« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Ogus, Adam
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2017-001332-001
Party Name
Mark Alan MillspaughJr. - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Glover, Todd
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2017-001332-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh Jr. 
Crime Date
5/3/2016
Date
8/8/2017
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh Jr. 
Crime Date
5/3/2016
Date
8/8/2017
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh Jr. 
Crime Date
5/6/2016
Date
8/8/2017
Description
THEFT CREDIT CARD-CONTROL
ARSCode
13-2102A1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh Jr. 
Crime Date
5/6/2016
Date
8/8/2017
Description
TRAFFICK STOLEN PROP 2ND DEG
ARSCode
13-2307A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh Jr. 
Crime Date
7/6/2016
Date
8/8/2017
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh Jr. 
Crime Date
7/6/2016
Date
8/8/2017
Description
THEFT CREDIT CARD-CONTROL
ARSCode
13-2102A1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh Jr. 
Crime Date
6/30/2016
Date
8/8/2017
Description
AGG TAKING ID-GT 3 UNLAW
ARSCode
13-2009A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh Jr. 
Crime Date
7/1/2016
Date
8/8/2017
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh Jr. 
Crime Date
7/1/2016
Date
8/8/2017
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh Jr. 
Crime Date
7/8/2016
Date
8/8/2017
Description
AGG TAKING ID-GT 3 UNLAW
ARSCode
13-2009A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron 
Crime Date
5/3/2016
Date
8/31/2018
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310A (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron 
Crime Date
5/3/2016
Date
8/31/2018
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron 
Crime Date
7/1/2016
Date
8/31/2018
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron 
Crime Date
7/1/2016
Date
8/31/2018
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron 
Crime Date
5/3/2016
Date
8/31/2018
Description
THEFT CREDIT CARD-DEFRAUD
ARSCode
13-2102A3 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron 
Crime Date
5/6/2016
Date
8/31/2018
Description
TRAFFICK STOLEN PROP 2ND DEG
ARSCode
13-2307A (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron 
Crime Date
6/30/2016
Date
8/31/2018
Description
AGG TAKING ID-GT 3 UNLAW
ARSCode
13-2009A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron 
Crime Date
7/8/2016
Date
8/31/2018
Description
AGG TAKING ID-GT 3 UNLAW
ARSCode
13-2009A1 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron 
Crime Date
7/8/2016
Date
8/31/2018
Description
DANGEROUS DRUG-POSS/USE
ARSCode
13-3407A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2022
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2022
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO UNTITLED MOTION FOR CONCURRENT JAIL CREDIT
Filing Date
8/23/2022
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2022
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
4/11/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
3/27/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/27/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2019
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2019
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2019
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
motion to withdraw
Filing Date
1/8/2019
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2019
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHALL PAY RESTITUTION
Filing Date
12/19/2018
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED REQUEST FOR RESTITUTION AND PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
12/10/2018
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2018
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2018
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2018
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2018
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
10/10/2018
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1 Monetary Orders
Filing Date
10/10/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
10/10/2018
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
10/10/2018
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
10/10/2018
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
9/5/2018
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2018
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2018
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2018
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S REQUESTED 15.2 DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/17/2018
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2018
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
05/15/2018
Filing Date
3/30/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2018
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/3/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTITUTION
Filing Date
3/19/2018
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES AS TO RESTITUTION
Filing Date
1/30/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2017
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND RESTITUTION DEADLINE
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2017
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
10/25/2017
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
10/25/2017
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1/Monetary Orders
Filing Date
10/25/2017
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
8/24/2017
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/25/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order Regarding Counsel
Filing Date
8/11/2017
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/11/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2017
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2017
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2017
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2017
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2017
Description
612 - ME: Gj Quash Summons/Issue Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2017
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2017
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 or A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AT THE NEXT COURT SETTING
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
4/26/2017
Description
AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-708(
Filing Date
4/21/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO DESIGNATE AS COMPLEX CASE
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2017
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2017
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2017
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/6/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
03/03/2017
Filing Date
3/4/2017
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
3/4/2017
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/2/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/6/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/2/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/6/2017
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/2/2017
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/6/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2017
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/2/2017
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2017
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2018
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/4/2017
Time
5:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
3/10/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/25/2017
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/30/2017
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
6/1/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/14/2017
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
8/8/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/25/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Acceptance Of Plea/Snt
Date
10/30/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/6/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/15/2018
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/22/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/25/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/6/2018
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/6/2018
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
8/21/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/31/2018
Time
14:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
8/31/2018
Time
15:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
9/4/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/11/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/10/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
12/7/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Restitution Hearing