« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Gadow, Blaine
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Public Defender-, Ccc
Judge
Whitehead
Case #
CR2016-002145-001
Party Name
Solana Depaola - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Iniguez, Milo
Judge
Whitehead
Case #
CR2016-002145-002
Party Name
Cordell James Bess - (4)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Whitehead
Case #
CR2016-002145-003
Party Name
Dino Nick Mitchell - (5)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Blischak, John
Judge
Whitehead
Case #
CR2016-002145-004
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (6)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2016-002145-004
Disposition Information
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
9/1/2016
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
9/1/2016
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
9/1/2016
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
9/1/2016
Description
ASSIST CRIM SYND/LEAD GANG
ARSCode
13-2308 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
4/1/2011
Date
9/1/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
11/15/2011
Date
9/1/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
1/18/2017
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
1/18/2017
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
1/18/2017
Description
ASSIST CRIM SYND/LEAD GANG
ARSCode
13-2308 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
4/1/2011
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
11/15/2011
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
12/1/2011
Date
9/1/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
12/1/2011
Date
9/1/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
1/1/2012
Date
9/1/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
2/1/2012
Date
9/1/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
2/1/2012
Date
9/1/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
3/1/2012
Date
9/1/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
3/1/2012
Date
9/1/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
12/1/2011
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
10/1/2012
Date
9/1/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
12/1/2011
Date
9/1/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
12/1/2011
Date
9/1/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
1/1/2012
Date
9/1/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Solana Depaola
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
9/1/2016
Description
MONEY LAUNDERING
ARSCode
13-2317 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
2/1/2013
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
12/1/2011
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
12/1/2011
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
1/1/2012
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
2/1/2012
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
2/1/2012
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
3/1/2012
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
3/1/2012
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
10/1/2012
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
1/18/2017
Description
MONEY LAUNDERING
ARSCode
13-2317 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
12/1/2011
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
1/1/2012
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
12/1/2012
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Lukeroy Kendrick Rose
Crime Date
1/1/2013
Date
1/18/2017
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dino Nick Mitchell
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
9/6/2016
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dino Nick Mitchell
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
9/6/2016
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Dino Nick Mitchell
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
9/6/2016
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dino Nick Mitchell
Crime Date
12/1/2011
Date
9/6/2016
Description
ASSIST CRIM SYND/LEAD GANG
ARSCode
13-2308 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Dino Nick Mitchell
Crime Date
12/1/2011
Date
9/6/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Dino Nick Mitchell
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
9/6/2016
Description
MONEY LAUNDERING
ARSCode
13-2317 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
8/29/2016
Description
CONSPIRACY
ARSCode
13-1003 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
8/29/2016
Description
ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE
ARSCode
13-2312 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
8/29/2016
Description
FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES
ARSCode
13-2310 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
8/29/2016
Description
ASSIST CRIM SYND/LEAD GANG
ARSCode
13-2308 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
4/1/2011
Date
8/29/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
11/15/2011
Date
8/29/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
12/1/2011
Date
8/29/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
12/1/2011
Date
8/29/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
12/1/2011
Date
8/29/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
12/1/2011
Date
8/29/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
1/1/2012
Date
8/29/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
1/1/2012
Date
8/29/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
2/1/2012
Date
8/29/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
2/1/2012
Date
8/29/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
3/1/2012
Date
8/29/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
3/1/2012
Date
8/29/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
10/1/2012
Date
8/29/2016
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Cordell James Bess
Crime Date
1/1/2011
Date
8/29/2016
Description
MONEY LAUNDERING
ARSCode
13-2317 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2024
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/16/2024
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
RE-HEARING RESTITUTION
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
MER - Memorandum of Restitution Delinquency - Party (004)
Docket Date
1/16/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/26/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
MER - Memorandum of Restitution Delinquency - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DENIED
Filing Date
8/11/2023
Description
LET - Letter - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTITUTION
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
5/30/2023
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
5/30/2023
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
5/16/2023
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
5/16/2023
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
5/11/2023
Description
MEC = Memo to the Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms
Filing Date
8/15/2022
Description
MER - Memorandum of Restitution Delinquency - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 11
Filing Date
7/26/2022
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2022
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION TO MODIFY TERMS OR
REGULATIONS OF PROBATION & ORDER COUNT 16
Filing Date
5/26/2022
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/27/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2022
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2
Filing Date
3/14/2022
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (003)
Docket Date
3/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2022
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/14/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2022
Description
MER - Memorandum of Restitution Delinquency - Party (003)
Docket Date
2/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 16
Filing Date
10/14/2021
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2021
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 3
Filing Date
5/16/2021
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 11
Filing Date
1/4/2021
Description
MER - Memorandum of Restitution Delinquency - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
APD Forms COUNT 10
Filing Date
12/24/2020
Description
MPL - Modification of Probation Level - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2020
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Establish Start Date
Filing Date
8/24/2020
Description
MER - Memorandum of Restitution Delinquency - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEMORANDUM OF RESTITUTION
DELINQUENCY COUNT 10
Filing Date
7/9/2020
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/13/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 16
Filing Date
12/2/2019
Description
PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/3/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 10
Filing Date
1/31/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDING THE FEBRUARY 23 2017 CRIMINAL RESTITUTION ORDER
Filing Date
1/23/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/24/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO AMEND CRIMINAL RESTITUTION ORDER
Filing Date
12/17/2018
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2018
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2018
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2018
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Order Restitution Per States Application for Criminal Restitution Order
Filing Date
7/24/2018
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/24/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2018
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Establish Start Date
Filing Date
7/17/2018
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/20/2018
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
MOTION TO BE APPROVED TO LEAVE THE COUNTRY
Filing Date
5/14/2018
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2018
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Establish Start Date
Filing Date
9/28/2017
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Establish Start Date
Filing Date
9/19/2017
Description
067 - ME: Stipulation And Order - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2017
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTITUTION STIPULATION
Filing Date
8/3/2017
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/3/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2017
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Activate the $300.00 ISC Fee
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
PSD - PSR Supporting Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
PSR Supporting Documents
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement Jail
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Exoneration
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF RIGHTS OF REVIEW AFTER CONVICTION AND PROCEDURE RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
7/14/2017
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/14/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
7/5/2017
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2017
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/27/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Establish Start Date
Filing Date
5/23/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/23/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION
Filing Date
5/18/2017
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/18/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2017
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2017
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2017
Description
189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2017
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
2/23/2017
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms and Conditions of Probation
Filing Date
2/23/2017
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
2/23/2017
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF RIGHTS OF REVIEW AFTER CONVICTION AND PROCEDURE RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
2/23/2017
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
2/23/2017
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
2/23/2017
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2017
Description
APL - Application - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL RESTITUTION ORDER PURSUANT TO ARS 13-805(B)
Filing Date
2/14/2017
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (004)
Docket Date
2/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2017
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/7/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2017
Description
189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/25/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2017
Description
APL - Application - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL RESTITUTION ORDER PURSUANT TO ARS 13-805(B)
Filing Date
1/18/2017
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/19/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2017
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
CCR - Confidential Criminal Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Victim Restitution Supporting Documentation (Restricted)
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
CCR - Confidential Criminal Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Restitution Ledger Confidential (Restricted)
Filing Date
1/6/2017
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
1/5/2017
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
SENTENCING ADDENDUM
Filing Date
1/3/2017
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/3/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES SENTENCING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
1/3/2017
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/4/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/2016
Description
APL - Application - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL RESTITUTION ORDER PURSUANT TO ARS 13-805(B)
Filing Date
12/23/2016
Description
AEB - Affidavit for Exoneration of Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2016
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (004)
Docket Date
12/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2016
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (003)
Docket Date
12/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2016
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2016
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING
Filing Date
11/7/2016
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (004)
Docket Date
11/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2016
Description
APL - Application - Party (003)
Docket Date
11/4/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL RESTITUTION ORDER PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §13-805
Filing Date
10/31/2016
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2016
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (004)
Docket Date
10/31/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING
Filing Date
10/27/2016
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2016
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2016
Description
189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (003)
Docket Date
10/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2016
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2016
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Right of Review
Filing Date
9/28/2016
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Presentence Report
Filing Date
9/28/2016
Description
CCR - Confidential Criminal Report - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Restitution Ledger Confidential (Restricted)
Filing Date
9/28/2016
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order of Confinement
Filing Date
9/28/2016
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (003)
Docket Date
9/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL
DISCLOSURE NOTICE
Filing Date
9/8/2016
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2016
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Release of Deposit/$5000 PAID TO ROSA FLORES
Filing Date
9/6/2016
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2016
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/15/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
9/6/2016
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2016
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
9/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/1/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2016
Description
BON - Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY/$40000/BANKERS INS COMPANY
Filing Date
9/1/2016
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2016
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
$40,000
Filing Date
8/29/2016
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Second Supplemental Disclosure Notice
Filing Date
8/29/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Second Supplemental Disclosure Notice
Filing Date
8/29/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Second Supplemental Disclosure Notice
Filing Date
8/29/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Second Supplemental Disclosure Notice
Filing Date
8/29/2016
Description
OCJ-Order of Confinement/Sentence to Maricopa County Jail - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/30/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2016
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2016
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2016
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2016
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2016
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION TO AMEND INDICTMENT
Filing Date
8/23/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION TO AMEND INDICTMENT
Filing Date
8/23/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION TO AMEND INDICTMENT
Filing Date
8/23/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES MOTION TO AMEND INDICTMENT
Filing Date
8/22/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
States First Supplemental Disclosure Notice
Filing Date
8/22/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
States First Supplemental Disclosure Notice
Filing Date
8/22/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
8/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
States First Supplemental Disclosure Notice
Filing Date
8/22/2016
Description
SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (004)
Docket Date
8/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL
DISCLOSURE NOTICE
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Unopposed Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
Filing Date
8/15/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2016
Description
ROO – Release Order Own Recognizance - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2016
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2016
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO RE-CONSIDER MODIFYING RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
8/5/2016
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE A MOTION TO REMAND IN THIS CASE
Filing Date
7/31/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RE-CONSIDER
MODIFYING RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
7/29/2016
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RE-EXTEND TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS (RULE 12.9)
Filing Date
7/27/2016
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SECOND REQUEST
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO
CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY
PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
7/26/2016
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/25/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF JOINDER
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2016
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF JOINDER
Filing Date
7/14/2016
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF FRAUDULENT SCHEME RESULTING IN A BENEFIT OF $100,000 OR MORE
Filing Date
7/14/2016
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF
FRAUDULENT SCHEME RESULTING
IN A BENEFIT OF $100,000 OR MORE
PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-2310(C) and
A.R.S. § 13-1802(H)
Filing Date
7/14/2016
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF
FRAUDULENT SCHEME RESULTING
IN A BENEFIT OF $100,000 OR MORE
PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-2310(C) and
A.R.S. § 13-1802(H)
Filing Date
7/14/2016
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF FRAUDULENT SCHEME RESULTING IN A BENEFIT OF $100,000 OR MORE
Filing Date
7/14/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULAED MOTION TO
DESIGNATE A COMPLEX CASE
Filing Date
7/13/2016
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR REBUTTAL WITNESSES (15.2)
Filing Date
7/12/2016
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO STATE’S RESPONSE TO DEFENSE MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
7/8/2016
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO MODIFY RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (003)
Docket Date
7/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure
Filing Date
7/7/2016
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (004)
Docket Date
7/7/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
States Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2016
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE
Filing Date
6/28/2016
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO ARS 13-703
Filing Date
6/28/2016
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 13-703
Filing Date
6/28/2016
Description
ALP - State's Allegation Pursuant to ARS 13-702.02 - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURUSANT TO ARS 13-703
Filing Date
6/28/2016
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATES ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO ARS 13-703
Filing Date
6/28/2016
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S ALLEGATION OF
HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
6/27/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/27/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Modify release Conditions
Filing Date
6/22/2016
Description
RGJ – Request for Extension of Time to Challenge Grand Jury Proceedings - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
6/21/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/21/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2016
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/22/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
$5000.00
Filing Date
6/17/2016
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/17/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ACCELERATE IPTC
Filing Date
6/14/2016
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order/$5000
Filing Date
6/14/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS RULE 15.1 REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/14/2016
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RULE 12
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO
FILE MOTION TO REMAND
TO GRAND JURY
Filing Date
6/14/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2
NOTICE OF DEFENSES
AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
6/13/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO AMEND RELEASE CONDITIONS.
Filing Date
6/12/2016
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO
CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY
PROCEEDINGS (RULE 12.9)
Filing Date
6/12/2016
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE IPTC:
Filing Date
6/10/2016
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/14/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2016
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/14/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2016
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2016
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2016
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2016
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2016
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
6/7/2016
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2016
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2016
Description
REQ - Request - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
6/6/2016
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2016
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2016
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (003)
Docket Date
6/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2016
Description
GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2016
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE OF REBUTTAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
6/4/2016
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/6/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STIPULATION TO BOND FOR DEFENDANT
Filing Date
6/3/2016
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2016
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2016
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/3/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF RESTITUTION LIEN
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (004)
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF RESTITUTION LIEN
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF RESTITUTION LIEN
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
INVOCATION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS.
Filing Date
5/29/2016
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/31/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT
Filing Date
5/27/2016
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/27/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
5/27/2016
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/27/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/27/2016
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/27/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 05/26/2016
Filing Date
5/25/2016
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 05/24/2016
Filing Date
5/25/2016
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
5/25/2016
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/25/2016
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 05/24/2016
Filing Date
5/25/2016
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 05/24/2016
Filing Date
5/24/2016
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/24/2016
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
5/24/2016
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
5/24/2016
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/25/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/27/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/31/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (003)
Docket Date
5/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/31/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2016
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (004)
Docket Date
5/31/2016
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/24/2016
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/24/2016
Time
14:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/24/2016
Time
17:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/26/2016
Time
23:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
5/31/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/31/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
5/31/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/2/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/3/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/14/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/29/2016
Time
13:30
Event
Fugitive From Justice Hearing
Date
7/13/2016
Time
13:30
Event
Fugitive From Justice Hearing
Date
7/14/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/14/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/14/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/14/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/14/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/14/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/15/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/15/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/15/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/15/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/15/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
7/15/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/10/2016
Time
13:30
Event
Fugitive From Justice Hearing
Date
8/15/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Hearing Pending Motion
Date
8/29/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
8/30/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/30/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/30/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
8/30/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/1/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/6/2016
Time
8:20
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
9/7/2016
Time
13:30
Event
Fugitive From Justice Hearing
Date
9/28/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
10/6/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/6/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
10/17/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
11/3/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
11/28/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
12/6/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/6/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/6/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/6/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/6/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
1/18/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/18/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/18/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/18/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/25/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/25/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/25/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/25/2017
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/7/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
2/23/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
5/8/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/10/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/26/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
6/26/2017
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/14/2017
Time
10:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
10/12/2021
Time
9:10
Event
Review Hearing
Date
3/10/2022
Time
8:45
Event
Review Hearing