« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Southeast  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, Mjc1 Special Crimes      
Robert A Richardson - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Suzuki, Richard   Master Calendar  CR2016-140304-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Robert A Richardson  13-3204 (F5)  RECEIVE EARNINGS OF PROSTITUTE  8/1/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/31/2016 
Robert A Richardson  13-3208 (F5)  KEEP/RESIDE HOUSE PROSTITUTION  8/1/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/31/2016 
Robert A Richardson  13-2312A (F3)  ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE  8/1/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/31/2016 
Robert A Richardson  13-3203 (F5)  PUT PERSON IN HOUSE OF PROSTIT  8/1/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/31/2016 
Robert A Richardson  13-3209 (F5)  PANDERING  8/1/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  8/31/2016 
Robert A Richardson  13-3208B (F5)  MAINTAIN HOUSE OF PROSTITUTION  8/1/2016  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  1/4/2017 
Robert A Richardson  13-3203 (F5)  PUT PERSON IN HOUSE OF PROSTIT  8/1/2016  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/4/2017 
Robert A Richardson  13-3204 (F5)  RECEIVE EARNINGS OF PROSTITUTE  8/1/2016  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/4/2017 
Robert A Richardson  13-3209.2 (F5)  PANDER-HOUSE OF PROSTITUTION  8/1/2016  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/4/2017 
Robert A Richardson  13-2312A (F3)  ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE  8/1/2016  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  1/4/2017 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/2/2018  OSJ - Order re: Setting Aside Judgment of Guilt - Party (001)  11/2/2018   
NOTE: DENIED SET ASIDE
8/3/2018  CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001)  8/7/2018   
NOTE: Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
7/23/2018  ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (001)  7/26/2018  Defendant (2)  
6/12/2018  ORD - Order - Party (001)  6/12/2018   
NOTE: GRANTED CIVIL RIGHTS/DENIED GUN RIGHTS
4/13/2018  CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001)  4/13/2018   
NOTE: Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
4/12/2018  APL - Application - Party (001)  4/12/2018  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: TO RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS/TO RESTORE GUN RIGHTS
3/29/2018  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  4/3/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 1
2/23/2018  PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001)  3/1/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 1
3/7/2017  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  3/9/2017   
2/15/2017  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  2/15/2017   
2/6/2017  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (001)  2/6/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review
2/6/2017  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  2/6/2017   
NOTE: Presentence Report
2/6/2017  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  2/6/2017   
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
2/1/2017  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/1/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S SENTECING RECOMMENDATION
1/10/2017  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  1/10/2017   
1/4/2017  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  1/9/2017   
1/3/2017  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  1/3/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
12/7/2016  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  12/7/2016   
11/10/2016  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/15/2016   
11/4/2016  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  11/4/2016   
11/3/2016  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  11/3/2016   
10/14/2016  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  10/14/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Defenses , WITNESSES AND EXHITIBS AND REQUEST FOR REBUTTAL WITNESS
10/13/2016  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/18/2016   
10/13/2016  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/18/2016   
10/13/2016  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  10/18/2016   
10/12/2016  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)  10/12/2016   
NOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO REMAND
10/4/2016  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/7/2016   
NOTE: TEMPORARY
9/28/2016  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  9/30/2016   
9/28/2016  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/30/2016   
9/28/2016  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  10/3/2016   
9/27/2016  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  9/27/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
9/27/2016  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  9/27/2016   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
9/22/2016  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  9/22/2016   
9/22/2016  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  9/22/2016   
9/8/2016  173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (001)  9/8/2016   
8/30/2016  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  8/30/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance
8/30/2016  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  8/31/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
8/30/2016  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  8/31/2016   
8/30/2016  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  8/31/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
8/30/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  8/31/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
8/26/2016  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  8/26/2016   
8/26/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  8/26/2016   
8/26/2016  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  8/26/2016   
NOTE: IA Release Order
8/26/2016  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  8/26/2016   
NOTE: IA Packet
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
8/24/2016  8:00   Initial Appearance 
9/6/2016  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
9/7/2016  8:30   Status Conference 
9/13/2016  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
9/20/2016  8:30   Arraignment Hearing 
10/20/2016  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
11/1/2016  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
11/21/2016  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
11/30/2016  8:31   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
1/4/2017  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
2/6/2017  8:30   Acceptance Of Plea/Snt 
2/8/2017  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
2/15/2017  8:00   Trial 
click here for Law Library Resource Center