Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Kvesic, Andrew      
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Public Defender-, Ccc   Master Calendar  CR2016-159092-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose  44-1277 (F5)  UNREG TELEPHONE SOLICITATION  12/5/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  12/29/2016 
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose  44-1277 (F5)  UNREG TELEPHONE SOLICITATION  12/5/2016  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  1/18/2017 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/24/2017  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  3/28/2017   
3/7/2017  193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)  3/7/2017   
2/23/2017  OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)  2/23/2017   
NOTE: Monetary Orders 
2/23/2017  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  2/23/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review 
2/23/2017  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  2/23/2017   
NOTE: Order of Confinement 
2/23/2017  PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)  3/2/2017   
2/7/2017  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  2/7/2017   
1/31/2017  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  1/31/2017   
1/18/2017  OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)  2/9/2017   
1/18/2017  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  1/19/2017   
1/17/2017  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  1/17/2017   
1/11/2017  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  1/11/2017   
1/10/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  1/10/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
12/28/2016  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  12/29/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
12/28/2016  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  12/29/2016   
12/28/2016  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  12/29/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
12/28/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  12/29/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
12/21/2016  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  12/21/2016   
12/21/2016  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  12/21/2016   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
12/21/2016  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  12/21/2016   
NOTE: IA Packet 
12/21/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  12/22/2016   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
12/27/2016  8:30   Status Conference 
12/29/2016  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
1/5/2017  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
1/18/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
2/17/2017  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
2/23/2017  8:30   Sentencing 
3/20/2017  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference