Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, T R L Central Valley      
Brittian Willie Young - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Per, Pro   Brearcliffe  CR2016-005528-001  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Brittian Willie Young  13-1304A5 (F3)  ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - KIDNAP-INTRFR GOVT/POLIT FUNCT  9/21/2016  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  3/7/2017 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/4/2019  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  4/5/2019   
2/22/2019  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)  2/25/2019   
2/22/2019  MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)  2/25/2019   
6/29/2018  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  7/2/2018   
6/15/2018  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  6/18/2018   
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL 
6/12/2018  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  6/13/2018   
NOTE: CLERK OF COURT, COURT OF APPEALS DIVISION ONE 
6/12/2018  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  6/13/2018   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
6/12/2018  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)  6/13/2018   
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD 
5/31/2018  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  6/4/2018   
8/8/2017  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  8/9/2017   
8/8/2017  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  8/9/2017   
8/3/2017  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)  8/4/2017   
NOTE: AMENDED ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD 
8/3/2017  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  8/4/2017   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
7/31/2017  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  8/4/2017   
7/28/2017  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  7/28/2017   
7/28/2017  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  7/28/2017   
7/27/2017  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  7/31/2017   
NOTE: AMENDED ORDER FOR REMAND FOR COLEMAN HEARING 
7/27/2017  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)  7/31/2017   
NOTE: REMAND FOR COLEMAN HEARING 
7/26/2017  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  7/31/2017   
7/26/2017  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  7/31/2017   
7/24/2017  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  7/24/2017   
7/21/2017  ORD - Order - Party (001)  7/25/2017   
NOTE: REGARDING COURT OF APPEALS ORDER 
7/14/2017  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  7/17/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Set Coleman Hearing 
7/5/2017  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  7/6/2017  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION TO TRANSMIT EXHIBITS 
7/3/2017  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/7/2017   
6/30/2017  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  7/7/2017   
NOTE: PURSUANT TO MARICOPA COUNTY LOCAL RULE 2.8(E) 
6/30/2017  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/6/2017   
NOTE: TEMPORARY 
6/30/2017  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/6/2017   
6/29/2017  REC - Receipt - Party (001)  6/30/2017   
6/27/2017  DOR - Designation Of Record On Appeal - Party (001)  6/27/2017   
NOTE: Designation of Record for Appeal 
6/21/2017  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  6/23/2017   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
6/21/2017  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)  6/23/2017   
6/19/2017  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  6/19/2017   
6/16/2017  ORD - Order - Party (001)  6/19/2017   
NOTE: IN CHAMBERS ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS POST CONVICTION MOTION TO TRANSMIT EXHIBIT 
6/5/2017  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  6/7/2017   
5/22/2017  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)  5/22/2017   
NOTE: 2/21/2017 BY TARA L. KRAMER 
5/19/2017  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  5/22/2017  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION TO TRANSMIT EXHIBIT 
5/3/2017  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  5/4/2017  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: AFFIDAVIT REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPTS RECORDS 
5/1/2017  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/1/2017   
4/28/2017  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (001)  5/2/2017   
4/28/2017  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  4/28/2017   
NOTE: HEARING DATE 4/10/2017 
4/25/2017  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/26/2017   
NOTE: NOTIFICATION NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED 
4/25/2017  ORD - Order - Party (001)  4/26/2017   
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED 
4/20/2017  NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)  4/21/2017  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: FROM SUPERIOR COURT 
4/20/2017  571 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (no Monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)  4/20/2017   
4/11/2017  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  4/13/2017   
4/10/2017  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/10/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION 
4/10/2017  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  4/21/2017   
4/6/2017  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  4/7/2017  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: AFFIDAVIT 
4/6/2017  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  4/7/2017  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 
3/27/2017  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  3/27/2017   
3/24/2017  ORD - Order - Party (001)  3/28/2017   
NOTE: THAT MOTION WAS DENIED AND THEREFORE THE WRITTEN MOTION IS DEEMED DENIED 
3/17/2017  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/17/2017   
3/16/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/16/2017   
3/13/2017  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  3/14/2017  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION FOR MISTRIAL 
3/9/2017  012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)  3/9/2017   
3/8/2017  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)  3/9/2017   
3/7/2017  VER - Verdict - Party (001)  3/9/2017   
NOTE: SIGNED 
3/7/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/9/2017   
NOTE: #2 
3/7/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/9/2017   
NOTE: DELIBERATION 
3/7/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/9/2017   
NOTE: DELIBERATION 
3/7/2017  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)  3/9/2017   
NOTE: FINAL 
3/7/2017  WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)  3/9/2017   
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING 
3/7/2017  OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)  3/9/2017   
3/7/2017  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)  3/10/2017   
3/6/2017  JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)  3/9/2017   
NOTE: #1 
2/23/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  2/23/2017   
2/21/2017  ORD - Order - Party (001)  2/23/2017   
NOTE: IN CHAMBERS ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S "AFFIDAVIT; MOTION FOR DISPOSITION HEARING 
2/17/2017  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)  2/17/2017   
2/17/2017  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  2/17/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTIONS IN LIMINE 
2/7/2017  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  2/8/2017  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION TO DISCOVER 
2/6/2017  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  2/7/2017  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: AFFIDAVIT MOTION FOR DISPOSITION HEARING 
2/6/2017  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  2/7/2017  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION TO QUESTION JURORS GIVE INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT 
1/25/2017  021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)  1/25/2017   
1/24/2017  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  1/24/2017   
12/28/2016  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  12/28/2016   
12/27/2016  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  12/30/2016  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: MOTION TO PROCEED PROPIA PERSONA 
11/29/2016  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  11/29/2016   
11/23/2016  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)  11/23/2016   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF HISTORICAL PRIORS 
11/23/2016  ALG - Allegation - Party (001)  11/23/2016   
NOTE: STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES 
11/23/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  11/23/2016   
NOTE: NOTICE OF STATE'S RULE 15.2 REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PHYSICAL EVIDENCE AT THE NEXT COURT SETTING 
11/23/2016  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  11/23/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE 
11/23/2016  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)  11/23/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING 
11/2/2016  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/8/2016   
NOTE: TEMPORARY 
11/1/2016  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  11/4/2016   
11/1/2016  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/4/2016   
11/1/2016  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  11/4/2016   
10/28/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/28/2016   
NOTE: INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS 
10/28/2016  REQ - Request - Party (001)  10/28/2016   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.1 (a), (b), (d), (e) 
10/28/2016  REQ - Request - Party (001)  10/28/2016   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR EXPEDITIOUS DISCLOSURE OF 911 TAPES, VIDEOS OR AUDIO SURVEILLANCE TAPES AND/OR RADIO BROADCASTS 
10/28/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  10/28/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2 NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND DISCLOSURE 
10/28/2016  REQ - Request - Party (001)  10/28/2016   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE OF SPECIFIED ITEMS FROM THE POLICE REPORT (RULES 15.1(b), 15.1(e)) 
10/25/2016  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  10/25/2016   
10/20/2016  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  10/20/2016   
10/12/2016  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)  10/12/2016   
10/10/2016  ORD - Order - Party (001)  10/13/2016   
NOTE: DIRECTING THE CLERK OF THE COURT TO PROVIDE JUDGE SEAN BREARCLIFFE OR HIS DESIGNEE WITH ELECTRONIC ACCESS TO THE CLERK OF THE MARICOPA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT'S DOCKET. 
10/6/2016  WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)  10/6/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: 10/05/16 
10/5/2016  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  10/6/2016   
NOTE: IA Release Order 
10/5/2016  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  10/6/2016   
NOTE: IA Packet 
9/29/2016  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)  10/6/2016   
9/29/2016  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  10/6/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
9/29/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  10/6/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
10/5/2016  20:00   Initial Appearance 
10/13/2016  8:29   Original Arraignment Hearing 
10/13/2016  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
11/28/2016  10:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
12/27/2016  10:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
1/23/2017  10:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
1/23/2017  11:00   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
2/13/2017  10:30   Trial 
2/21/2017  15:00   Pre-Trial Conference 
3/6/2017  10:30   Trial 
3/7/2017  10:30   Trial 
3/8/2017  10:30   Trial 
3/9/2017  10:30   Trial 
4/10/2017  14:00   Sentencing 
7/26/2017  11:30   Status Conference