« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, S P 2 Family Violence East
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Madeline Frieda Jones - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Public Defender-, Ccc
Judge
Kemp
Case #
CR2017-002869-001
Party Name
Cassandra Pearl Yusko Jones - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Acosta, Jesus
Judge
Kemp
Case #
CR2017-002869-002
Party Name
Roland Alexander Jones - (4)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Ferragut, Ulises
Judge
Kemp
Case #
CR2017-002869-003
Party Name
B Victim - (5)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
McVay, J
Judge
Case #
CR2017-002869-003
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (7)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2017-002869-003
Disposition Information
No records found.
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2022
Description
DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/2/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2021
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Satisfaction Of Judgment
Filing Date
12/1/2021
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Satisfaction Of Judgment
Filing Date
7/9/2021
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2021
Description
ODM - Order of Discharge from Probation - Misdemeanor Designation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1 Designated a MISDEMEANOR
Filing Date
7/7/2021
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2
Filing Date
7/6/2021
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
7/6/2021
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
7/6/2021
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2
Filing Date
12/9/2020
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Establish Start Date
Filing Date
12/9/2020
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Establish Start Date
Filing Date
2/3/2020
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
12/20/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTITUTION
Filing Date
12/16/2019
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTITUTION STIPULATION
Filing Date
12/16/2019
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTITUTION STIPULATION
Filing Date
12/16/2019
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTITUTION STIPULATION
Filing Date
11/25/2019
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2019
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2019
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2019
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2019
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM RE REQUEST FOR RESTITUTION AND CONSEQUENTIAL DAMAGES
Filing Date
9/12/2019
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2019
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2019
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING A WITNESS RESTITUTION HEARING SET FOR 11/22/19
Filing Date
9/11/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING WITNESS RESTITUTION HEARING
Filing Date
9/11/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING WITNESS RESTITUTION HEARING
Filing Date
8/20/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES REQUEST TO SET A WITNESS RESTITUTION HEARING
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES REQUEST TO SET A WITNESS RESTITUTION HEARING
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/7/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES REQUEST TO SET A WITNESS RESTITUTION HEARING
Filing Date
2/13/2019
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2
Filing Date
7/20/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2018
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Release of Deposit$5,000.00
Filing Date
7/17/2018
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Release of Deposit$5,000.00
Filing Date
7/17/2018
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Release of Deposit$5,000.00
Filing Date
7/16/2018
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
7/16/2018
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
7/16/2018
Description
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2/ Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1 Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2/ Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRETRIAL/
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement Jail
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
7/13/2018
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
7/12/2018
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sentencing Memorandum
Filing Date
7/12/2018
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sentencing Memorandum
Filing Date
7/9/2018
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRETRIAL/
Filing Date
7/9/2018
Description
REP - Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRETRIAL/
Filing Date
7/5/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to continue sentencing
Filing Date
7/5/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to continue sentencing
Filing Date
6/19/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2018
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
and CASH ONLY $5000
Filing Date
6/11/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
6/8/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/11/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MODIFYING RELEASE CONDITIONS TO ALLOW ROLAND JONES (003) TO HAVE CONTACT WITH HIS MINOR CHILDREN
Filing Date
6/5/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2018
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Modify Release Conditions
Filing Date
5/31/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
5/31/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/1/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
5/31/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MODIFYING RELEASE CONDITIONS TO ALLOW ROLAND JONES (003) AND CASSANDRA JONES (002) TO HAVE CONTACT WITH THEIR DAUGHTER CO DEFENDANT MADELINE FRIEDA JONES (001)
Filing Date
5/31/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MODIFYING RELEASE CONDITIONS TO ALLOW ROLAND JONES (003) AND CASSANDRA JONES (002) TO HAVE CONTACT WITH THEIR DAUGHTER CO DEFENDANT MADELINE FRIEDA JONES (001)
Filing Date
5/30/2018
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/31/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO MODIFY
RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
5/30/2018
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/31/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO MODIFY
RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
5/29/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/25/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/25/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
5/24/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
5/17/2018
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Cash Only Appearance Bond $ 5000
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
5/14/2018
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2018
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2018
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2018
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2018
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF
DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/27/2018
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/1/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2018
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/1/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
4/27/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
4/27/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
4/27/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
4/27/2018
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2018
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2018
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2018
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2018
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2018
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2018
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2018
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2018
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/25/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record for Victim Samuel Gouchenour
Filing Date
4/23/2018
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record for Victim Samuel Gouchenour
Filing Date
4/23/2018
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record for Victim Samuel Gouchenour
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Victims Motion to Continue Oral Argument Scheduled April 13, 2018 at 10:00 a.m.
Filing Date
4/10/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
VICTIM’S MOTION TO CONTINUE ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED
APRIL 13, 2018 AT 10:00 A.M.
EXPEDITED RULING REQUESTED
Filing Date
4/10/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (003)
Docket Date
4/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
VICTIM’S MOTION TO CONTINUE ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED
APRIL 13, 2018 AT 10:00 A.M.
EXPEDITED RULING REQUESTED
Filing Date
4/3/2018
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/3/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
states response to defendants motion to modify conditions of release
Filing Date
3/27/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
3/27/2018
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
3/27/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR CONTACT
Filing Date
3/26/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RESPONSE FOR REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
3/26/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE/ MOTION TO ALLOW FAMILY CONTACT FOR EASTER
Filing Date
3/16/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF BILLIE TARASCIO & CRAIG R RAYMOND TO RESPONSE FOR REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
3/16/2018
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXPEDITED HEARING RE REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE AND DISCOVERY ORDERS
Filing Date
3/12/2018
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO VICTIMS COUNSELS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO REMOVE VICTIMS COUNSEL AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, AND REQUEST FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY VICTIMS COUNSEL SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT, AND OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF APPEARNANCE
Filing Date
3/12/2018
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO VICTIM’S COUNSEL’S
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
3/7/2018
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2018
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REMOVE COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/7/2018
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DISCLOSURE AND DISCOVERY ORDERS
Filing Date
2/23/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2018
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO REMOVE VICTIMS COUNSEL AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, and REQUEST FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY VICTIMS COUNSEL SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT
Filing Date
2/21/2018
Description
REP - Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRETRIAL
Filing Date
1/22/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion To Compel
Filing Date
1/22/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REMOVE VICTIMS COUNSEL AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, and REQUEST FOR ANO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY VICTIMS COUNSEL SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT
Filing Date
1/17/2018
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2018
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2018
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
1/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/26/2017
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
12/22/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2017
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2017
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2017
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
VICTIM’S RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO ALLOW FAMILY CONTACT FOR CHRISTIMAS
Filing Date
12/21/2017
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to Victims Response to Motion to Allow Family Contact
Filing Date
12/20/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Allow Family Contact for Christmas Only
Filing Date
12/19/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2017
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND
REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF
REBUTTALWITNESSES
Filing Date
12/17/2017
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC
DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE
15.1(a) and (b) AND REQUEST FOR
ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE
REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1 (c) and
Filing Date
12/11/2017
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2017
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/6/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2017
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/6/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2017
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
$5000
Filing Date
11/20/2017
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2017
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2017
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFICIAL
Filing Date
11/20/2017
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFICIAL
Filing Date
11/20/2017
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2017
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2017
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
CASH ONLY $5000
Filing Date
11/16/2017
Description
BRR - Bond Review Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2017
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
$5000.00
Filing Date
11/16/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
11/15/2017
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
11/15/2017
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/15/2017
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING
CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
11/15/2017
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/15/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
motion to designate complex case
Filing Date
11/15/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUESTED
15.2 DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/14/2017
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2017
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Cash Only Appearance Bond $ 5000
Filing Date
11/9/2017
Description
BRR - Bond Review Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2017
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
$5000
Filing Date
11/8/2017
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2017
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2017
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2017
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION FOR APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL FOR VICTIM SAMUEL GOUCHENOUR
Filing Date
11/7/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REVIEW/
MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS AND
PRETRIAL SERVICES
Filing Date
11/2/2017
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
BRR - Bond Review Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2017
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E)
Filing Date
10/30/2017
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2017
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2017
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/30/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss Sixth Amendment Violation
Filing Date
10/27/2017
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2017
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2017
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2017
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND
REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF
REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
10/26/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Preserve and Produce
Filing Date
10/26/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND
SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS
Filing Date
10/26/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1(b), (c), & (e) OF THE ARIZONA RULES OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
10/26/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1
(a), (b), (d), (e)
Filing Date
10/24/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Modification of Release Conditions
Filing Date
10/24/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REMOVE RESTRAINTS AND DRESS OUT CLIENT FOR ALL HEARINGS, and REQUEST FOR HEARING TO ADDRESS THE ISSUE
Filing Date
10/24/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO REQUEST MEDICAL
ATTENTION
Filing Date
10/19/2017
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2017
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/17/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel on Behalf of Victim Samuel Gouchenour
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RELEASE OR BOND
REDUCTION
Filing Date
10/16/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Deny Camera Request
Filing Date
10/13/2017
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/13/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
10/13/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
10/10/2017
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2017
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2017
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order Regarding Counsel
Filing Date
10/5/2017
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order Regarding Counsel
Filing Date
10/2/2017
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/2/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF VICTIM
SAMUEL GOUCHENOUR
Filing Date
10/2/2017
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/2/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance of Counsel on Behalf of Victim Samuel Gouchenour
Filing Date
9/28/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
9/28/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
9/28/2017
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
09/27/2017
Filing Date
9/28/2017
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
09/27/2017
Filing Date
9/28/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
9/28/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
9/27/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/28/2017
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
9/28/2017
Time
5:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
10/5/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/5/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/13/2017
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
10/20/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
11/1/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/9/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/16/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
11/16/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/7/2017
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
12/18/2017
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
12/18/2017
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/9/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/9/2018
Time
8:33
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/9/2018
Time
8:33
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/17/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/17/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/17/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/21/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/21/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/21/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/13/2018
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/13/2018
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/13/2018
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/27/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/27/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/27/2018
Time
9:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/27/2018
Time
9:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
5/16/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
5/23/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt
Date
5/23/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt
Date
5/24/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/5/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/5/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/5/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/12/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/12/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/12/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/13/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/13/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/13/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
11/22/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Restitution Hearing
Date
11/22/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Restitution Hearing
Date
11/22/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Restitution Hearing