« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, Mjc1 Vehicular Crimes      
Michael David Mullins - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Droban, Kerrie   Master Calendar  CR2016-155164-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Michael David Mullins  28-661B (F2)  FAIL TO STAY/WITH DEATH/INJURY  11/22/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  12/6/2016 
Michael David Mullins  28-661A1 (F2)  LEAVE ACCIDENT W/DEATH/INJURY  11/22/2016  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  2/22/2017 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/28/2017  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  5/2/2017   
4/26/2017  ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)  4/28/2017   
4/24/2017  193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)  4/24/2017   
4/18/2017  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  4/18/2017   
NOTE: Order of Confinement
4/18/2017  OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)  4/18/2017   
NOTE: Monetary Orders
4/18/2017  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (001)  4/18/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review
4/18/2017  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  4/26/2017   
3/29/2017  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  3/29/2017   
2/27/2017  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  2/27/2017   
2/22/2017  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  2/27/2017   
2/22/2017  OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)  2/24/2017   
2/10/2017  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  2/10/2017   
1/19/2017  AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (001)  1/19/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-708(C)
1/17/2017  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  1/17/2017   
1/11/2017  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  1/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
1/10/2017  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)  1/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
1/10/2017  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/11/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AT THE NEXT COURT SETTING
1/10/2017  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  1/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
1/10/2017  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  1/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
1/10/2017  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  1/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTIONS UPON CONVICTION IN A CURRENTLY PENDING CASE
1/10/2017  NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001)  1/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
1/10/2017  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  1/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 or A.R.S. § 13-704
12/21/2016  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  12/21/2016   
12/19/2016  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  12/19/2016   
12/16/2016  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  12/21/2016   
NOTE: FOR CONFLICT
12/16/2016  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)  12/21/2016   
12/7/2016  REQ - Request - Party (001)  12/8/2016   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
12/7/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  12/8/2016   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES, LIST OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS
12/6/2016  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  12/6/2016   
12/5/2016  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  12/6/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
12/5/2016  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  12/6/2016   
12/5/2016  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  12/6/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
12/5/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  12/6/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
12/5/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  12/7/2016   
NOTE: STATE'S/TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING
11/29/2016  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  11/29/2016   
11/29/2016  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  11/30/2016   
NOTE: IA Packet
11/29/2016  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  11/30/2016   
NOTE: IA Release Order
11/29/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  11/30/2016   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
11/25/2016  8:00   Initial Appearance 
12/1/2016  8:30   Status Conference 
12/5/2016  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
12/13/2016  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
1/24/2017  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
2/22/2017  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
3/23/2017  8:30   Sentencing 
4/18/2017  8:30   Sentencing 
4/20/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/27/2017  8:00   Trial 
click here for Law Library Resource Center