« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   GRIMSMAN, FRANKIE      
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Carter, Rodrick   Master Calendar  CR2016-000805-001  
Mayra Yomali Solis - (3)
 
Defendant  F   Martinez, Jon   Master Calendar  CR2016-000805-002  
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-1304A3 (F2)  KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL  1/18/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/26/2016 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/18/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/26/2016 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-1304A3 (F2)  KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL  1/18/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/26/2016 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/18/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/26/2016 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-1405A (F2)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  1/13/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/26/2016 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/17/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/26/2016 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/16/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/26/2016 
Mayra Yomali Solis  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/18/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/26/2016 
Mayra Yomali Solis  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/18/2016  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  1/26/2016 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-1304A3 (F2)  KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL  1/18/2016  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  8/28/2018 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-1304A3 (F2)  KIDNAP-DEATH/INJ/SEX/AID FEL  1/18/2016  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  8/28/2018 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-3623A1 (F3)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/18/2016  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  8/28/2018 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-3623A1 (F3)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/18/2016  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  8/28/2018 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-3623A1 (F3)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/16/2016  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  8/28/2018 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/17/2016  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/28/2018 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/1/2016  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/28/2018 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/14/2016  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/28/2018 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/14/2016  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/28/2018 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/14/2016  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/28/2018 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-1405A (F2)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  1/13/2016  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/28/2018 
Fransico Javier-Rios Covarrubias  13-1405A (F3)  ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  1/18/2016  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  8/28/2018 
Mayra Yomali Solis  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/18/2016  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  10/22/2018 
Mayra Yomali Solis  13-3623A1 (F2)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/18/2016  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  10/22/2018 
Mayra Yomali Solis  13-3623B1 (F4)  CHILD/VUL ADULT ABUSE-INTENT  1/18/2016  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  10/22/2018 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/29/2018  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)  10/31/2018   
10/25/2018  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (002)  10/25/2018   
10/25/2018  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  10/29/2018   
10/24/2018  SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation - Party (001)  10/24/2018   
NOTE: SPI - Sentencing Imprisonment Probation
10/23/2018  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  10/23/2018   
NOTE: Presentence Report
10/23/2018  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  10/23/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 4 Terms and Conditions of Probation
10/23/2018  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  10/23/2018   
NOTE: Order of Confinement
10/23/2018  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (001)  10/23/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Right of Review
10/23/2018  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  10/23/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 3 Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
10/23/2018  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  10/23/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 1 Terms & Conditions of Probation/Money Ordered
10/23/2018  OOR - Order Of Release - Party (002)  10/23/2018   
NOTE: Release Order
10/23/2018  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  10/24/2018   
NOTE: COUNT 6/Terms and Conditions of Probation
10/17/2018  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (002)  10/17/2018   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE
10/5/2018  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  10/5/2018   
9/25/2018  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)  9/25/2018   
9/20/2018  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (002)  9/27/2018   
NOTE: TRIAL
9/11/2018  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)  9/11/2018   
9/4/2018  331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)  9/4/2018   
9/4/2018  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  9/4/2018   
9/4/2018  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)  9/4/2018   
8/30/2018  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set - Party (001)  8/30/2018   
8/28/2018  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  8/28/2018   
NOTE: Release Order
8/28/2018  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  8/29/2018   
8/7/2018  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  8/7/2018   
8/6/2018  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  8/6/2018   
8/2/2018  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  8/2/2018   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE
6/18/2018  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (002)  6/18/2018   
6/14/2018  REQ - Request - Party (002)  6/19/2018   
NOTE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE FORM
6/6/2018  598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)  6/6/2018   
5/31/2018  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  6/4/2018   
NOTE: STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE
5/10/2018  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)  5/10/2018   
5/10/2018  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (002)  5/10/2018   
5/2/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  5/2/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO SEVER DEFENDANTS
4/27/2018  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  4/27/2018   
4/27/2018  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  4/27/2018   
3/7/2018  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  3/7/2018   
3/7/2018  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  3/7/2018   
1/24/2018  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  1/24/2018   
1/24/2018  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)  1/24/2018   
1/18/2018  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/19/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO SET TRIAL TO JUNE 5, 2018
12/8/2017  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  12/8/2017   
12/8/2017  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  12/8/2017   
12/6/2017  REQ - Request - Party (001)  12/11/2017   
NOTE: LAST DAY CONTINUANCE FORM
10/25/2017  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  10/25/2017   
10/25/2017  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  10/25/2017   
9/26/2017  331 - ME: Settlement Conference - Party (001)  9/26/2017   
8/31/2017  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)  8/31/2017   
8/14/2017  ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  8/15/2017   
NOTE: Order Regarding Counsel
8/14/2017  ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)  8/15/2017   
NOTE: Order Regarding Counsel
7/7/2017  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)  7/7/2017   
7/7/2017  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  7/7/2017   
6/28/2017  REQ - Request - Party (002)  7/6/2017   
NOTE: CONTINUANCE FOR SETTLEMENT
6/28/2017  REQ - Request - Party (001)  7/6/2017   
NOTE: LAST DAY CONTINUANCE
5/17/2017  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  5/17/2017   
5/17/2017  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  5/17/2017   
5/11/2017  REQ - Request - Party (002)  5/16/2017   
NOTE: LAST DAY CONTINUANCE / FORM
5/11/2017  REQ - Request - Party (001)  5/16/2017   
NOTE: LAST DAY CONTINUANCE / FORM
4/4/2017  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  4/4/2017   
4/4/2017  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  4/4/2017   
3/30/2017  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  3/30/2017   
3/30/2017  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)  3/30/2017   
3/27/2017  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  3/27/2017   
NOTE: COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
2/21/2017  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  2/21/2017   
2/21/2017  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  2/21/2017   
2/21/2017  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (002)  2/21/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
2/21/2017  SND - Supplemental Notice Of Disclosure - Party (001)  2/21/2017   
NOTE: STATE’S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
2/6/2017  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  2/6/2017   
1/30/2017  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  1/30/2017   
1/30/2017  017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (001)  1/30/2017   
12/13/2016  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  12/13/2016   
12/13/2016  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  12/13/2016   
12/9/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  12/9/2016   
12/6/2016  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  12/6/2016   
12/1/2016  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)  12/1/2016   
12/1/2016  REQ - Request - Party (001)  12/1/2016   
NOTE: Request for Discovery
10/18/2016  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  10/18/2016   
10/18/2016  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  10/18/2016   
10/13/2016  REQ - Request - Party (002)  10/20/2016   
NOTE: TRIAL CONTINUANCE
9/27/2016  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (002)  9/27/2016   
9/27/2016  081 - ME: Trial Vacated - Party (001)  9/27/2016   
7/26/2016  025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (002)  7/26/2016   
7/26/2016  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  7/26/2016   
6/14/2016  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)  6/14/2016   
6/14/2016  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  6/14/2016   
5/2/2016  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  5/2/2016   
5/2/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)  5/2/2016   
4/27/2016  085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)  4/27/2016   
4/26/2016  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  4/26/2016   
4/1/2016  599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (002)  4/1/2016   
4/1/2016  599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  4/1/2016   
3/22/2016  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  3/24/2016   
3/21/2016  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (002)  3/21/2016   
3/21/2016  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  3/21/2016   
3/17/2016  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (002)  3/18/2016   
3/17/2016  STA - Statement - Party (002)  3/22/2016   
NOTE: FINANCIAL
3/16/2016  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)  3/18/2016   
NOTE: TAPES
3/16/2016  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  3/18/2016   
3/16/2016  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)  3/18/2016   
3/15/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/15/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION
3/15/2016  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  3/15/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
3/11/2016  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)  3/11/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
3/11/2016  MOT - Motion - Party (002)  3/14/2016   
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION
3/7/2016  MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)  3/7/2016   
NOTE: MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
3/7/2016  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  3/7/2016   
NOTE: NOTICE OF DEFENSES AND REQUEST FOR REBUTTAL WITNESSES
3/2/2016  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (002)  3/2/2016   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS DEFENSE COUNSEL
2/17/2016  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (001)  2/17/2016   
2/17/2016  GJT – Grand Jury Transcript - Party (002)  2/17/2016   
2/9/2016  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001)  2/9/2016   
2/4/2016  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  2/4/2016   
2/4/2016  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)  2/4/2016   
2/2/2016  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)  2/8/2016   
2/2/2016  098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (002)  2/2/2016   
2/2/2016  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  2/2/2016   
NOTE: Release Order
2/1/2016  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  2/1/2016   
2/1/2016  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (002)  2/1/2016   
2/1/2016  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (002)  2/2/2016   
1/28/2016  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)  1/28/2016   
NOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW
1/25/2016  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  1/26/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
1/25/2016  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  1/26/2016   
1/25/2016  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  1/26/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
1/25/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  1/26/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
1/25/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/26/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
1/25/2016  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (002)  1/26/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
1/25/2016  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (002)  1/26/2016   
1/25/2016  IND - Indictment - Party (002)  1/26/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
1/25/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)  1/26/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
1/25/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  1/26/2016  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
1/25/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/26/2016   
NOTE: Invocation of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights
1/21/2016  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  1/21/2016   
1/21/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)  1/21/2016   
1/21/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  1/21/2016   
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
1/21/2016  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)  1/21/2016   
1/21/2016  CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (002)  1/21/2016   
1/21/2016  NOT - Notice - Party (002)  1/21/2016   
NOTE: RULE 2.3 VICTIM IDENTIFIER INFORMATION FORM
1/21/2016  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  1/25/2016   
NOTE: IA Packet
1/21/2016  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)  1/25/2016   
NOTE: IA Packet
1/21/2016  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  1/25/2016   
NOTE: IA Release Order
1/21/2016  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (002)  1/25/2016   
NOTE: IA Release Order
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/19/2016  14:00   Initial Appearance 
1/19/2016  14:00   Initial Appearance 
1/26/2016  8:30   Status Conference 
1/26/2016  8:30   Status Conference 
1/29/2016  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
1/29/2016  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
2/2/2016  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
2/2/2016  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
3/17/2016  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
3/17/2016  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
3/21/2016  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
3/21/2016  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
4/21/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/21/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/26/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/9/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/9/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/21/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
7/21/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/21/2016  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/21/2016  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/28/2016  8:00   Trial 
9/28/2016  8:00   Trial 
10/13/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
10/13/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/30/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
11/30/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
12/8/2016  8:30   Status Conference 
12/8/2016  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/24/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/24/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/1/2017  8:30   Status Conference 
2/14/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/14/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/28/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/28/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/30/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/30/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/11/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/11/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/28/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
6/28/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/25/2017  14:30   Settlement Conference 
9/22/2017  13:30   Settlement Conference 
10/23/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
10/23/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
12/6/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
12/6/2017  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/18/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/18/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/6/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/6/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/24/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
4/24/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
5/4/2018  8:30   Oral Argument 
5/4/2018  8:30   Oral Argument 
6/4/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
6/5/2018  8:00   Trial 
6/5/2018  8:00   Trial 
6/14/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
6/26/2018  8:00   Trial 
8/2/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/3/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
8/9/2018  8:00   Trial 
8/27/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
8/28/2018  14:00   Settlement Conference 
8/29/2018  8:00   Trial 
8/30/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/5/2018  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
9/10/2018  8:00   Trial 
9/20/2018  8:30   Pre-Trial Conference 
9/24/2018  8:00   Trial 
9/27/2018  8:30   Sentencing 
10/23/2018  8:00   Trial 
10/23/2018  8:30   Sentencing 
click here for Law Library Resource Center