Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Blackman, Martha      
Ariana Belicia Cabrera - (2)
 
Defendant  F   To Be Determined   Brain  CR2016-145723-002  
Alexandra Danielle Mendez - (3)
 
Defendant  F   Macaulay, John   Phillips  CR2016-145723-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Ariana Belicia Cabrera  13-1802A1 (F3)  THEFT-CONTROL PROPERTY  3/1/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  10/12/2016 
Alexandra Danielle Mendez  13-1802A1 (F3)  THEFT-CONTROL PROPERTY  3/1/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  10/12/2016 
Alexandra Danielle Mendez  13-1802A1 (F6)  THEFT-CONTROL PROPERTY  3/1/2016  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  7/17/2017 
Ariana Belicia Cabrera  13-1802 (F6)  THEFT  3/1/2016  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  11/30/2017 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
6/21/2022  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  6/21/2022   
5/24/2022  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/24/2022   
5/20/2022  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  5/20/2022   
4/22/2022  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  4/22/2022   
3/16/2022  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  3/16/2022   
1/13/2022  112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)  1/13/2022   
1/12/2022  BON - Bond - Party (001)  1/18/2022   
NOTE: SURETY/BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY/$50 
1/6/2022  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  1/6/2022   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
1/6/2022  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)  1/7/2022   
NOTE: PTR COUNT 1 
1/5/2022  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  1/5/2022   
NOTE: IA Packet 
1/5/2022  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  1/5/2022   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
7/16/2021  MER - Memorandum of Restitution Delinquency - Party (002)  7/20/2021   
NOTE: APD Forms COUNT 1 
6/2/2021  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  6/2/2021   
3/3/2021  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  3/3/2021   
2/26/2021  118 - ME: Modifica/Terms Probation - Party (002)  2/26/2021   
2/3/2021  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)  2/3/2021   
2/1/2021  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (002)  2/1/2021   
NOTE: COUNT 1  
1/28/2021  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  1/29/2021   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 
1/27/2021  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  1/27/2021   
1/13/2021  MER - Memorandum of Restitution Delinquency - Party (001)  1/14/2021   
NOTE: APD Forms COUNT 1 
7/6/2020  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)  7/7/2020   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
7/6/2020  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)  7/7/2020   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
6/17/2020  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (002)  6/19/2020   
NOTE: COUNT 1  
3/15/2019  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)  3/19/2019   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
1/22/2019  MER - Memorandum of Restitution Delinquency - Party (002)  1/24/2019   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
8/29/2018  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (002)  9/5/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
5/29/2018  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (002)  6/4/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
5/24/2018  049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (001)  5/24/2018   
5/24/2018  049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (002)  5/24/2018   
4/23/2018  CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (002)  4/26/2018   
4/23/2018  CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)  4/26/2018   
4/11/2018  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  4/11/2018   
4/11/2018  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)  4/11/2018   
4/10/2018  STP - Stipulation - Party (002)  4/11/2018   
NOTE: RESTITUTION STIPULATION 
4/10/2018  STP - Stipulation - Party (001)  4/10/2018   
NOTE: RESTITUTION STIPULATION 
4/4/2018  MFH - Motion For Hearing - Party (002)  4/5/2018   
NOTE: STATE'S / REQUESTING A RESTITUTION 
4/4/2018  MFH - Motion For Hearing - Party (001)  4/5/2018   
NOTE: STATE'S / REQUESTING A RESTITUTION 
3/13/2018  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)  3/15/2018   
3/12/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  3/12/2018   
3/12/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  3/12/2018   
3/5/2018  SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation - Party (002)  3/5/2018   
NOTE: SOP - Sentencing Order - Probation 
3/2/2018  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)  3/2/2018   
3/2/2018  PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (002)  3/2/2018   
NOTE: PSR Supporting Documents 
3/2/2018  OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (002)  3/2/2018   
NOTE: Order of Confinement Jail 
3/2/2018  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)  3/5/2018   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
3/2/2018  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)  3/5/2018   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RIGHTS OF REVIEW AFTER CONVICTION AND PROCEDURE RIGHT TO APPEAL 
3/2/2018  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)  3/5/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 1 Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
2/21/2018  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)  2/21/2018   
1/31/2018  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)  1/31/2018   
12/18/2017  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)  12/18/2017   
11/30/2017  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)  12/1/2017   
11/1/2017  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)  11/1/2017   
8/24/2017  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  8/24/2017   
8/23/2017  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)  8/23/2017   
8/23/2017  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  8/23/2017   
8/17/2017  ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)  8/18/2017   
NOTE: Order Regarding Counsel 
8/16/2017  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  8/16/2017   
NOTE: Presentence Report 
8/16/2017  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  8/16/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review 
8/16/2017  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  8/16/2017   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered 
7/24/2017  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/27/2017   
7/18/2017  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  7/18/2017   
7/17/2017  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  7/18/2017   
7/14/2017  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (002)  7/14/2017   
7/14/2017  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  7/14/2017   
7/11/2017  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/17/2017   
7/11/2017  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/17/2017   
7/11/2017  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  7/17/2017   
NOTE: OR TAPES PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E) 
7/10/2017  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  7/10/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE 
7/10/2017  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/10/2017   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE 
7/3/2017  STA - Statement - Party (001)  7/5/2017   
NOTE: Defendant Alexandra Mendezs 1st Supplemental Disclosure Statement 
7/3/2017  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  7/5/2017   
NOTE: Defendant Alexandra Mendezs Motion In Limine 
5/15/2017  331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (002)  5/15/2017   
3/28/2017  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)  3/28/2017   
3/28/2017  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  3/28/2017   
3/20/2017  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (002)  3/20/2017   
3/6/2017  REQ - Request - Party (001)  3/7/2017   
NOTE: DEFENDANT ALEXANDRA DANIELLE MENDEZ’S REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO TRAVEL 
3/3/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  3/3/2017   
3/2/2017  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  3/2/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Continue 
2/27/2017  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  2/27/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
2/27/2017  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)  2/27/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE 
2/21/2017  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)  2/21/2017   
2/9/2017  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  2/9/2017   
2/9/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  2/9/2017   
2/8/2017  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  2/13/2017   
NOTE: TRIAL 
2/8/2017  STA - Statement - Party (002)  2/14/2017   
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/ 
1/26/2017  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  1/26/2017   
12/29/2016  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)  12/29/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S INITIAL RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL STATE DISCLOSURE 
12/23/2016  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  12/28/2016   
NOTE: TEMPORARY 
12/23/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  12/23/2016   
12/23/2016  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  12/23/2016   
12/22/2016  STA - Statement - Party (001)  12/23/2016   
NOTE: COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 
12/22/2016  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  12/28/2016   
NOTE: TEMPORARY 
12/22/2016  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  12/28/2016   
12/22/2016  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)  12/28/2016   
12/21/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  12/22/2016   
NOTE: Defendant Alexandra Mendezs Motion to Sever Trial as to Co-Defendant Cabrera 
12/8/2016  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  12/8/2016   
12/8/2016  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)  12/8/2016   
12/5/2016  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)  12/5/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY 
12/1/2016  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)  12/2/2016   
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY 
11/21/2016  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  11/21/2016   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
11/21/2016  ALG - Allegation - Party (002)  11/21/2016   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
11/21/2016  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  11/21/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
11/21/2016  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)  11/21/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
11/17/2016  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)  11/18/2016   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 
11/17/2016  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  11/18/2016   
11/17/2016  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)  11/18/2016   
11/16/2016  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  11/16/2016   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY 
11/16/2016  STA - Statement - Party (001)  11/17/2016   
NOTE: Defendant Alexandra Mendezs Rule 15.2 Disclosure Statement 
11/14/2016  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  11/14/2016   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT 
11/2/2016  RNM - Returned Mail - Party (002)  11/2/2016   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
10/26/2016  RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)  10/27/2016   
10/26/2016  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  10/27/2016   
10/26/2016  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  10/27/2016   
NOTE: WITNESSES/EXHIBITS 
10/25/2016  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)  10/25/2016   
10/24/2016  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  10/24/2016   
10/18/2016  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)  10/18/2016   
10/17/2016  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  10/17/2016   
10/11/2016  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  10/12/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
10/11/2016  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  10/12/2016   
10/11/2016  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  10/12/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
10/11/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  10/12/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
10/11/2016  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)  10/12/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
10/11/2016  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)  10/12/2016   
10/11/2016  IND - Indictment - Party (002)  10/12/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
10/11/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)  10/12/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
9/28/2016  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  9/28/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
9/27/2016  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  9/27/2016   
9/27/2016  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)  9/27/2016   
9/27/2016  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  9/28/2016   
NOTE: IA Packet 
9/27/2016  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  9/28/2016   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
9/27/2016  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)  9/28/2016   
NOTE: IA Packet 
9/27/2016  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)  9/28/2016   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
9/27/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)  9/28/2016   
9/27/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  9/28/2016   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/24/2016  2:00   Initial Appearance 
9/26/2016  20:00   Initial Appearance 
10/7/2016  8:30   Status Conference 
10/10/2016  8:30   Status Conference 
10/14/2016  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
10/17/2016  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
10/18/2016  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
10/18/2016  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
11/29/2016  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
11/29/2016  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
11/29/2016  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
12/22/2016  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
12/22/2016  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
1/9/2017  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
2/8/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
2/8/2017  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
2/22/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/1/2017  8:00   Trial 
3/2/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/15/2017  8:00   Trial 
3/27/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
3/27/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
4/20/2017  13:30   Settlement Conference 
5/8/2017  8:30   Settlement Conference 
5/8/2017  11:00   Settlement Conference 
5/8/2017  11:00   Settlement Conference 
5/16/2017  8:45   Change Of Plea 
7/5/2017  9:00   Settlement Conference 
7/11/2017  13:30   Settlement Conference 
7/17/2017  8:31   Original Arraignment Hearing 
7/17/2017  13:30   Settlement Conference 
7/17/2017  13:30   Settlement Conference 
7/17/2017  13:30   Settlement Conference 
7/17/2017  13:30   Settlement Conference 
7/18/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/18/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
7/24/2017  8:00   Trial 
7/24/2017  8:00   Trial 
8/14/2017  8:15   Sentencing 
8/16/2017  8:15   Sentencing 
8/16/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
8/16/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
10/23/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
10/30/2017  8:00   Trial 
11/30/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
12/11/2017  8:00   Trial 
1/26/2018  9:00   Sentencing 
1/30/2018  10:30   Sentencing 
2/26/2018  10:00   Sentencing 
3/2/2018  13:30   Sentencing 
6/8/2018  8:30   Restitution Hearing 
6/8/2018  8:30   Restitution Hearing 
2/18/2021  11:00   Review Hearing 
2/18/2021  11:00   Review Hearing 
2/24/2021  13:30   Restitution Hearing 
5/28/2021  13:30   Review Hearing 
1/5/2022  20:00   Initial Appearance 
1/12/2022  8:30   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
1/12/2022  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
1/12/2022  8:31   Disposition Hearing 
1/13/2022  10:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
3/8/2022  8:15   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
4/21/2022  8:00   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
5/19/2022  8:00   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
6/20/2022  8:00   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
7/25/2022  8:00   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
9/6/2022  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
9/20/2022  9:00   Non-Witness Violation Hearing