« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Ogus, Adam
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Glover, Todd
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2016-132464-002
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Rueter
Case #
CR2016-132464-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh 
Crime Date
5/3/2016
Date
7/19/2016
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh 
Crime Date
7/8/2016
Date
7/19/2016
Description
POSS WPN BY PROHIB PERSON
ARSCode
13-3102A4 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh 
Crime Date
7/8/2016
Date
7/19/2016
Description
MARIJUANA-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3405A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh 
Crime Date
5/3/2016
Date
7/19/2016
Description
THEFT CREDIT CARD-CONTROL
ARSCode
13-2102A1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron 
Crime Date
5/3/2016
Date
7/19/2016
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron 
Crime Date
7/8/2016
Date
7/19/2016
Description
DANGEROUS DRUG-POSS/USE
ARSCode
13-3407A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron 
Crime Date
5/3/2016
Date
7/19/2016
Description
THEFT CREDIT CARD-CONTROL
ARSCode
13-2102A1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron 
Crime Date
5/3/2016
Date
8/31/2018
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron 
Crime Date
5/3/2016
Date
8/31/2018
Description
THEFT CREDIT CARD-CONTROL
ARSCode
13-2102A1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Harmony Michelle Barron 
Crime Date
7/8/2016
Date
8/31/2018
Description
DANGEROUS DRUG-POSS/USE
ARSCode
13-3407A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh 
Crime Date
5/3/2016
Date
4/25/2017
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008A (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh 
Crime Date
5/3/2016
Date
4/25/2017
Description
THEFT CREDIT CARD-CONTROL
ARSCode
13-2102A1 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh 
Crime Date
7/8/2016
Date
4/25/2017
Description
POSS WPN BY PROHIB PERSON
ARSCode
13-3102A4 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Mark Alan Millspaugh 
Crime Date
7/8/2016
Date
4/25/2017
Description
MARIJUANA-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3405A1 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2019
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
1/25/2019
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2019
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2019
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
1/17/2019
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
12/10/2018
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2018
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2018
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2018
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
10/10/2018
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
10/10/2018
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
10/10/2018
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
10/10/2018
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
10/10/2018
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
9/5/2018
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2018
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2018
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2018
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2018
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/15/2018
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/16/2018
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/16/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
3/29/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/30/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2017
Description
FIN - Financial Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Financial
Filing Date
5/8/2017
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2017
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
3/22/2017
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
3/9/2017
Description
133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2017
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2017
Description
IWA – Issuance of Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Issued 2017-03-02
Filing Date
2/8/2017
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2017
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/14/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2016
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/30/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2016
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/30/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2016
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2016
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S MOTION TO DESIGNATE AS COMPLEX CASE
Filing Date
11/2/2016
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/2/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2016
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ACCELERATE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
9/29/2016
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2016
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/26/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
9/23/2016
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/27/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
9/16/2016
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2016
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2016
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2016
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2016
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
AOC - Allegation of Offenses Committed While Released From Confinement - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-708(C)
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF PRIOR FELONY CONVICTION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 or A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703 OR A.R.S. § 13-704
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
8/29/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUESTED 15.2 DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/12/2016
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2016
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2016
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND WITNESSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES
Filing Date
8/5/2016
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2016
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/5/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2016
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2016
Description
BON - Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
SURETY/$5,000/SUN SURETY INSURANCE CO
Filing Date
7/26/2016
Description
ROS – Release Order Supervised Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
7/26/2016
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/26/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order/$5,000
Filing Date
7/20/2016
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/19/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/19/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/19/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/19/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/12/2016
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2016
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2016
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
7/12/2016
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
7/12/2016
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
7/12/2016
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
7/12/2016
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2016
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/13/2016
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/9/2016
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
7/9/2016
Time
2:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
7/15/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/19/2016
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
7/22/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/26/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/26/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
7/29/2016
Time
8:45
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
9/13/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/13/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/20/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
10/13/2016
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
10/13/2016
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
10/26/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
10/27/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
10/27/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
11/3/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
11/28/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
11/28/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
12/13/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/5/2017
Time
8:16
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/10/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/17/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/26/2017
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/6/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/13/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/2/2017
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/6/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/6/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
3/7/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
3/7/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/20/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/20/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
4/5/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/12/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/15/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/22/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/15/2018
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/25/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference - Post Warrant
Date
7/6/2018
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/6/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
8/21/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/31/2018
Time
14:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
8/31/2018
Time
15:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
9/4/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/11/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/10/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
12/7/2018
Time
9:00
Event
Restitution Hearing