |
4/13/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 4/13/2018 | |
4/12/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 4/13/2018 | |
NOTE: Invoking Fifth and Sixth Amendment | |||
4/9/2018 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002) | 4/9/2018 | |
4/9/2018 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 4/9/2018 | |
4/9/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 4/9/2018 | |
4/3/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 4/4/2018 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |||
4/2/2018 | ALP - State's Allegation Pursuant to ARS 13-702.02 - Party (002) | 4/3/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S APPLICATION FOR ORDER UNSEALING SEARCH WARRANT | |||
4/2/2018 | APL - Application - Party (001) | 4/3/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S APPLICATION FOR ORDER UNSEALING SEARCH WARRANT | |||
3/19/2018 | 029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001) | 3/19/2018 | |
3/2/2018 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 3/2/2018 | |
3/2/2018 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002) | 3/2/2018 | |
1/29/2018 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002) | 1/29/2018 | |
1/29/2018 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001) | 1/29/2018 | |
1/22/2018 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 1/23/2018 | |
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |||
1/10/2018 | 590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (002) | 1/10/2018 | |
1/10/2018 | 591 - ME: Complex Case/Trial Setting - Party (001) | 1/10/2018 | |
1/5/2018 | ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001) | 1/5/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS | |||
1/5/2018 | AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001) | 1/5/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13- 704 | |||
1/5/2018 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 1/5/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
1/5/2018 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 1/5/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 or A.R.S. § 13-704 | |||
1/5/2018 | AFL - Allegation of Felony Committed While on Release/ Enhanced Sentencing - Party (001) | 1/5/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF FELONY COMMITTED WHILE ON RELEASE/ENHANCED SENTENCING PURSUANT TO A.R.S § 13-708(D) | |||
1/5/2018 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 1/5/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
1/5/2018 | RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001) | 1/5/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING | |||
1/5/2018 | ALG - Allegation - Party (002) | 1/5/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
1/5/2018 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002) | 1/8/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
1/5/2018 | AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (002) | 1/8/2018 | |
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13- 704 | |||
12/27/2017 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 12/27/2017 | |
12/19/2017 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002) | 12/19/2017 | |
12/19/2017 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 12/19/2017 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION | |||
12/19/2017 | MOT - Motion - Party (002) | 12/19/2017 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION | |||
12/19/2017 | RES - Response - Party (001) | 12/20/2017 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION | |||
12/13/2017 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 12/14/2017 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO ALIGN LAST DAY WITH CO-DEFENDANT MELISSA STARK | |||
12/7/2017 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 12/7/2017 | |
12/7/2017 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 12/7/2017 | |
12/4/2017 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002) | 12/4/2017 | |
11/28/2017 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 11/28/2017 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS RULE 15.1 REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
11/28/2017 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 11/28/2017 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE | |||
11/28/2017 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 11/28/2017 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO PRESERVE AND PRODUCE | |||
11/27/2017 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002) | 11/29/2017 | |
11/27/2017 | RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001) | 11/28/2017 | |
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR REMAND FOR A NEW PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION | |||
11/21/2017 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 11/21/2017 | |
11/21/2017 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002) | 11/27/2017 | |
11/21/2017 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002) | 11/27/2017 | |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
11/21/2017 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002) | 11/27/2017 | |
11/17/2017 | REQ - Request - Party (002) | 11/17/2017 | |
NOTE: Request for Discovery | |||
11/17/2017 | NOT - Notice - Party (002) | 11/17/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Defenses | |||
11/17/2017 | MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002) | 11/17/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion to Extend Rule 12.9 Deadline | |||
11/13/2017 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002) | 11/13/2017 | |
11/9/2017 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 11/13/2017 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO REMAND FOR A NEW PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION | |||
11/2/2017 | FIN - Financial Information - Party (002) | 11/2/2017 | |
NOTE: IA SUMMONS FINANCIAL INFORMATION | |||
11/2/2017 | ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (002) | 11/2/2017 | |
NOTE: Release Order | |||
11/1/2017 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 11/3/2017 | |
10/31/2017 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 11/2/2017 | |
10/31/2017 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 11/2/2017 | |
NOTE: PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E) | |||
10/31/2017 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 11/2/2017 | |
10/27/2017 | SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (002) | 10/27/2017 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/20/2017 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002) | 10/25/2017 | |
10/20/2017 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 10/25/2017 | |
10/18/2017 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 10/18/2017 | |
10/9/2017 | WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001) | 10/9/2017 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: 10/05/17 | |||
10/6/2017 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 10/10/2017 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
10/6/2017 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 10/9/2017 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
10/4/2017 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 10/11/2017 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/4/2017 | 604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001) | 10/11/2017 | |
10/4/2017 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 10/9/2017 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/4/2017 | IND - Indictment - Party (002) | 10/27/2017 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/4/2017 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002) | 10/27/2017 | Plaintiff (1) |
10/4/2017 | 600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (002) | 10/27/2017 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
10/6/2017 | 11:00 | Initial Appearance |
10/13/2017 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
10/16/2017 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
11/2/2017 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/28/2017 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/14/2017 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
12/21/2017 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/16/2018 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
1/23/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
1/23/2018 | 8:30 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
2/6/2018 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/13/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
2/22/2018 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
2/22/2018 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
3/1/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
3/1/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
3/6/2018 | 8:15 | Status Conference |
4/4/2018 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
4/4/2018 | 8:30 | Complex / Capital Case |
4/6/2018 | 8:15 | Status Conference |
4/24/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
4/24/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
5/7/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
5/9/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
5/9/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
5/23/2018 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/23/2018 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/6/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
6/6/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
6/6/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
6/6/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
6/29/2018 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/29/2018 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
7/16/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
7/26/2018 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
7/26/2018 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/1/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
8/1/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
8/10/2018 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
8/10/2018 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
8/10/2018 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
8/10/2018 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/10/2018 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/16/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
8/16/2018 | 8:00 | Trial |
9/6/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
9/6/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
10/5/2018 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
10/17/2018 | 14:30 | Informal Conference |
10/18/2018 | 13:30 | Informal Conference |
10/19/2018 | 8:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
10/19/2018 | 8:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/30/2018 | 8:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/30/2018 | 8:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/30/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
11/30/2018 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
2/4/2019 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
2/8/2019 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
2/8/2019 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
4/12/2019 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
4/12/2019 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
5/7/2019 | 14:00 | Status Conference |
5/23/2019 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
6/14/2019 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
6/14/2019 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
7/17/2019 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
8/15/2019 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
8/16/2019 | 8:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
8/16/2019 | 8:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
8/23/2019 | 8:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
8/23/2019 | 8:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/1/2019 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/1/2019 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/8/2019 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
11/8/2019 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/8/2019 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
11/8/2019 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/17/2019 | 8:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
1/10/2020 | 10:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
1/10/2020 | 10:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
1/24/2020 | 8:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
1/24/2020 | 8:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
4/10/2020 | 10:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
4/23/2020 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
4/24/2020 | 8:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
4/27/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
4/28/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
5/21/2020 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
5/21/2020 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
6/9/2020 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
6/9/2020 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
6/15/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/15/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/16/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/16/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/17/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/17/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/18/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/18/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/18/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/19/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/19/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
6/23/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
6/23/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
7/27/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
7/27/2020 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/3/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
8/3/2020 | 8:00 | Trial |
8/7/2020 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
8/7/2020 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
8/11/2020 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
9/29/2020 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
10/26/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
10/26/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
10/27/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
10/27/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
10/28/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
10/28/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
10/29/2020 | 8:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
10/29/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
10/30/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
10/30/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/2/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/3/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/17/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/18/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/19/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/23/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/24/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
11/30/2020 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
1/11/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/16/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/16/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/16/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/17/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/18/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/22/2021 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/23/2021 | 8:00 | Trial |
2/23/2021 | 8:00 | Trial |
2/23/2021 | 15:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/23/2021 | 15:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
5/25/2021 | 11:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/25/2021 | 11:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/4/2021 | 15:30 | Change Of Plea |
6/8/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
6/8/2021 | 11:00 | Trial |
7/13/2021 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
7/13/2021 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
8/12/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/12/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/26/2021 | 9:00 | Trial |
8/26/2021 | 9:00 | Trial |
9/2/2021 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
9/2/2021 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
10/12/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/19/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/22/2021 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
10/26/2021 | 9:00 | Trial |
11/30/2021 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
1/28/2022 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/4/2022 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/8/2022 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/9/2022 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/9/2022 | 13:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/10/2022 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/15/2022 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/15/2022 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/15/2022 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/24/2022 | 9:00 | Trial |
3/4/2022 | 13:30 | Trial |
3/10/2022 | 11:00 | Oral Argument |
3/14/2022 | 10:00 | Trial |
3/15/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
3/16/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
3/17/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
3/17/2022 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
3/21/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
3/22/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
3/22/2022 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
3/23/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
3/24/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
3/28/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
3/29/2022 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
3/29/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
3/30/2022 | 13:30 | Trial |
3/31/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/4/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/5/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/6/2022 | 13:30 | Trial |
4/7/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/11/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/12/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/13/2022 | 13:30 | Trial |
4/14/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/18/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/19/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
4/20/2022 | 13:30 | Trial |
4/21/2022 | 10:30 | Trial |
5/12/2022 | 9:00 | Sentencing |
6/7/2022 | 9:00 | Sentencing |
8/10/2022 | 9:00 | Sentencing |
11/8/2022 | 9:00 | Sentencing |
2/6/2023 | 9:00 | Sentencing |
5/5/2023 | 9:00 | Sentencing |
8/3/2023 | 9:00 | Sentencing |
11/3/2023 | 9:00 | Sentencing |
1/31/2024 | 9:00 | Sentencing |