« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Southeast  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, Mjc1 Vehicular Crimes      
Michael David Mullins - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Droban, Kerrie   Master Calendar  CR2016-150987-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Michael David Mullins  13-3408 (F4)  NARCOTIC DRUG VIOLATION  11/24/2015  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  2/22/2017 
Michael David Mullins  13-3408 (F4)  NARCOTIC DRUG VIOLATION  11/24/2015  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  2/22/2017 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/28/2017  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  5/3/2017   
4/24/2017  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  4/24/2017   
4/18/2017  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  4/26/2017   
4/18/2017  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  4/18/2017   
NOTE: Presentence Report
4/18/2017  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  4/18/2017   
NOTE: Presentence Report
4/18/2017  OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)  4/18/2017   
NOTE: Order of Release
4/18/2017  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (001)  4/18/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RIGHTS OF REVIEW AFTER CONVICTION AND PROCEDURE RIGHT TO APPEAL
4/18/2017  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  4/18/2017   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
3/29/2017  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  3/29/2017   
2/27/2017  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  2/27/2017   
2/22/2017  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  2/27/2017   
2/10/2017  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  2/10/2017   
2/1/2017  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  2/1/2017   
1/10/2017  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  1/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
1/10/2017  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  1/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 or A.R.S. § 13-704
1/10/2017  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  1/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
1/10/2017  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  1/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
1/10/2017  AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)  1/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
1/10/2017  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  1/11/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIOR CONVICTIONS UPON CONVICTION IN A CURRENTLY PENDING CASE
12/2/2016  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  12/2/2016   
11/30/2016  WPH - Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)  12/1/2016   
11/30/2016  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  11/30/2016   
NOTE: Release Order
11/29/2016  INF - Information - Party (001)  12/1/2016   
11/18/2016  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)  11/18/2016   
11/1/2016  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  11/1/2016   
11/1/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  11/1/2016   
11/1/2016  SUM - Summons - Party (001)  11/2/2016   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
11/30/2016  8:29   Initial Appearance 
11/30/2016  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
11/30/2016  8:31   Original Arraignment Hearing 
1/12/2017  8:15   Status Conference 
1/12/2017  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
1/24/2017  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
2/13/2017  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
2/22/2017  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
3/23/2017  8:30   Sentencing 
4/18/2017  8:30   Sentencing 
4/20/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
4/27/2017  8:00   Trial 
click here for Law Library Resource Center