« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Loudenslagel, Kate
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mary Angela Scheffer - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Hilscher, Matthew
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2016-005311-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mary Angela Scheffer 
Crime Date
7/14/2015
Date
8/21/2019
Description
MANSLAUGHTER-RECKLESS
ARSCode
13-1103A1 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2023
Description
LED - 2.8 (d) Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2019
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2019
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/30/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2019
Description
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SOI - Sentencing Order - Incarceration
Filing Date
12/13/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE DEFENDANT'S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM AND MITIGATIN REPORT UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
12/13/2019
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM AND MITIGATION REPORT W/EXHIBITS
Filing Date
12/13/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
12/13/2019
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
12/13/2019
Description
OIM – Order - Imprisonment (monetary orders) - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Monetary Orders
Filing Date
12/13/2019
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
12/13/2019
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
12/13/2019
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2019
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING HEARING SET 11-01-2019
Filing Date
9/24/2019
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2019
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING
Filing Date
8/29/2019
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2019
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2019
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
CLINICAL NOTES
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED LETTER
Filing Date
7/23/2019
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2019
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2019
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
3/11/2019
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
3/4/2019
Description
331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2019
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Settlement Conference Memorandum
Filing Date
2/13/2019
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
2/11/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2018
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2018
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2018
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Reconsideration to Modify Release by Removing Electronic Monitor
Filing Date
9/6/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
9/4/2018
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT’S RULE 15 DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
8/13/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL MENTAL HEALTH EVALUATION OR PRECLUDE MENTAL HEALTH TESTIMONY IN THE PENALTY PHASE
Filing Date
7/20/2018
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/20/2018
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2018
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXPERT REPORT
Filing Date
6/4/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS SECOND/
Filing Date
6/1/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
4/25/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
4/20/2018
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
3/26/2018
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2018
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2017
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2017
Description
081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2017
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
8/4/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
8/4/2017
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION UNDER SEAL AND PROPOSED ORDDER
Filing Date
7/28/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 07/28/17
Filing Date
7/28/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
7/28/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S EX-PARTE MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF EXPERT AT COUNTY EXPENSE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.9 A.R.C.P.
Filing Date
7/18/2017
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF WITNESS FOR TRIAL
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS EX PARTE MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF EXPERT AT COUNTY EXPENSE PURSUANT TO RULE 15.9 A.R.C.P.
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION EX PARTE AND UNDER SEAL AND PROPOSED
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MINUTE ENTRY DATED 06/27/2017
Filing Date
6/15/2017
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/15/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/9/2017
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2017
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2017
Description
EMF - Email Filed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2017
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2017
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT/
Filing Date
4/5/2017
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
3/30/2017
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND ASSOCIATION WITH COUNSEL OF RECORD
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2017
Description
591 - ME: Complex Case/Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2017
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
1/10/2017
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/21/2016
Description
590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S MOTION TO DESIGNATE COMPLEX
Filing Date
11/30/2016
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY BOND $75,000 BANKERS INSURANCE
Filing Date
11/23/2016
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2016
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MARY A SCHEFFERS RULE 15.2 DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/17/2016
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2016
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2016
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2016
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2016
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order/$75,000
Filing Date
11/9/2016
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES
Filing Date
11/9/2016
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
10/28/2016
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
10/21/2016
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2016
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2016
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
10/6/2016
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2016
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2016
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/11/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
9/29/2016
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order/$250,000
Filing Date
9/29/2016
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2016
Description
SUM - Summons - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 09/13/2016
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2016
Description
600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2016
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/30/2016
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/14/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/29/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
11/10/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
11/10/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/13/2016
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
1/5/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/25/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/21/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/28/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/28/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/12/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/20/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
6/5/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/10/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/17/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/23/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/24/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/11/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/16/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/16/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/16/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/6/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/13/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/1/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/20/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/30/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/14/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/26/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/2/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/18/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/4/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/29/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/29/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/5/2018
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/7/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/6/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/1/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
4/24/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/8/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/19/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
7/30/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/31/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/6/2019
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/21/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/23/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
11/1/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
12/9/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/13/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/6/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial