Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Barnett, Tamara | ||
John Daniel Cooper - (2) |
Defendant | M | Public Defender-, Ccc | Master Calendar | CR2016-109383-001 |
Clerk Of The Court - (3) |
In The Matter Of | N/A | To Be Determined |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
John Daniel Cooper | 13-1506A1 (F4) | BURGLARY 3RD DEG-UNLAW ENTRY | 2/26/2016 | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment | 3/9/2016 |
John Daniel Cooper | 13-1506A1 (F4) | BURGLARY 3RD DEG-UNLAW ENTRY | 2/26/2016 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 8/25/2016 |
John Daniel Cooper | 13-1602 (M) | CRIMINAL DAMAGE | 2/26/2016 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 8/25/2016 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
3/11/2019 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001) | 3/12/2019 | |
7/17/2018 | ODM - Order of Discharge from Probation - Misdemeanor Designation - Party (001) | 7/20/2018 | |
NOTE: COUNT 2 | |||
6/21/2018 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 6/27/2018 | |
NOTE: PETITION FOR EARNED TIME CREDIT/COUNT 2/DISCHARGE 4-30-18 | |||
11/1/2016 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 11/3/2016 | |
10/28/2016 | 109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001) | 10/28/2016 | |
10/6/2016 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 10/6/2016 | |
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review | |||
10/6/2016 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 10/6/2016 | |
NOTE: Presentence Report | |||
10/6/2016 | CCR - Confidential Criminal Report - Party (001) | 10/6/2016 | |
NOTE: Restitution Ledger Confidential (Restricted) | |||
10/6/2016 | OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001) | 10/6/2016 | |
NOTE: Order of Release | |||
10/6/2016 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 10/6/2016 | |
NOTE: Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered | |||
9/2/2016 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 9/2/2016 | |
8/25/2016 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 8/26/2016 | |
7/26/2016 | 194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001) | 7/26/2016 | |
7/18/2016 | 123 - ME: Mental Exam Def Competent - Party (001) | 7/18/2016 | |
7/12/2016 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 7/19/2016 | |
NOTE: MEDICAL REPORT: DR. JACQUELINE WORSLEY DATED 06/29/16 | |||
7/12/2016 | SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001) | 7/19/2016 | |
7/12/2016 | ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001) | 7/12/2016 | |
NOTE: Release Order/$2,000 | |||
7/6/2016 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 7/6/2016 | |
5/12/2016 | 124 - ME: Mental Exam Def Incompetent - Party (001) | 5/12/2016 | |
5/10/2016 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 5/13/2016 | |
NOTE: MEDICAL REPORT: DR. PATRASSO DATED 5/1/16 | |||
5/10/2016 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001) | 5/13/2016 | |
NOTE: MEDICAL REPORT: DR. OLSHAN DATED 5/2/16 | |||
5/10/2016 | SDC - Stipulation For Determination Of Competency On Basis Of Expert's Reports - Party (001) | 5/13/2016 | |
5/10/2016 | OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001) | 5/12/2016 | |
5/4/2016 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 5/4/2016 | |
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES | |||
5/4/2016 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 5/4/2016 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AT THE NEXT COURT SETTING | |||
5/4/2016 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 5/4/2016 | |
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE | |||
4/26/2016 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 4/26/2016 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF REBUTTAL WITNESSES | |||
4/26/2016 | REQ - Request - Party (001) | 4/27/2016 | |
NOTE: SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REQUEST | |||
4/26/2016 | MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001) | 4/27/2016 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR DISCOVERY | |||
4/14/2016 | 122 - ME: Mental Exam Experts Appt - Party (001) | 4/14/2016 | |
4/7/2016 | 120 - ME: Hrg/Motion/Rule 11 Exam - Party (001) | 4/7/2016 | |
4/1/2016 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 4/6/2016 | |
3/31/2016 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 4/4/2016 | |
3/31/2016 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 4/4/2016 | |
3/31/2016 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 4/5/2016 | |
3/30/2016 | 173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (001) | 3/30/2016 | |
3/24/2016 | GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001) | 3/24/2016 | |
3/22/2016 | 173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (001) | 3/22/2016 | |
3/9/2016 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 3/9/2016 | |
3/8/2016 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 3/9/2016 | Plaintiff (1) |
3/8/2016 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 3/9/2016 | |
3/8/2016 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 3/9/2016 | Plaintiff (1) |
3/8/2016 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 3/9/2016 | Plaintiff (1) |
3/8/2016 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/11/2016 | |
NOTE: TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING | |||
3/1/2016 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 3/1/2016 | |
3/1/2016 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 3/1/2016 | |
NOTE: IA Packet | |||
3/1/2016 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 3/1/2016 | |
NOTE: IA Release Order | |||
3/1/2016 | ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001) | 3/2/2016 | |
NOTE: IA Amended Release Order | |||
3/1/2016 | CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001) | 3/2/2016 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
2/27/2016 | 11:00 | Initial Appearance |
3/4/2016 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
3/8/2016 | 8:45 | Preliminary Hearing |
3/15/2016 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
3/18/2016 | 8:30 | Arraignment Hearing |
3/29/2016 | 8:30 | Arraignment Hearing |
5/3/2016 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
5/10/2016 | 9:00 | Rule 11 Hearing |
7/5/2016 | 9:00 | Rule 11 Hearing |
7/12/2016 | 9:00 | Rule 11 Hearing |
7/12/2016 | 9:00 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
7/25/2016 | 8:15 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
8/25/2016 | 8:30 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
9/2/2016 | 8:31 | Comprehensive PreTrial Conference |
10/6/2016 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
10/27/2016 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
11/3/2016 | 8:00 | Trial |